Freeman v. Henderson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01437-WMN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lindora C. Freeman, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo William J. Henderson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/18/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore City
Terminated 9/29/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER terminating [8-1] motion of Defendants to Dismiss, granting [8-2] motion of Defendants for Summary Judgment and CLOSING CASE. Any and all prior rulings are incorporated by reference and this Order shall be deemed to be a final judgment. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 9/29/00) (c/i & microfilmed 9/29/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 9/29/00) (c/i & microfilmed 9/29/00 ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Terminated Case
      Case closed (mms, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/14/2000 Correspondence
        CORRESPONDENCE by Lindora C. Freeman with Attachments (mms, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000 Rule
          Rule 12/56 letter mailed to plaintiff (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 7/24/2000, Entered: 7/24/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION with memorandum in support by William J. Henderson to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and Attachments 1-18 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to US Attorney General on 6/1/00 (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to William J. Henderson 6/2/00 Answer due on 8/2/00 for William J. Henderson (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed 5/26/00 as to U.S. Attorney (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Summons Issued
                    SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for William J. Henderson (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [2-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING Plaintiff to inform Court of any change of address during pendency of this action; DIRECTING Clerk to issue summons on Postmaster General, USAO for the District of Maryland and Attorney General of USA; and DIRECTING USMS to effectuate service of process on parties named. ( signed by Judge William M. Nickerson 5/24/00) (c/m 5/25/00 ms) (cc USMS 5/25/00 with summons & complaint ms) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000, Terminated: 5/25/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                        MOTION by Lindora C. Freeman to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and affidavit in support. (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Jury Demand
                          DEMAND for jury trial by Lindora C. Freeman (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT and attachments filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 48 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?