Wilt v. Bosley, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00755-AH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo George E. Wilt, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Herbert J Arnold +1 410 837 0215 +1 410 837 7820
Space Gerald F Gay +1 410 837 0215 +1 410 837 7820 gfgay@aol.com
v.
No Logo D & W Truck Lines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
No Logo David Neal Bosley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by hardlaw.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Davis +1 410 727 0828 +1 410 727 5893 george@hardlaw.net
Office Baltimore
Filed 3/16/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $20000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Allegany
Terminated 11/3/2000
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 99-17277-L[CC/ALLEGANY COUNTY]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/7/2000 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and APPROVAL. (signed by Judge Alexander Harvey, II) (das, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING Case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 45 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 11/3/00) (c/i 11/6/00) (MICROFILMED 11/6/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (das, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER EXTENDING Discovery Deadline to 10/15/00. ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II ) (c/i 9/6/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of attorney appearance for George E. Wilt Jr. by Herbert J. Arnold, Gerald F. Gay. (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/4/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II 5/3/00) (c/m 5/3/00-chambers) (das, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/3/2000, Terminated: 11/3/2000 Answer
              ANSWER to Complaint by David Neal Bosley, D & W Truck Lines (Attorney George C. Davis). (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Local Rule
                Local Rule 103.5 Certification by David Neal Bosley, D & W Truck Lines, and Attachments. (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000 Local Rule
                  Local Rule 103.3 Certification by David Neal Bosley, D & W Truck Lines. (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Remark
                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL MAILED TO PARTIES/COUNSEL. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of filing of notice of removal by David Neal Bosley, filed in the Circuit Court for Allegany County. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Summons Issued
                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for David Neal Bosley in the Circuit Court for Allegany County. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Jury Demand
                          DEMAND for jury trial by George E. Wilt Jr. filed in the Circuit Court for Allegany County. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT filed in the Circuit Court for Allegany County. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Notice of Removal
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant David Neal Bosley; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1165276. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Remark
                                Pleadings 2 thru 4 are copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Allegany County. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?