District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Kentucky Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Miller v. Davis
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 0:15-cv-00044-DLB
District Judge David L. Bunning, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 8, 2018 at 6:09 AM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo April Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton & Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo Barry W. Spartman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo Jody Fernandez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo Karen Ann Roberts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo Kevin Holloway, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo L. Aaron Skaggs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo Shantel Burke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
No Logo Stephen Napier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Kentucky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Sharp +1 502 581 9746 sharp@aclu-ky.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Daniel Walton Adams, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Joe Dunman +1 502 561 2005

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J. Canon +1 502 561 2005 +1 502 589 5500 dan@dancanonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas E. Clay, PSC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura E. Landenwich +1 502 583 1000 laura@justiceky.com
v.
No Logo Kim Davis, Defendant
No Logo Rowan County, Kentucky, Defendant
No Logo Kim Davis, Official Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (220) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Third-Party Defendants Gov. Matthew G. Bevin and Commissioner of the Kentucky Dept. for Libraries and Archives Terry Manuel's Motion to Amend DE 208 be, and is hereby, DENIED. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/22/17.(KSS)cc: COR
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to 199 Report and Recommendations filed by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/10/2017 to add link to objection (KSS). (Entered: 04/07/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Kim Davis and Rowan County, Kentucky shall file a written response to Plaintiffs' Objections on or before Monday, April 10, 2017. Any Reply should be filed by Plaintiffs on or before Monday, May 1, 2017. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 3/21/17.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 03/21/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS to 199 Report and Recommendations filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (KSS) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          INCORRECTLY FILED AS NOTICE OF FILING by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman re 199 Report and Recommendations, Terminate Motions,, Plaintiffs' Objections to Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (Sharp, William) Modified on 3/21/2017 Please see DE 201 for correct filing (KSS). (Entered: 03/20/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 199 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
            RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION AND ORDER: (1) IT IS ORDERED that the motion to strike R. 195 is DENIED; and (2) IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Plaintiffs' motions for fees R. 183 be DENIED. Specific objs to this R&R must be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of service thereof or further appeal is waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 3/6/17.(KSS)cc: COR
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Response to motion
              RESPONSE to Motion re 195 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Reply, or Alternatively, Leaave to File Sur-Reply 194 Reply to Response to Motion, by Rowan County, Kentucky filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, William)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Notice of change of address
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Leonard Joe Dunman (Dunman, Leonard)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 response in opposition to motion
                RESPONSE in Opposition (Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion) re 195 MOTION to Strike 194 Reply to Response to Motion, by Rowan County, Kentucky , 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/30/2016 (KSS).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Motion to strike
                  MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Reply, or Alternatively, Leaave to File Sur-Reply 194 Reply to Response to Motion, by Rowan County, Kentucky (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/30/2016 to further describe (KSS).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Reply to Response to motion
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Sharp, William)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 response in opposition to motion
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kim Davis)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 response in opposition to motion
                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 191 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                      ORDER: The unopposed motion for extension of time 190 is GRANTED. Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff shall file her response to Plaintiffs Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs DE 183 on or before October 31, 2016. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/27/16. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 letterCourt Filing
                          Letter from Betty Crawford filed in record per chambers of Judge Caldwell (SMT) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: 10/13/2016 Court Filing
                            ORDER: Upon Motion of Defendant Rowan Co. Ky and the Court being otherwise fully advised and informed, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attys Fees and Costs is GRANTED. Defendant Rowan County shall have up to and including October 27, 2016 to file its Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attys Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/13/16.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: 10/12/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Unopposed) as to 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman by Rowan County, Kentucky (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/13/2016 (KSS). (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: 10/11/2016 Court Filing
                                ORDER: The motion 185 is GRANTED. Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff shall file her response to Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs DE 183 on or before October 27, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/11/16.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: 10/10/2016 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                  CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 183 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: 9/21/2016 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                    ORDER REFERRING MOTION: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees DE 183 is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for review and preparation of a Report and Recommendation. Motions referred to Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/20/16.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 183 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1-Marriage License Miller/Roberts, # 3 Exhibit 2-Marriage License Skaggs/Spartman, # 4 Exhibit 3-Dec. Belzley, # 5 Exhibit 4-Dec. Sharp, # 6 Exhibit 5-Dec. Canon, # 7 Exhibit 6-Dec. Esseks, # 8 Exhibit 7-Dec. Clark, # 9 Exhibit 8-Dec. Mach, # 10 Proposed Order)(Weaver, Heather) Modified on 9/20/2016 to describe exhibits (KSS). (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 182 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED as follows: (1) In Miller v. Davis, et al, 0:15-cv-44, Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify a Class DE 31 , Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss DE 32 , Defendant Kim Davis' Motion for Preliminary Injunction DE 39 , Third-Party Defendant Steven Beshear's Motion to Dismiss DE 92 , and Third-Party Defendant Matt Bevin's Motion to Dismiss DE 157 be, and are, hereby DENIED AS MOOT; (2) The stays imposed in Ermold et al v. Davis, et al, 0:15-cv-46, and Yates, et al v. Davis, et al, 0:15-cv-62, be and are, hereby LIFTED; (3) In Ermold, et al v. Davis, et al, 0:15-cv-46, Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss DE 11 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Briefing Schedule DE 14 be, and are, hereby DENIED AS MOOT; (4) The CJA Attorneys representing the Rowan County Deputy Clerks be, and are, hereby DISCHARGED from further service in this matter; and (5) The three above-captioned actions be, and are, hereby DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/18/16.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: 8/18/2016 Court Filing
                                        ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Court's Order of August 12, 2015 DE 43 , granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and the Court's Order of September 3, 2015, modifying the injunction DE 74 be, and are, hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/18/16.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 08/18/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: 8/4/2016 USCA Mandate
                                          MANDATE of USCA: Pursuant to the court's disposition that was filed 7/13/2016 the mandate for this case hereby issues today as to 44 Notice of Appeal, 82 Notice of Appeal by Kim Davis (Attachments: # 1 6CCA letter)(KSS) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 INFORMATION COPY
                                            INFORMATION COPY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT of USCA as to 44 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kim Davis, 82 Notice of Appeal filed by Kim Davis; the appeals are DISMISSED and REMAND this matter to the district court with instructions to vacate its August 12, 2015 preliminary injunction order and its September 3, 2015 order modifying that injunction. Mandate to issue. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Cover Letter)(KSS) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: 7/13/2016 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Jonathan D. Christman, Esq. is withdrawn as an attorney of record for Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Kim Davis in this matter. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/13/16. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Jonathan D. Christman, Esq. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING by Melissa Thompson (Markelonis, Andy) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS REPORT by Roberta Earley. (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                      STATUS REPORT by Chrissy Plank. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER of USCA as to 66 Notice of Appeal filed by Kim Davis. Order filed granting motion to dismiss parties Matthew G. Bevin and Wayne Onkst and to dismiss case 15-5961 for lack of jurisdiction. No mandate to issue. (Attachments: # 1 6CCA Cover letter)(KSS) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Matthew G. Bevin, Terry Manuel of Substitution of Third-Party Defendant (Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 157 MOTION to Dismiss by Wayne Onkst, Matthew G. Bevin Third-Party Complaint MOTION to Expedite by Wayne Onkst, Matthew G. Bevin Consideration filed by Matthew G. Bevin, Wayne Onkst. (Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Chrissy Plank. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Roberta Earley. (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING by Melissa Thompson (Markelonis, Andy) (Entered: 02/21/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING Status Report by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) Modified on 2/17/2016 to further describe (KSS). (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            VIRTUAL ORDER: denying 159 Motion for Order by Brian Mason However, the Court's prior Order requiring Status Reports by CJA counsel every thirty (30) days 130 is modified to only require the filing of Status Reports every ninety (90) days. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/10/2016. (SKV)cc: COR (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by Kim Russell re 159 MOTION for Order by Brian Mason (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce 120 DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/9/2016. (SKV) cc: COR (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 157 MOTION to Dismiss by Wayne Onkst, Matthew G. Bevin Third-Party Complaint MOTION to Expedite by Wayne Onkst, Matthew G. Bevin Consideration filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Order by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2016: # 1 Proposed Order) (TDA). (Entered: 02/02/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE to 156 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Mar, Ria) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Wayne Onkst, Matthew G. Bevin Third-Party Complaint, MOTION to Expedite by Wayne Onkst, Matthew G. Bevin Consideration (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Executive Order 2015-048, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Press Release of Liberty Counsel, # 4 Proposed Order - Granting Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Proposed Order - Granting Motion for Expedited Consideration)(Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by Kim Davis, Kim Davis of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Davis' Third-Party Complaint and Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce September 3 and September 8 Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Governor Bevin's Executive Order 2015-048 Relating to the Commonwealth's Marriage License Form (December 22, 2015))(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/24/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst of Substitution of Third-Party Defendant (Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING by Melissa Thompson (Markelonis, Andy) (Entered: 12/06/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Chrissy Plank. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Roberta Earley. (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION for Order by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman Motion to Enforce filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fernandez Declaration)(Mar, Ria) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Order by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman Motion to Enforce filed by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst. (Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA: Order filed denying renewed motion to stay injunction pending appeal R.57 (Attachments: # 1 Cover letter)(KSS) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING by Melissa Thompson (Markelonis, Andy) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Chrissy Plank. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Roberta Earley. (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      INCORRECT STATUS REPORT by Roberta Earley. (Clark, Jeremy) Modified on 11/4/2015 to reflect incorrect pdf attached by counsel(KSS). (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA as to 83 Notice of Appeal as to 75 Order filed by Kim Davis. The release of Davis from custody largely if not entirely moots her request for an emergency stay of the contempt sanction, and her motion for a stay is therefore DENIED (Attachments: # 1 USCA Cover Letter)(KSS) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Briefing and Expedite Consideration DE 115 is DENIED. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/26/15. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 MOTION to Reopen Briefing and Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Sharp, William) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce DE 120 is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: Plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum in support of their Motion to Enforce DE 120 within seven (7) days of service of Third-Party Defendants' response. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/21/15. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 120 MOTION for Order by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman Motion to Enforce by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, William) Modified on 10/21/2015 to add "unopposed" (KSS). (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Third-Party Defendants, Gov. Beshear and Comm. Onkst, shall file a written response to Plf's Motion to Enforce DE 120 within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order. Within their response the Third-Party Defendants shall address the validity of the marriage licenses issued by the Rowan County Clerk's Office on or after September 14, 2015. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/14/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 MOTION to Reopen Briefing and Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 120 MOTION for Order by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman Motion to Enforce filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 115 MOTION to Reopen Briefing and Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that CJA counsel for the five (5) deputy clerks who indicated they would comply with the Court's Order shall file Status Reports every thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order, unless otherwise excused by the Court. In these filings, counsel shall continue to report on their clients' respective compliance with the Court's Orders of August 12, 2015 and September 3, 2015. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/6/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SECOND STATUS REPORT by Roberta Earley. (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Chrissy Plank. (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING by Melissa Thompson (Markelonis, Andy) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 10/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst Third-Party Complaint filed by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Sixth Circuit Order, # 2 Exhibit 2: Motion to Dismiss Appeal, # 3 Exhibit 3: Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal)(Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE BRIEF to Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Christman, Jonathan) Modified on 9/25/2015 to create link to Motion 92 (KSS). (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roberta Earley. Amendment to 119 Notice of Filing to correct paragraph two. (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Kim Davis' Emergency Motion to Stay the Court's Injunction Order of September 3, 2015 Pending Appeal DE 113 be, and is, hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/23/15. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Order by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman Motion to Enforce (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Marriage License, # 2 Proposed Order)(Weaver, Heather) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING by Roberta Earley (Clark, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 118 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING by Chrissy Plank (Fox, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by Melissa Thompson (Markelonis, Andy) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING by Kim Russell re 89 Order,,,, (Joy, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite by Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weaver, Heather) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING by Brian Mason (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay re 74 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis Pending Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion for Immediate Consideration and Motion to Stay September 3, 2015 Injunction Order Pending Appeal, # 2 Exhibit A: Kim Davis' Emergency Motion to Stay filed in Sixth Circuit on September 11, 2015, # 3 Exhibit B: Plaintiffs' response to Motion to Stay filed in the Sixth Circuit on September 15, 2015, # 4 Exhibit C: Third-Party Defendants' response to Motion to Stay filed in the Sixth Circuit on September 15, 2015, # 5 Exhibit D: Kim Davis' Reply Brief in support of Motion to Stay filed in the Sixth Circuit on September 16, 2015, # 6 Exhibit E: Sixth Circuit Motions Panel Decision dated September 17, 2015, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion for Immediate Consideration and Motion to Stay September 3, 2015 Injunction Order Pending Appeal)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA: Order filed denying motion to stay injunction pending appeal for failure to comply with Rule 8(a)(1) 43 filed by Mr. Roger K. Gannam (Attachments: # 1 USCA Cover Letter)(KSS) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Jeremy L. Clark for Roberta Earley. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Andy Markelonis for Melissa Thompson. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Sebastian Joy for Kim Russell. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Richard A. Hughes for Brian Mason. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Michael B. Fox for Chrissy Plank. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Michael R. Campbell for Nathaniel Davis. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 104 MOTION for James D. Esseks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman(Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3306144). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/16/15. (KSS)cc: COR, Esseks (via US Mail w/ECF packet) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for James D. Esseks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3306144) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, William) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Davis' Motion for Injunctive Relief DE 70 be, and is, hereby DENIED. Davis retains the right to reassert her claim for injunctive relief on state law grounds in the appropriate state court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/11/15. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 93 MOTION for Daniel I. Mach to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3301110), 95 MOTION for Heather L. Weaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3301132), 99 MOTION for Horatio G. Mihet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3303754), 94 MOTION for Ria Tabacco Mar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3301118). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/11/15. (KSS)cc: COR, Attorneys Mach, Weaver, Mar, Mihet (via US Mail w/ECF packet) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 92 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst Third-Party Complaint by Kim Davis. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff Kim Davis shall file a written response to Third-Party Defendants Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint 92 by close of business on Thursday, September 24, 2015. Third-Party Defendants shall submit their reply brief by close of business on Tuesday, September 29, 2015. Upon filing of the reply, the clerk shall submit the motion to the undersigned's chambers for decision. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/11/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 92 MOTION to Dismiss by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst Third-Party Complaint by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (UNOPPOSED) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Gannam, Roger) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Horatio G. Mihet to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis, Kim Davis ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3303754) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Horatio G. Mihet, Esq., # 2 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing for Horatio G. Mihet, Esq.)(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Copy of) USCA for SIXTH CIRCUIT LETTER directing the appellee(s) to respond to motion to stay injunction pending appeal on or before close of business Tuesday, September 15, 2015 (Attachments: # 1 Appellant's Motion to Stay Injunction)(KSS) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal of This Court's August 25, 2015 Order by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Upon the Court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED that Third-Party Plaintiff Kim Davis shall file a written response to Third-Party Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint DE 92 by close of business on Monday, September 14, 2015. Third-Party Defendants shall submit their reply brief by close of business on Wednesday, September 16, 2015. Upon the filing of the reply, the Clerk shall submit the motion to the undersigned's chambers for decision. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/10/15.(KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Heather L. Weaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3301132) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, William) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 9/6/2015, Entered: 9/6/2015 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. Amendment to [44] Notice of Appeal, Amended Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: September 3, 2015 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Hold Defendant Kim Davis in Contempt of Court (D.E. 75), # (2) Exhibit B: September 3, 2015 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Rule 62(c) to Clarify the Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal (D.E. 74), # (3) Exhibit C: August 12, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order (D.E. 43))(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Ria Tabacco Mar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3301118) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, William) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/5/2015, Entered: 9/5/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: MOTION HEARING held on 09/03/2015 before Judge David L. Bunning. Court Reporter: Sandra L. Wilder, Telephone number (859) 516-4114. Transcript ordered by: HON. JONATHAN D. CHRISTMAN. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 10/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2015.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Daniel I. Mach to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 0643-3301110) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, William) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Allow Interview of Kim Davis by Cable News Network, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Flores, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst Third-Party Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 6/26/15 Beshear Letter, # 3 Proposed Order)(Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Witness ListCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List for Hearing on Motion held 9/3/15 before Judge David L. Bunning. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal of This Court's August 25, 2015 Order by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) filed by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Vance, Palmer) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR Hearing on Motion before Judge David L. Bunning. This matter was called for a hearing on the Plaintiffs Motion to Hold Defendant Kim Davis in Contempt of Court (DE # 67) in Ashland, Kentucky, with parties present, by counsel, as noted above. Having heard arguments from counsel and testimony of witnesses, and the Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, IT IS ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1) There being no objection from the parties, Kentucky Senate President Robert Stivers Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in support of Defendants (DE # 73) is GRANTED. 2) By agreement of the parties, Third Party Defendants shall have until close of businesson Tuesday, September 8, 2015 to respond to Defendant Davis Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal (Doc. # 70). Defendant Davis shall have until close of business on Thursday, September 10, 2015 to file her reply brief. The parties are advised that these deadlineshave been expedited. 3) The Court appoints MICHAEL R. CAMPBELL as counsel for Rowan County Deputy Clerk Nathaniel Davis. MICHAEL B. FOX is appointed as counsel for Rowan County Deputy Clerk Chrissy Plank. RICHARD A. HUGHES is appointed as counsel for Rowan County Deputy Clerk Brian Mason. SEBASTIAN JOY is appointed as counsel for Rowan County Deputy Clerk Kim Russell. ANDY MARKELONIS is appointed as counsel for Rowan County Deputy Clerk Melissa Thompson. JEREMY CLARK is appointed as counsel for Rowan County Chief Deputy Clerk Roberta Earley. 4) After hearing arguments from counsel and testimony from witnesses, the Court finds Defendant Davis in contempt of the Courts Order of August 12, 2015, for reasons stated on the record. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion to Hold Defendant Kim Davis in Contempt of Court (DE # 67) is GRANTED. Defendant Davis shall be remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal pending compliance of the Courts Order of August 12, 2015, or until such time as the Court vacates the contempt Order. 5) Defendant Davis oral motion to stay enforcement of the Courts contempt order pending review of the Courts August 12, 2015 Order by the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals is DENIED. Defendant Davis oral motion to certify the contempt order for appeal is DENIED. 6) Defendant Davis oral motion to suspend any sentence until the Kentucky Legislature convenes is DENIED. (Court Reporter Sandy Wilder.) (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VIRTUAL ORDER: finding as moot 81 Motion Permission to Interview Defendant Kim Davis by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., 85 Motion for Orderby NBCUniversal Media, LLC Allowing Interview of Kim Davis; 77 Motion to Allow Interview of Kim Davis by Cable News Network, Inc.Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/8/15. (KSS)cc: COR (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Rule 62(c) to Clarify the Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: The Court's August 12, 2015 preliminary injunction order, R[43] is hereby modified to state that Defendant Kim Davis, in her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk, is hereby preliminarily enjoined from applying her "no marriage licenses" policy to future marriage license requests submitted by Plaintiffs or by other individuals who are legally eligible to marry in Kentucky. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/3/15. (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: 1. Defendant Davis shall be released from the custody of the U.S. Marshal forthwith. Defendant Davis shall not interfere in any way, directly or indirectly, with the efforts of her deputy clerks to issue marriage licenses to all legally eligible couples. If Defendant Davis should interfere in any way with their issuance, that will be considered a violation of this Order and appropriate sanctions will be considered. 2. CJA counsel for the five (5) deputy clerks who indicated they would comply with the Court's Order shall file a Status Report every fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order unless otherwise excused by the Court. Within those reports Counsel shall report on their clients' respective compliance with the Court's August 12, 2015 Order enjoining the Rowan County Clerk from enforcing her "no marriage licenses" policy, as well as its Order of September 3, 2015 requiring them to issue marriage licenses to all eligible couples in compliance with the Court's prior Order. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/8/15.(KSS)cc: COR, USMS (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015, Terminated: 9/3/2015 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File by Robert Stivers (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support Tendered Brief, # (2) Proposed Order Order)(Fleenor, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, C. Timothy Cone. 85 MOTION for Order by NBCUniversal Media, LLC Allowing Interview of Kim Davis has been filed by NBCUniversal without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [67] MOTION to Compel by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk). (Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Aaron Silletto. 81 MOTION for permission to interview Defendant Kim Davis by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. has been filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Telephone Conference held on September 1, 2015 before Judge David L. Bunning. Court Reporter: Lisa Reed Wiesman, Telephone number 859-291-4410. Transcript ordered by: Roger K. Gannam, Esq. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 9/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2015.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Mark Flores. 77 MOTION to Allow Interview of Kim Davis by Cable News Network, Inc. has been filed by Cable News Network, Inc. without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (KSS) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal of This Court's August 25, 2015 Order by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal of This Court's August 25, 2015 Order, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal of This Court's August 25, 2015 Order)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order by NBCUniversal Media, LLC Allowing Interview of Kim Davis (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cone, C.) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 9/1/2015 before Judge David L. Bunning. IT IS ORDERED that this matter be, and is, hereby set for a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Hold Defendant Kim Davis in Contempt of Court DE[67] on Thursday, September 3, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Ashland, Kentucky. Defendant Davis and each of her deputy clerks shall be present at the hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant Davis wishes to file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion DE[67], it shall be filed by close of business on September 2, 2015, and shall not exceed five (5) pages in length. (Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman.). Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/1/15. (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Issued Licenses, # 2 Exhibit B - Davis Testimony)(Canon, Daniel) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015, Terminated: 9/3/2015 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct [43] Memorandum Opinion & Order by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Miller Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sharp, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 75 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Contempt Hearing, Add and Terminate Attorneys, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3299683. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: September 3, 2015 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Hold Defendant Kim Davis in Contempt of Court (D.E. 75))(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015, Terminated: 9/3/2015 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Miller Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sharp, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 74 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3299672. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: September 3, 2015 Order (D.E. 74))(Christman, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number 15-5961 Case Manager Michelle M. Davis for [66] Notice of Appeal filed by Kim Davis. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: 9/7/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for permission to interview Defendant Kim Davis by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Silletto, Aaron) (Entered: 09/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: 8/31/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [58] Order, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk). Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3294835. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: August 25, 2015 Order)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: 9/7/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiffs, by and through counsel, shall file a status report not later than 10:00 a.m. eastern standard time on Tuesday, September 8, 2015 informing the Court of whether any of the named Plaintiffs have had a marriage license issued to them by the Rowan County Clerk's office and shall attach a copy of any such license(s) to their status report. The Clerk shall send notice of this order to all counsel of record and CJA counsel appointed to represent the Rowan County deputy clerks. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 9/7/2015.(TJZ)cc: COR (Entered: 09/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    USCA Case Number 15-5880 Case Manager Michelle M. Davis for [44] Notice of Appeal filed by Kim Davis. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VIRTUAL ORDER: denying Defendant Davis' [62] Motion to extend temporary stay of injunction order pending final resolution of Davis' emergency application to stay preliminary injunction pending appeal filed in the United States Supreme Court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/28/15. (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to [63] filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Emergency Application to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal)(Gannam, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [62] MOTION re [52] Order on Motion to Stay, [55] Order,,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) [MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY STAY OF INJUNCTION ORDER] filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Davis 6th Circuit Reply Brief, # (2) Exhibit 6th Circuit Order Denying Stay, # (3) Proposed Order)(Sharp, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015, Terminated: 8/28/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION re [52] Order on Motion to Stay, [55] Order,,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) [MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY STAY OF INJUNCTION ORDER] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Temporary Stay)(Gannam, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Order to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 1. That the third-party defendants shall have until and including September 11, 2015 by which to serve their pleadings and/or papers in response to the Third-Party Complaint DE[34]. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/27/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motion Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: re [60] Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Steven L. Beshear, Kim Davis, Wayne Onkst (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015, Terminated: 8/27/2015 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Steven L. Beshear, Kim Davis, Wayne Onkst. (Vance, Palmer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst. (Vance, Palmer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Update. Attorney William M. Lear, Jr for Steven L. Beshear,William M. Lear, Jr for Wayne Onkst added. (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that briefing on Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss [32] and Motion for Preliminary Injunction [39] be, and is, hereby STAYED pending review of the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order [43] by the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. A briefing schedule on the Motions will be set by subsequent order after the Sixth Circuit renders its decision. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/25/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        VIRTUAL ORDER: Plaintiffs having filed no opposition to the MOTION, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Kim Davis' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class [42] is GRANTED. Defendant Davis' response to said motion is due 30 days after the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals renders its decision on the appeal of the Court's granting of Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/25/15. (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to [42] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk). (Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ; on 8/17/15 this court entered an order [52] denying dft Kim Davis' motion to stay the 8/12/15 order [43] granting pla a prel inj enjoining dft Davis from enforcing her "no marriage licenses" policy against pla; however, in deference to the 6CCA the court temporarily stayed its 8/12/15 order to give and appellate court an opportunity to review, on an expedited basis, the 8/17/15 order denying the motion to stay; upon review of FRAP 8(a)(2) governing stays of injunctions pending appeal the court finds it necessary to set an expiration date for temporary stay; IT IS ORDERED that the court's stay of its 8/17/15 order shall expire on 8/31/15; absent to the contrary by the 6CCA. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/19/15.(SMT)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Telephone Conference for dates of August 10, 2015 before Judge David L. Bunning, re [44] Notice of Appeal,. Court Reporter: Lisa Reed Wiesman, Telephone number 859-291-4410. Transcript ordered by: Jonathan D. Christman, Esq.. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2015.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) via summons on person designated by law to accept service of process to Steven L. Beshear served on 8/10/2015, answer due 8/31/2015. (Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: 8/17/2015 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying [45] Motion to Stay; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order denying Kim Davis Motion to Stay be TEMPORARILY STAYED pending review of dft Davis' motion to stay [45] by the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/17/15. (SMT)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motion Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: re [45] MOTION to Stay re [43] Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [45] MOTION to Stay re [43] Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Ltr. to V. Puente, et al., Demanding Correction Pursuant to Ky. Rev. Stat. ยงยง 411.051, 411.061, dated Aug. 14, 2015)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Docket Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO William Sharp re [46] Response in Opposition to Motion; Error: Attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit 1," "Exhibit 2." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel cc: COR (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiffs having already filed their Response in Opposition DE[46] to Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Stay DE[45] the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order of August 12, 2015 DE[43], and the Court being otherwise sufficiently advised, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Kim Davis shall submit her reply brief by close of business on Friday, August 14, 2015. Davis' reply shall be limited to five (5) pages. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/13/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Order on Motion for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VIRTUAL ORDER: granting [37] Motion for Leave by Defendant Rowan County, Kentucky. Defendant Rowan County's Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (37-2) shall be filed and docketed by the Clerk, nunc pro tunc to August 7, 2015. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/13/15. (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a written response to Defendant's Motion to Stay DE[45] by close of business on Friday, August 14, 2015. Defendant's reply brief shall be due by close of business on Monday, August 17, 2015. Upon the filing of the reply, the Clerk shall submit the Motion to Stay to the undersigned's chambers for review. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/13/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [45] MOTION to Stay re [43] Memorandum Opinion & Order by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - wkyt.com web page article 8/13/15, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of April Miller, PhD, # (3) Proposed Order)(Sharp, William) Modified on 8/14/2015 to describe exhibits (KSS).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015, Terminated: 8/17/2015 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay re [43] Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Kim Davis' Motion to Stay the August 12, 2015 Injunction Order Pending Appeal, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Kim Davis' Motion to Stay the August 12, 2015 Injunction Order Pending Appeal)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [43] Memorandum Opinion & Order, Terminate Motions,,,, by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk). Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0643-3282893. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: August 12, 2015 Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction DE[2] against Defendant Kim Davis, in her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk, is hereby granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Kim Davis, in her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk, is hereby preliminarily enjoined from applying her "no marriage licenses" policy to future marriage license requests submitted by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/12/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015, Terminated: 8/25/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [31] MOTION to Certify Class by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: E-mails between counsel re: request for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/10/2015 before Judge David L. Bunning. Matter called for further hearing on Plf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction DE[2] with parties present, by counsel, as noted above. The Court having heard counsel and testimony of witnesses and being otherwise sufficiently advised, ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1) After hearing arguments from the parties, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction DE[2] STANDS SUBMITTED (Court Reporter Peggy Weber.) (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) via service of summons on person designated by law to accept service of process to Wayne Onkst served on 8/10/2015, answer due 8/31/2015. (Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 RESPONSE BRIEF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of Defendant Rowan County, In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Rowan County, Kentucky.(Filed pursuant to Virtual Order DE#48)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kim Davis, Kim Davis(In her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk) (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Kim Davis' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # (2) Exhibit A: Verified Third-Party Complaint of Defendant Kim Davis, # (3) Exhibit B: July 13, 2015 Hearing Transcript, # (4) Exhibit C: July 20, 2015 Hearing Transcript, # (5) Exhibit D: Kentucky LRC Reports on Kentucky RFRA, # (6) Exhibit E: Prefiled Kentucky House Bill for January 2016 general session to protect religious liberties, # (7) Proposed Order Granting Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Kim Davis' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court having reviewed the briefing on Plf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Docs [2][28][29] and [36] and being otherwise sufficiently advised, IT IS ORDERED that this matter be, and is, hereby set for a telephonic conference on Monday, August 10, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.. The parties shall be prepared to address the pursuit of injunctive relief against Def Davis in her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk. Arguments shall be limited to fifteen (15) mins per side. No further briefing shall be permitted. The parties must dial in to this conference at least five (5) mins in advance of the scheduled time by the steps herein. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 8/7/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015, Terminated: 8/13/2015 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave by Rowan County, Kentucky (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Supplement Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Mando, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman. (Sharp, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    VERIFIED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (corrected filing to include summonses) against Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst, filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Pre-Obergefell KDLA marriage license form (Def. Ex. 2), # (2) Exhibit B. 1/23/15 Letter to Senator Robertson from Kim Davis (Def. Ex. 1), # (3) Exhibit C. 6/26/15 Letter from Governor Beshear to County Clerks (Def. Ex. 4), # (4) Exhibit D. Post-Obergefell KDLA marriage license form (Def. Ex. 3), # (5) Exhibit E. 7/8/15 Letter from Kim Davis to Governor Beshear (Def. Ex. 5), # (6) Summons Governor Steven L. Beshear, # (7) Summons State Librarian and Commissioner Wayne Onkst)(Gannam, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INCORRECTLY FILED VERIFIED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Steven L. Beshear, Wayne Onkst, filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A. Pre-Obergefell KDLA marriage license form (Def. Ex. 2), # (2) Exhibit B. 1/23/15 Letter to Senator Robertson from Kim Davis (Def. Ex. 1), # (3) Exhibit C. 6/26/15 Letter from Governor Beshear to County Clerks (Def. Ex. 4), # (4) Exhibit D. Post-Obergefell KDLA marriage license form (Def. Ex. 3), # (5) Exhibit E. 7/8/15 Letter from Kim Davis to Governor Beshear (Def. Ex. 5))(Gannam, Roger) Modified on 8/5/2015 TO STATE INCORRECTLY FILED SEE ENTRY 34 FOR CORRECT ENTRY (SMT).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by Kim Davis, Kim Davis (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, # (2) Proposed Order Granting Defendant Kim Davis' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/2/2015, Entered: 8/2/2015 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Certify Class by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(Sharp, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: 7/31/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plf's Reply Brief shall address Dft Rowan County's arguments re the pursuit of injunctive relief against Dft Kim Davis in her official capacity. Specifically, Plf's shall explain (1) whether they intend to pursue injunctive relief against Dft Kim Davis in her official capacity and/or individual capacity; and (2) if Plf's still intend to pursue injunctive relief against Dft Kim Davis in her official capacity, the legal basis for doing so. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/31/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: July 13, 2015 Hearing Transcript, # (2) Exhibit B: July 20, 2015 Hearing Transcript, # (3) Exhibit C: Copies of Davis Exhibits 1 through 5 admitted at July 20, 2015, # (4) Exhibit D: Collection of Kentucky marriage law provisions from Chapter 402 of KRS, # (5) Exhibit E: Kentucky RFRA, # (6) Exhibit F: Governor Beshear Press Release dated June 26, 2015, # (7) Exhibit G: News Article re: issuance of marriage licenses in Boyd County dated July 9, 2015, # (8) Exhibit H: News Article re: issuance of marriage licenses in Kenton County dated June 29, 2015, # (9) Exhibit I: Governor Beshear Press Release dated July 9, 2015, # (10) Exhibit J: Governor Beshear Press Release dated July 7, 2015, # (11) Exhibit K: Governor Beshear Public Statement on July 21, 2015, # (12) Exhibit L: Attorney General Conways Public Statement on March 4, 2014, # (13) Exhibit M: Governor Beshear Press Release dated March 4, 2014, # (14) Exhibit N: Kentucky LRC Reports on Kentucky RFRA, # (15) Exhibit O: News Article re: fees paid by Kentucky to defend Kentucky marriage law dated May 20, 2015, # (16) Exhibit P: News Article re: Governor Beshears appeal in Bourke v. Beshear dated March 4, 2014, # (17) Exhibit Q: News Article re: hiring of private law firm after Attorney General Conway refused to defend Kentucky marriage law dated April 18, 2014, # (18) Exhibit R: News Article re: July 20, 2015 hearing dated July 21, 2015, # (19) Exhibit S: News Article re: Kentucky legislature general session dated July 10, 2015, # (20) Exhibit T: Prefiled Kentucky House Bill for January 2016 general session to protect religious liberties, # (21) Exhibit U: Map of Kentucky counties)(Christman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman filed by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/13/2015 to reflect Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition filed 8/7/15 at DE#49 per Order DE#48 (KSS).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with Jury Demand by Rowan County, Kentucky.(Mando, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on July 20, 2015 before Judge David L. Bunning. Court Reporter: Lisa Reed Wiesman, Telephone number 859-291-4410. Transcript ordered by: Roger K. Gannam, Esq. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 8/17/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2015.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness and Exhibit List from Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/20/2015 in COVINGTON. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION HEARING held on 7/20/2015 re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction before Judge David L. Bunning. Court reconvened to conclude evidentiary portion of preliminary injunction hearing; IT IS ORDERED as follows: 1) Dft Kim Davis' oral motion to dismiss Plf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction R.[2] is denied. 2) The Clerk is directed to submit Plf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction DE[2] to the undersigned chambers for decision upon the filing of Dft's written response and Plf's reply (Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman.) (KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Gannam, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Kim Davis' counsel shall formally enter their appearances in advance of the hearing set for Monday, July 20, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Covington. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/17/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  File Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: [23] NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Attorneys Gannam, Christman (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Preliminary Injunction held on 07-13-2015 before Judge Bunning. Court Reporter: Peggy W. Weber, Telephone number 859-421-0814. Transcript ordered by: Roger Gannam, Esq.. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must follow the Court's policy regarding the Redaction Responsibility of Counsel and Parties. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. Sample forms, i.e., a Notice of Intent to Redact, may be found on the court website by clicking on Local Forms. If there are no redactions requested, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available via PACER 90 days from today's date. The Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Redaction Request due 8/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2015.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Ann Roberts, Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Barry W. Spartman, Kevin Holloway, Kim Davis, April Miller, Stephen Napier, L. Aaron Skaggs via Certified Mail to (Attachments: # (1) Receipt Blevins Receipt)(Canon, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Ann Roberts, Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Barry W. Spartman, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, L. Aaron Skaggs via Personal Service to (Sharp, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall RECONVENE before the Court on Monday, July 20, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Covington. The parties shall come prepared to CONCLUDE the evidentiary portion of the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/15/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INCORRECTLY FILED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Ann Roberts, Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier via certified mail, Restricted Delivery, Return Receipt to Rowan County, Kentucky served on 7/9/2015, answer due 7/30/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Certified Mail Slips, # (2) screen Shot showing deliveryc, # (3) return receipt)(Landenwich, Laura) Modified on 7/16/2015 See DE[20] for correction (KSS).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Action Striking a Document from the Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re [13] Summons Returned Executed, [12] Summons Returned Executed, was an INCOMPLETE PDF document (only page 2 of the summons was presented) filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Summons within seven (7) calendar days. In addition please file the green card showing the date and signature on which summons was executed *CD* cc: COR (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kim Davis, Kim Davis. (Donahue, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rowan County, Kentucky. (Mando, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STRICKEN FROM DOCKET AS AN IN COMPLETE DOCUMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STRICKEN FROM DOCKET AS AN INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 ECF Mandatory NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Cecil R. Watkins, non-registered re [10] Motion Hearing minute order HAD TO BE MAILED TO, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR, with ecf packet (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney Update. Attorney Claire E. Parsons for Rowan County, Kentucky added. (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 7/13/2015. (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 7/13/2015 re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; matter was called with parties present; during hearing counsel advised that dft Kim Davis had not yet been formally served; court having heard counsel and testimony of witnesses and 1) dft Kim Davis oral motion to continue hearing and deny motion for prel inj w/o prej for lack of service on dft is denied; Counsel for Kim Davis oral motion to certify that issue for Sixth Circuit is is also denied 2) pla oral motion to convert to a TRO hearing is denied 3) the evidentiary portion of the hearing is continued generally as set forth in paragraph six herein 4) dft shall be prepared to produce evidence of the Rowan County Clerk's formal functions and duties at the reconvened hearing 5) dfts written Responses due by 7/30/2015, and pla Replies due NLT 7 days thereafter; 6) pla shall file forthwith a notice of service as soon as dft Kim Davis has been formally served; upon filing of that Notice, the court will reconvene the evidentiary portion of the prel. inj hearing in Covington on a date not earlier than 7/20/15; the court will contact counsel prior to scheduling that reconvened hearing. before Judge David L. Bunning: (Court Reporter Peggy Weber.) (SMT)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Update. Attorney Anthony Charles Donahue for Kim Davis,Anthony Charles Donahue for Kim Davis,Jeffrey C. Mando,Cecil R. Watkins for Rowan County, Kentucky added. (SMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VIRTUAL ORDER: granting [8] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roger K. Gannam for Kim Davis granting [7] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan D. Christman for Kim Davis. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/9/2015. (KSS)cc: COR, Gannam, Christman (via US Mail w/ECF packet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015, Terminated: 7/9/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Roger K. Gannam to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Kim Davis (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing Florida, # (2) Exhibit B-Request for certificate, # (3) Exhibit C-The Florida Bar webpage, # (4) Cover letter, # (5) Receipt)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015, Terminated: 7/9/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Jonathan D. Christman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Kim Davis (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania, # (2) Cover letter, # (3) Receipt)(KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motion Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: re [7] MOTION for Jonathan D. Christman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kim Davis; [8] MOTION for Roger K. Gannam to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kim Davis (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Bar Status Check completed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jonathan D. Christman, Roger K. Gannam re [7] MOTION for Jonathan D. Christman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis; [8] MOTION for Roger K. Gannam to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kim Davis (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Notice to Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY L. Joe Dunman by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: IT IS ORDERED that this matter be and is, hereby scheduled for a preliminary injunction hearing on Monday, July 13, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Ashland, Ky before Judge David L. Bunning. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/6/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the above-styled action is hereby REASSIGNED to Honorable David L. Bunning, Judge of the Eastern District of Kentucky, for all further proceedings. Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr recused. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/6/15.(KSS)cc: COR
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motion Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review: re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  File Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Bunning for review upon filing of [4] Order of Recusal (KSS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motion Submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wilhoit for review: re [2] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (SKV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Conflict Check
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Conflict Check run. (SKV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Kim Davis,Individually, Kim Davis in her official capacity as Rowan County Clerk, and Rowan County, Kentucky for service on the County Judge Executive; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service by Certified Mail. (Attachments: # (1) Summons Kim Davis, Officially, # (2) Summons Rowan County, KY) (SKV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, Karen Ann Roberts, L. Aaron Skaggs, Barry W. Spartman (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Proposed Order)(SKV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/3/2015 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-3252874), filed by Karen Ann Roberts, Shantel Burke, Jody Fernandez, Barry W. Spartman, Kevin Holloway, April Miller, Stephen Napier, L. Aaron Skaggs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Cheves Article, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Wolfson Article, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Gov. Letter, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet, # (5) Case Assignment, # (6) Summons Davis, # (7) Summons Rowan County, KY)(SKV)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,207 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?