USA, et al v. Corporate Realty, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01430-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andre Dent, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Daniel M Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Mark Press +1 703 734 3800 +1 703 734 0590 dpress@chung-press.com
No Logo Odell Wayne Wilson, Jr., Plaintiff
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Airport Square Property Management Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Corporate Realty Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Wilburn Company, Inc., Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/17/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 5/21/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Terminated Case
Case closed (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [21-1] joint motion of the parties to Voluntarily Dismiss proceedings; DISMISSING all claims against defendant Airport Square Property Mangagement, Inc., The Wilburn Company, Inc. and Corporate Realty Management, Inc., without prejudice; DIRECTING that the complaint be Unsealed; DIRECTING that all other contents of the Court's file remain under seal, except for the Government's Notice of Election to Intervene and to Decline and the Joint Motion to dismiss; DIRECTING that the seal be lifted as to all matters occurring after the date of this Order. ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 5/16/02) (c/m & microfilmed 5/17/02) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/17/2002, Terminated: 5/17/2002 Motion to Dismiss
      JOINT MOTION by Odell Wayne Wilson Jr., Andre Dent, Corporate Realty, Airport Square, Wilburn Company, Inc, USA to Voluntarily Dismiss proceedings and Exhibits A and B (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: 5/14/2002 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION by USA and Relators to Voluntarily Dismiss this Proceedings and exhibits A and B. (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002, Terminated: 5/2/2002 Motion to Intervene
          NOTICE OF ELECTION by USA to Intervene against defendants Airport Square Property Management Corp., Inc. and The Wilburn Company, Inc. and to Decline to Intervene against defendant Corporate Realty Management, Inc. and to remain under Seal (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [17-1] motion of USA to Extend Time to intervene, is extended to 2/26/02; granting [17-2] motion of USA and to Continue case under seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 9/4/01) (c/m sf 9/4/01) (UNDER SEAL) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001, Terminated: 9/4/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              MOTION by USA to Extend Time to intervene , and to Continue case under seal (Under Seal) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [15-1] motion of USA for Extension of Time to Intervene, granting [15-2] motion of USA to continue case under Seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/12/01 ) (c/m 7/12/01 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 7/12/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by USA for Extension of Time to Intervene and to continue case under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [13-1] motion of USA for Partial Lift of Seal, granting [12-1] motion of USA for Extension of Time to Intervene to 7/16/01; DIRECTING that the complaint and other subsequent and/or related filings shall remain UNDER SEAL, except as provided by this or subsequent order of the Court. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 5/17/01 ) (c/m 5/17/01 eg) (Under Seal) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001, Terminated: 5/17/2001 Motion to Seal
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION with memorandum in support by USA for Partial Lift of Seal (Under Seal) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA for Extension of Time to Intervene (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion of United States for Extension of Time to Intervene no later than 5/16/01, granting [10-2] motion of United States to Continue case under seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 4/17/01 ) (c/m 4/18/01 eg) (under seal) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001, Terminated: 4/18/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA for Extension of Time to Intervene , and to Continue case under seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [8-1] motion of USA to Extend Time to Intervene no later than 4/16/01, granting [8-2] motion of USA to Continue case under Seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 2/14/01) (c/m 2/14/01 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001, Terminated: 2/14/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                UNOPPOSED MOTION by USA to Extend Time to Intervene , and Continue case under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion of the USA to Extend Time to Intervene and Continue Case Under Seal; DIRECTING that the USA shall notice its election to intervene or otherwise participate in this case no later than 2/15/01; DIRECTING that the complaint and other subsequent and/or related filings in this case shall remain under seal ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 11/27/00 ) (c/m 11/27/00 eg)(UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000, Terminated: 11/27/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by USA to Extend Time to Intervene and Continue Case Under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion of United States to Extend Time to intervene and continue case Under Seal no later than 11/7/00 ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 7/25/00 ) (c/m 7/26/00 eg) (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/26/2000, Terminated: 7/26/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by USA to Extend Time to intervene and continue case Under Seal (UNDER SEAL) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Local Rule
                                          Local Rule 103.3 certification by Andre Dent (UNDER SEAL) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Local Rule
                                            Local Rule 103.3 certification by Odell Wayne Wilson Jr. (UNDER SEAL) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/17/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Jury Demand
                                              DEMAND for jury trial by USA, Odell Wayne Wilson Jr., Andre Dent (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1166735 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?