MCCULLERS v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-03732

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 8:18 PM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ALASKA DEPARTMENT OF LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, MARGARET PATON WALSH +1 907 269 5275

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF WISCONSIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Gwendolyn Jean Cooley +1 608 261 5810 +1 608 267 2778 cooleygj@doj.state.wi.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David Rivkin +1 202 861 1731 +1 202 861 1783 drivkin@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, THOMAS W. HENDERSON +1 412 471 9382

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 515-281-5341

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Patrick Thomas Madigan +1 515 281 5926 patrick.madigan@ag.iowa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Kline & Spector PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Morley Cohen +1 215 772 1000 +1 215 772 1005 jonathan.cohen@klinespecter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LANGER GROGAN & DIVER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEA IRV ACKELSBERG +1 215 320 5660 +1 215 320 5703 iackelsberg@langergrogan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Grogan +1 215 320 5662 jgrogan@langergrogan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter E. Leckman +1 215 320 5660 +1 215 320 5703 pleckman@langergrogan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Robert Lee Hubbard +1 212 416 8267 +1 212 416 6015 robert.hubbard@ag.ny.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , SAAMI ZAIN +1 212 416 6360 saami.zain@ag.ny.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , BLAINE H WINSHIP +1 850 414 3657 +1 850 488 4872 blaine.winship@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF VERMONT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JILL S. ABRAMS +1 802 828 1106 +1 802 828 2154 jill.abrams@vermont.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Minnesota Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Ann Beimdiek Kinsella +1 651 296 2622

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Abel +1 717 783 1439 +1 717 705 3795 jabel@attorneygeneral.gov
, John M. Abel +1 717 783 1439 +1 717 705 3795 jabel@attorneygeneral.gov
Space Joseph S. Betsko +1 717 787 4530 +1 202 705 7110 jbetsko@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS J. BLESSINGTON +1 215 560 2139 tblessington@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED NICOLE J. BOLAND +1 717 783 3146 nboland@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED NIKOLE BROCK +1 717 705 5790 nbrock@attorneygeneral.gov
Space Benjamin L. Cox +1 717 787 4530 +1 717 705 7110 bcox@attorneygeneral.gov
, James A. Donahue, III +1 717 705 2523 jdonahue@attorneygeneral.gov
, Michael John Fischer +1 215 560 2402 mfischer@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Fischer +1 215 560 2402 mfischer@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JONATHAN SCOTT GOLDMAN +1 717 787 3391 jgoldman@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse Harvey +1 412 565 2883 jharvey@attorneygeneral.gov
, , , , , , , , , , RANDALL J. HENZES +1 215 560 2136 +1 215 560 1031 rhenzes@attorneygeneral.gov
, , BARRY N. KRAMER +1 215 560 1581 +1 215 560 1031 bkramer@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terry A. Lupia +1 717 787 4530 +1 717 787 1190
, Norman W Marden +1 717 787 4530 nmarden@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SAVERIO P. MIRARCHI +1 215 560 2445 smirarchi@attorneygeneral.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Aaron L Schwartz +1 717 787 7376 aschwartz@attorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAUREN E. SULCOVE +1 717 787 1179 lsulcove@attorneygeneral.gov
Space Jennifer Ann Thomson +1 717 787 4530 jthomson@attorneygeneral.gov
TERMINATED: 06/30/2016, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY SUE ANN UNGER +1 215 560 2127 +1 215 560 1031 sunger@attorneygeneral.gov
, Tracy W. Wertz +1 717 787 4530 twertz@attorneygeneral.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Michael A. Finio +1 717 238 7671 mfinio@saul.com
, , , , , , , AMY C. FOERSTER +1 717 257 7573 afoerster@saul.com
, , , CORY SCOTT WINTER +1 717 257 7562 +1 717 257 7594 cwinter@saul.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Devin M. Laiho +1 702 508 6000 +1 720 508 6040 devin.laiho@state.co.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephanie Gatewod Campaign

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, SHANIN SPECTER +1 215 772 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, AOPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, DAVID M. DONALDSON +1 215 560 6300 +1 215 560 6315 legaldepartment@pacourts.us

Toggle Switch Represented by UTAH ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (160-5-140857)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , DAVID N. SONNENREICH +1 801 366 0132 dsonnenreich@agutah.gov
No Logo KEVIN MCCULLERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FINE & STAUD LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY FEEDA R. MUSITIEF +1 215 665 0100 fmusitief@fineandstaud.com
v.
No Logo CITY OF ALLENTOWN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CITY OF ALLENTOWN SOLICITOR'S OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, FRANCES A. FRUHWIRTH +1 610 437 7545 +1 610 437 8701 frances.fruhwirth@allentownpa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Deasey, Mahoney, Valentini & North Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Andrew Bradley Adair +1 610 892 2732 +1 610 892 2926 abadair@dmvnlaw.com
, , RUFUS A. JENNINGS +1 215 587 9400 +1 215 587 9456 RAJennings@dmvnlaw.com
, , , , , JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN +1 215 587 9400 +1 215 587 9456 JPMorgenstern@dmvnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, JOSEPH W. JESIOLOWSKI +1 215 979 1126 +1 215 689 4932 jwjesiolowski@duanemorris.com
, , , STEPHANIE L. KOSTA +1 215 979 1103 skosta@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzpatrick Lentz & Budda PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , MARALEEN DANAI SHIELDS +1 610 797 9000 +1 610 289 8688 mshields@flblaw.com
, , , DOUGLAS J. SMILLIE +1 610 797 9000 dsmillie@flblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gross, McGinley, LaBarre & Eaton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Susan Ellis Wild +1 610 820 5450 +1 610 820 6006 SWild@gmle.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintzer, Sarowitz, Zeris, Ledua & Meyers, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2016 WILLIAM M. BRENNAN +1 215 735 7200 +1 215 735 1714 wbrennan@defensecounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, EDWARD J. EASTERLY +1 610 391 1800 eeasterly@nmmlaw.com
, , , STEVEN E. HOFFMAN shoffman@nmmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siana, Bellwoar & McAndrew LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHRISTINE D. STEERE +1 610 321 5500 +1 610 321 0505 cdsteere@sianalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , DONALD E. WIEAND, JR. +1 610 691 7111 dew@stevenslee.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MACMAIN LAW GROUP LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , TRICIA M. AMBROSE +1 484 318 7106 tambrose@macmainlaw.com
, , , , NICOLE FREILER +1 484 318 7106 nfreiler@macmainlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , DAVID J. MACMAIN +1 484 318 7704 +1 484 328 3996 dmacmain@macmainlaw.com
No Logo FRED J. CONTINO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/30/2016, TERMINATED: 07/11/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY SUE ANN UNGER +1 215 560 2127 +1 215 560 1031 sunger@attorneygeneral.gov
No Logo HOWARD ALTEMOS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GERMAN GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/2015, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO +1 215 545 7700 dannunziow@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2015, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 DEAN F. MURTAGH +1 215 545 7700 murtaghd@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2017, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 KIM R. PLOUFFE +1 215 545 7700 +1 215 732 4182 plouffek@ggmfirm.com
No Logo JOHN DOES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Madelyn E. Johnson +1 703 379 9289 madelynjohnson@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Robert C. Divine +1 423 752 4416 +1 423 752 9533 rdivine@bakerdonelson.com
, , , J. David Folds +1 202 508 3441 +1 202 220 2241 dfolds@bakerdonelson.com
, , , James Wylie McBride +1 202 508 3400 +1 202 508 3402 jmcbride@bakerdonelson.com
, Mindy Lynn Rattan +1 202 508 3453 +1 202 220 2253 mrattan@bakerdonelson.com
, , , Craig Rust +1 202 508 3453 +1 202 220 3453 crust@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FROST & ZEFF, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JOSEPHINE M. CARABELLO-PATTI +1 856 429 1700

Toggle Switch Represented by John Does

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Does

Toggle Switch Represented by Jolly & Peterson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Jason Vail +1 850 414 3300 ejv@jollylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , THOMAS F CONGDON +1 850 414 3635 +1 850 488 4872 thomas.congdon@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , John F. Henault, Jr. +1 202 654 6274 +1 202 654 9968 jhenault@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saiber Schlesinger Satz & Goldstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , JAMES HENRY FORTE +1 973 622 3333 +1 973 622 3349 jhf@saiber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Arthur Lazarus, Jr. +1 202 682 0240 +1 202 682 0249 alazarus@sonosky.com
, , Lloyd Benton Miller +1 907 258 6377 +1 907 272 8332 lloyd@sonosky.net

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
, , , Catherine Hancock Dorsey +1 202 514 3469 catherine.dorsey@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
, , , Steven Platt +1 202 532 4074 +1 202 305 7000 steven.a.platt@usdoj.gov
, , , Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by WADE PALMER & SHOEMAKER PA - PENSACOLA FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , ELIZABETH NICOLE PALMER +1 850 429 0755 +1 850 429 0871 npalmer@wpslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WORTH MAGEE & FISHER, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , GREGG L. ZEFF +1 856 429 1700 da@fast.net
No Logo LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLES ASSOCIATION, Defendant
No Logo CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cipriani & Werner, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 ANTHONY W. HINKLE +1 610 567 0700 ahinkle@c-wlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 ANTHONY W. HINKLE +1 610 567 0700 ahinkle@c-wlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 AMY G. WIRTH +1 610 567 0700 awirth@c-wlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 AMY G. WIRTH +1 610 567 0700 awirth@c-wlaw.com
No Logo HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR., Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GERMAN GALLAGHER & MURTAGH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/09/2015, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO +1 215 545 7700 dannunziow@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2015, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO +1 215 545 7700 dannunziow@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2015, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 DEAN F. MURTAGH +1 215 545 7700 murtaghd@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2015, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 DEAN F. MURTAGH +1 215 545 7700 murtaghd@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2017, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 KIM R. PLOUFFE +1 215 545 7700 +1 215 732 4182 plouffek@ggmfirm.com
TERMINATED: 03/02/2017, TERMINATED: 07/23/2018 KIM R. PLOUFFE +1 215 545 7700 +1 215 732 4182 plouffek@ggmfirm.com
No Logo LEHIGH COUNTY, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, STEPHANIE L. KOSTA +1 215 979 1103 skosta@duanemorris.com
, STEPHANIE L. KOSTA +1 215 979 1103 skosta@duanemorris.com
Space JAMES GERALD WELCH +1 215 979 1000 jgwelch@duanemorris.com
Space JAMES GERALD WELCH +1 215 979 1000 jgwelch@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, THOMAS M. CAFFREY +1 484 765 2209 tcaffrey@nmmlaw.com
, THOMAS M. CAFFREY +1 484 765 2209 tcaffrey@nmmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MACMAIN LAW GROUP LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/19/2018 JESSICA H. FREID +1 484 328 3984 +1 484 328 3996 JFreid@macmainlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/19/2018 JESSICA H. FREID +1 484 328 3984 +1 484 328 3996 JFreid@macmainlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/19/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY DAVID J. MACMAIN +1 484 318 7704 +1 484 328 3996 dmacmain@macmainlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/19/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY DAVID J. MACMAIN +1 484 318 7704 +1 484 328 3996 dmacmain@macmainlaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/21/2017 JOHN PATRICK MCAVOY +1 484 463 1014 jmcavoy@macmainlaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/21/2017 JOHN PATRICK MCAVOY +1 484 463 1014 jmcavoy@macmainlaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (125) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b) SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. ON AUGUST 16, 2018. 8/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(dja, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Scheduling Order
    ORDER OF 7/27/2018 THAT CONSISTENT WITH THE ORDERS DATED MAY 3, 2018, AND JUNE 27, 2017, SETTING THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE, SEE ECF NOS. 98, 104, IT IS ORDERED THAT: ANY JOINT MOTION TO JOIN PARTIES SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 30 CALENDAR DAYS BEFORE THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY; ALL FACT DISCOVERY, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO DEPOSITIONS, SHALL BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 4, 2018. ETC. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON NOVEMBER 20, 2018 AT 3:00PM AT THE EDWARD N. CAHN, U.S. COURTHOUSE IN COURTROOM C, THIRD FLOOR. ETC. THIS CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR TRIAL ON MONDAY, NOVEMBER 26, 2018 THROUGH FRIDAY NOVEMBER 30, 2018 OR AS SOON THEREAFTER AS THE SCHEDULE OF THE COURT PERMITS. ETC. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. 7/27/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Answer to amended complaint
      ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) with Affirmative Defenses by HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR.(PLOUFFE, KIM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THAT THE CROSSCLAIMS ASSERTED IN DEFENDANT LEHIGH COUNTY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND CROSS-CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTION AND/OR INDEMNIFICATION AGAINST DEFENDANTS HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR., CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI, AND FRED J. CONTINO (DOC. NO. 81) ARE HEREBY VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANTS HOWARD W. ALTEMOS AND CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI WITHOUT PREJUDICED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/23/18. 7/24/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Stipulation and Order
            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOCNO. 79,) IS HEREBY VOLUNTARY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY AS AGAINST DEFENDANT LEHIGH COUNTY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/19/18. 7/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Stipulation and Order
              STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION IS APPROVED AS AN ORDER OF THIS COURT. ALL CLAIMS AGAINST THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN ARE HEREBY WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CITY OF CITY OF ALLENTOWN SANCTIONS (DOCKET ITEM NO. 95) IS HEREBY WITHDRAWN. PLAINTIFF AND THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN SHALL BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS WITH REGARD TO ALL CLAIMS AMONG AND BETWEEN THEM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/17/18. 7/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Notice of hearing
                NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A TELEPHONE CONFERENCE WITH THE HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR., HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, JULY 18, 2018, AT 2:00 P.M. CONCERNING PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S LETTER DATED JULY 11, 2018 CONCERNING DEPOSITION OF LEHIGH COUNTY. THE ATTORNEY FOR THE PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL BY CONTACTING JUDGE LEESON AT 610-391-7020, THROUGH HIS CIVIL DEPUTY CLERK, AFTER ALL PARTIES ARE CONFIRMED AS PRESENT ON THE CALL. (dja, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Notice of appearance
                  NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA H. FREID on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY with Certificate of Service(FREID, JESSICA)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANT CONTINO'S MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 82, AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 86, ARE GRANTED. ALL OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST CONTINO ARE DISMISSED. CONTINO IS TERMINATED AS A DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION. DEFENDANT ALTEMOSS MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 83, IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: A. PLAINTIFF'S EQUAL PROTECTION/RACE DISCRIMINATION CLAIM AGAINST ALTEMOS IS DISMISSED. B. ANY REFERENCES TO ALTEMOS IN PARAGRAPHS 42 AND 66 OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ECF NO. 79, ARE STRICKEN. C. THE MOTION IS DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. DEFENDANT BERNARDI'S MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 84, IS WITHDRAWN. SEE ECF NO. 106 (PRAECIPE TO WITHDRAW). DEFENDANT CONTINOS MOTION TO DISMISS LEHIGH COUNTYS CROSSCLAIMS, ECF NO. 91, IS GRANTED. CONTINO IS TERMINATED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/11/18. 7/12/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                          OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 7/11/18. 7/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Praecipe/Request
                            Praecipe to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WIRTH, AMY)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI, with Affirmative Defenses, and Reply to Crossclaims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(WIRTH, AMY) Modified on 7/11/2018 (md).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Order
                                ORDER THAT THE FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED UNTIL SEPTEMBER 4, 2018. THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT FRED J. CONTINO SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 28, 2018, SHALL PROCEED AS SCHEDULED. A MORE DETAILED SCHEDULING ORDER WILL BE ISSUED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/27/18. 6/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order
                                  ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEW, IF NECESSARY, AFTER EXHAUSTIVELY WORKING WITH DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL IN A GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE THE ISSUE. COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES ARE STRONGLY ADVISED TO WORK COOPERATIVELY TO RESOLVE ANY DISCOVERY DISPUTES, NOW AND IN THE FUTURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/18/18. 6/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Administrative Record
                                    Letter re Request for Order to Compel Documents. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 6/18/2018 (md).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Order
                                      ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF KEVIN MCCULLER'S LETTER REQUEST FROM COUNSEL SEEKING THIS COURT'S INTERVENTION IN A DISCOVERY DISPUTE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/18/18. 5/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to compel
                                          ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL, ECF NO. 99, IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/11/18.5/11/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Compel
                                            MOTION to Compel filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS.Motion to Compel Arrest Warrants and Parking and traffic tickets. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                              ORDER THAT EXCEPT AS IT RELATES TO THE CLAIMS AGAINST ALTEMOS, ALL DISCOVERY, INCLUDING DEPOSITIONS, SHALL BE COMPLETED WITHIN NINETY DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 5/3/18. 5/3/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: 4/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                RESPONSE in Support re 95 MOTION for Sanctions filed by CITY OF ALLENTOWN. (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION for Sanctions filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: 4/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION for Sanctions filed by CITY OF ALLENTOWN.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: 3/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims of Lehigh County filed by LEHIGH COUNTY. (MACMAIN, DAVID)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: 2/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER THAT LEHIGH COUNTY SHALL FILE A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS NO LATER THAN MONDAY, MARCH 5, 2018. LEHIGH COUNTY IS ADVISED THAT ITS FAILURE TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF ITS CROSS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT CONTINO WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 2/26/18. 2/26/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: 2/21/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE by HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR of Pendency of Bankruptcy (PLOUFFE, KIM)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims of Lehigh County filed by FRED J. CONTINO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(UNGER, SUE)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Response re 81 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, to Crossclaim of Lehigh County by HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR. (PLOUFFE, KIM)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: 12/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Supplemental MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FRED J. CONTINO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(UNGER, SUE)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOHN PATRICK MCAVOY on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY(MCAVOY, JOHN)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss filed by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI.Brief, Certificate of Service.(WIRTH, AMY)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss filed by HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(PLOUFFE, KIM)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FRED J. CONTINO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Contino 1- 2012 Annual Report, # 2 Exhibit Contino 2-2013 Annual Report)(UNGER, SUE)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM For Contribution and/or Indemnification against HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR, CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI by LEHIGH COUNTY, Certificate of Service.(MACMAIN, DAVID) Modified on 12/15/2017 (md).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: 12/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended by CITY OF ALLENTOWN.(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by KEVIN MCCULLERS. Second Amended Complaint. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; ATTY HAS RESUBMITTED TO COURT IN HARD COPY) Modified on 12/21/2017 (md). Modified on 12/28/2017 (md).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by THOMAS M. CAFFREY on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY(CAFFREY, THOMAS)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ORDER THE CLERK SHALL REMOVE THIS CASE FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT'S ACTIVE DOCKET. WITHIN TWENTY DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSISTENT WITH THE OPINION AND ORDER DATED JUNE 30, 2016, AS TO ANY CLAIMS OR PARTIES DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/15/17. 11/15/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PATRICK MCAVOY on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY with Certificate of Service(MCAVOY, JOHN)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. MACMAIN on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY with Certificate of Service(MACMAIN, DAVID)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO on behalf of HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of William D'Annunzio by KIM R. PLOUFFE on behalf of HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR.(PLOUFFE, KIM) (FILED IN ERROR; ATTY HAS RE-FILED AT PAPER #74) Modified on 3/3/2017 (md).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by KIM R. PLOUFFE on behalf of HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR. (PLOUFFE, KIM) Modified on 3/2/2017 (md).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN, ECF NO. 28, LEHIGH COUNTY, ECF NO. 30, CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI, ECF NO. 41, AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA AND FRED J. CONTINO, ECF NO. 50, ARE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: A. ANY FIRST AMENDMENT CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. B. PLAINTIFFS FOURTEENTH AMENDMENT CLAIMS FOR VIOLATION OF HIS DUE PROCESS RIGHTS ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTION TO THE CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET, AND MARK THE CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/30/16. 6/30/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 6/30/16. 6/30/16 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by WILLIAM M. BRENNAN on behalf of CITY OF ALLENTOWN(BRENNAN, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by KEVIN MCCULLERS As To Lehigh County Constables Association(MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLES ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 11/23/2015, answer due 1/22/2016. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ORDER THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO MAKE SERVICE ON THE LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLE ASSOCIATION IS EXTENDED UNTIL DECEMBER 23, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/24/15. 11/25/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of jurisdiction filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FRED J. CONTINO. (UNGER, SUE)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of jurisdiction filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: 11/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT B TO ECF NO. 54 filed by HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR. (mas, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT, ECF NO. 58, IS GRANTED; AND THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO DOCKET EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO ECF NO. 58, AS EXHIBIT B TO ECF NO. 54 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/16/15. 11/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL SHOW CAUSE ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 30, 2015, WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS TO LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLE ASSOCIATION FOR FAILURE TO SERVE A SUMMONS WITHIN 120 DAYS OF FILING OF THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/16/15. 11/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL NOVEMBER 23, 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION OF THECOMMONWEALTH AND FRED J. CONTINO TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND THECOMMONWEALTH AND FRED J. CONTINO MAY WITHIN 10 DAYS OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 11/16/15. 11/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 11/19/2015 (er, ).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Second Stipulation and order Extending Time For Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants Commonwealth and Fred J. Continos Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by KEVIN MCCULLERS.**(FILED IN ERROR, ORDER HAS BEEN SIGNED)** (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 11/17/2015 (tjd).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Motion of Defendant Howard W. Altemos, Jr. to Supplement the Defendant's Reply to the Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Stay the Civil Proceedings or in the Alternative, Motion for Leave to Supplement His Reply to the Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Stay the Civil Proceedings filed by HOWARD ALTEMOS, HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR.Brief, Proof of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM) Modified on 11/17/2015 (tjd).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  PRAECIPE To Join Defendant Altemos Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Altemos' Motion to Stay by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI. (WIRTH, AMY) Modified on 10/28/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SAID STIPULATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL NOVEMBER 17, 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION OF THE COMMONWEALTH AND FRED J. CONTINO TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/26/15. 10/26/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendant Howard W. Altemos, Jr. to Stay this Civil Action Until the Criminal Trial Against Him Before the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Lehigh County Court of Common Pleas is Resolved or Alternatively Requesting Leave to File Answer within ten days of entry of the Court Order Denying the Motion to Stay filed by HOWARD ALTEMOS, HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 10/23/2015 (fb).
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Praecipe to Join Def Altemos Motion to Stay by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI. Certificate of Service. (WIRTH, AMY) Modified on 10/27/2015 (tjd).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by BARRY N. KRAMER on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA(KRAMER, BARRY)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for lack of jurisdiction filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FRED J. CONTINO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(UNGER, SUE) Modified on 10/28/2015 (mas, ).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY THE BELOW COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL REPRESENTING FRED J. CONTINO THAT FRED J. CONTINO SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 27, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/13/15. 10/14/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, ) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendant Howard W. Altemos, Jr. to Stay this Civil Action Until the Criminal Trial Against Him Before the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Lehigh County Court of Common Pleas is Resolved or Alternatively Requesting Leave to filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by SUE ANN UNGER on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FRED J. CONTINO with Certificate of Service(UNGER, SUE)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF ALLENTOWN. (JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SAID STIPULATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL NOVEMBER 2, 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, CARLOS ROBERTO BEMARDL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 10/13/15. 10/13/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Extending Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Defendant Carlos Roberto Bernardis Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 10/13/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI.Brief, Certificate of Service, Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(WIRTH, AMY)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SAID STIPULATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 20, 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, HOWARD ALTEMOS' 31 MOTION TO STAY THE CIVIL PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/30/15. 9/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SAID STIPULATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 15, 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF ALLENTOWN'S 28 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAIL1TIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/30/15. 9/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SAID STIPULATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 19, 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, LEHIGH COUNTY'S 30 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/30/15. 9/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, ) Modified on 9/30/2015 (mas, ).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to file Response to Defendant Lehigh County's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 9/30/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to file Response to Defendant Howard Altemos' Motion to Stay the Civil Proceedings by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 9/30/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to file Response to Defendant City of Allentown's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 9/30/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT SAID STIPULATION IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 15. 2015 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, CITY OF ALLENTOWN'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/24/15. 9/25/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED. (mas, ) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Order Extending Tim to File Response to City of Allentowns Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 9/25/2015 (nd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frank Evans re: served First Amended Complaint upon Fred J. Contino by Personal on 9-20-15 (MUSITIEF, FEEDA)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Motion of Defendant Howard W. Altemos, Jr. to Stay this Civil Action Until the Criminal Trial Against Him Before the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Lehigh County Court of Common Pleas is Resolved or Alternatively Requesting Leave to File an Answer to the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint within Ten (10) Days after Entry of a Court Order Denying the Defendant's Motion for Stay filed by HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by LEHIGH COUNTY.Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CAFFREY, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 23, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/18/15. 9/21/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF ALLENTOWN.Brief and Certificate of Service.(JENNINGS, RUFUS) Modified on 9/30/2015 (mas, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ECF NOS. 8, 14, 23, ARE DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/14/15.9/15/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 9/15/2015 (er, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against HOWARD W. ALTEMOS, JR., CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI, CITY OF ALLENTOWN, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, LEHIGH COUNTY, LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLES ASSOCIATION, FRED J. CONTINO, JOHN DOES (1 THROUGH 10), filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS, jury trial demand, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(fdc) Modified on 9/11/2015 (md). (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT IS HEREBY AGREED AND STIPULATED BY AND BETWEEN FEEDA R. MUSITIEF; ESQUIRE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, AND DEAN F. MURTAGH, ESQUIRE, COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, HOWARD ALTEMOS, THAT THE TIMEWITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT, HOWARD ALTEMOS, MAY SERVE AND FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO, AND INCLUDING, SEPTEMBER 18, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 9/10/15. 9/10/15 ENTERED AND COPIES TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(er, ) Modified on 9/10/2015 (er, ). Modified on 9/15/2015 (er, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. D'ANNUNZIO on behalf of HOWARD ALTEMOS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(D'ANNUNZIO, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CITY OF ALLENTOWN.Brief and Certificate of Service.(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by DEAN F. MURTAGH on behalf of HOWARD ALTEMOS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURTAGH, DEAN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AND JOINT STIPULATION THAT THE TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE RESPONSES AND/OR AMENDED COMPLAINT TO DEFENDANTS LEHIGH COUNTY AND THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS IS EXTENDED TO 9/10/15. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/24/15. 8/24/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to File Responses and or Amended Complaint to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 8/24/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM M. BRENNAN on behalf of CITY OF ALLENTOWN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BRENNAN, WILLIAM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE UNCONTESTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT GRANTED. THE CITY OF ALLENTOWN SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 15, 2015. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 8/14/15.8/17/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS, E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PHILIP MORGENSTERN on behalf of CITY OF ALLENTOWN with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MORGENSTERN, JOHN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, filed by CITY OF ALLENTOWN.Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service.(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by RUFUS A. JENNINGS on behalf of CITY OF ALLENTOWN with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(JENNINGS, RUFUS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LEHIGH COUNTY.Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CAFFREY, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by Richard Kreitzer re: served Complaint upon Chrisina Palmer (Supervisor) on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA by Personal Service on 7/29/15, answer due 8/19/2015. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 8/13/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Returned Unexecuted by KEVIN MCCULLERS as to LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLES ASSOCIATION. Attempted service on 7/24/15, service unsuccessful.(MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 8/13/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frank Evans re: served Complaint upon CITY OF ALLENTOWN by Personal Service on 07/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 8/13/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Frank Evans re: served Complaint upon Catherine Roseberry on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY by Personal Service on 07/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 8/13/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service by Neil Poritsky re: served Complaint upon HOWARD ALTEMOS by Personal Service on 08/03/2015, answer due 8/24/2015.(MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 8/13/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA.Memorandum, Cert of Serv.(KRAMER, BARRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY W. HINKLE on behalf of CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI (HINKLE, ANTHONY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI. CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI waiver sent on 8/6/2015, answer due 10/5/2015. (WIRTH, AMY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by AMY G. WIRTH on behalf of CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI (WIRTH, AMY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY N. KRAMER on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA with Cert of Service(KRAMER, BARRY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS M. CAFFREY on behalf of LEHIGH COUNTY (CAFFREY, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRAECIPE to Issue An Alias Summons for All Defendants by KEVIN MCCULLERS. (MUSITIEF, FEEDA) Modified on 7/20/2015 (md).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against HOWARD ALTEMOS, CARLOS ROBERTO BERNARDI, CITY OF ALLENTOWN, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, JOHN DOES, LEHIGH COUNTY, LEHIGH COUNTY CONSTABLES ASSOCIATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 123740.), filed by KEVIN MCCULLERS.(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2015: # 1 Exhibit) (rt, ). (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?