Adina Zaharescu v. New Haven Financial, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-06192

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 3:13 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    IN CHAMBERS ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Margaret M. Morrow: Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2009 09:00 AM. Joint 26(f) Report and ADR Questionnaire due 3/09/2009. (ah)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 0 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?