Young v. Massanari
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01684-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John R. Young, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SWICK & SHAPIRO, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heidi S. Rhodes +1 202 842 0300 +1 202 842 1418
Space Richard L. Swick +1 202 842 0300 +1 202 842 1418 rlswick@swickandshapiro.com
v.
No Logo Larry G. Massanari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/7/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Baltimore County
Terminated 10/2/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 01-2376[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Order
ORDER of the USCA AWARDING Appellee $92.00 in costs, an itemized statement of costs attached. (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 USCA Mandate
    JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto, Re: [40-1] appeal by John R. Young (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Certificate of Clerk
      Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [40-1] appeal by John R. Young (c/m) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 USCA Appeal Fees
        USCA appeal fees received $ 105.00 Receipt #1180934 (ko, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 USCA Case Number
          USCA Case Number Re: [40-1] appeal by John R. Young USCA NUMBER: 01-2376 (Case Manager: Lisa Jernigan) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [40-1] appeal by John R. Young (c/m) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by John R. Young . Fee Status: (Filing Fee Not Paid) (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 39 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by John R. Young to Defendant's Opposition to his [35-1] motion to Alter or Amend [34-1] judgment order, [35-2] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 38 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER DENYING [35-1] motion of Plaintiff to Alter or Amend [34-1] judgment order, DENYING [35-2] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/24/01 ) (c/m 10/24/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 37 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Response in Opposition
                    RESPONSE by Larry G. Massanari in opposition to [35-1] motion to Alter or Amend [34-1] judgment order; [35-2] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by John R. Young and Exhibits 1-2. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER DIRECTING the Court would like to have Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to alter or amend judgment and to amend his complaint by noon 10/22/01 (by fax, with a copy simultaneously faxed to Plaintiff's Counsel) and Plaintiff's Reply by noon 10/24/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/81/01 ) (c/faxed 10/18/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001, Terminated: 10/24/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
                        MOTION by John R. Young to Alter or Amend [34-1] judgment order , and for Leave to File Amended Complaint ; Exhibits A-E and Proposed Amended Complaint. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Judgment*Court Filing
                          ORDER AND JUDGMENT GRANTING Defendant's Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment and ENTERED JUDGMENT in favor of Larry G. Massanari against John R. Young. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/2/01 ) (c/m 10/2/01-Chambers) (MICROFILMED 10/2/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/2/01 ) (c/m 10/2/01-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Terminated Case
                              Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Response in Support of Motion
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Larry G. Massanari in further support of his [7-1] motion to Dismiss, [7-2] motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-5. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER GRANTING [30-1] motion of Defendant to Extend Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment to 9/28/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/20/01 ) (c/m 8/20/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by Larry G. Massanari to Extend Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001, Terminated: 10/2/2001 Response in Opposition
                                      RESPONSE by John R. Young in opposition to [7-1] motion to Dismiss, [7-2] motion for Summary Judgment by Larry Massanari and Exhibits 1-23. (c/s) (EXHIBITS FILED SEPARATELY) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER GRANTING [27-1] Consent motion of Plaintiff for Leave to File Out of Time One Day Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/9/01 ) (c/m/f 8/9/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001, Terminated: 8/10/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                          CONSENT MOTION by John R. Young for Leave to File Out of Time One Day Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING [25-1] Consent motion to Extend Time in which to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment to 8/8/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/6/01 ) (c/m 8/6/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001, Terminated: 8/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                              CONSENT MOTION by John R. Young to Extend Time in which to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER GRANTING [23-1] motion of Plaintiff for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss to 8/2/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 6/29/01 ) (c/m 6/29/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001, Terminated: 6/29/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                  CONSENT MOTION by John R. Young for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment to 7/3/01. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 6/11/01 ) (c/m 6/12/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001, Terminated: 6/12/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                      CONSENT MOTION by John R. Young to Extend Time to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER STAYING proceedings for 21 days until 6/6/01; DIRECTING plaintiff will have 15 days from the date which these proceedings are continued to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 5/17/01) (c/m 5/17/01 chambers) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Motion to Stay
                                                          JOINT MOTION by John R. Young, William A. Halter to Stay proceedings 30 days until witness Vera Williams is available to be deposed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001, Terminated: 3/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER GRANTING [18-1] motion of Plaintiff to Stay Proceedings Sixty Days until Witness Vera Williams is available to be Deposed and DIRECTING Plaintiff will have 15 days from the date which these proceedings are continued to respond on the merits to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 3/12/01 ) (c/m 3/12/01) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/13/2001
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001, Terminated: 3/13/2001 Motion to Stay
                                                              MOTION by John R. Young to Stay Proceedings Sixty Days until Witness Vera Williams is available to be Deposed . (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 03/13/2001
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 2/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING [16-1] Consent motion to Extend Discovery to 3/16/01 and Plaintiff will have 15 days from the close of discovery to respond on the merits to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 2/15/01 ) (c/m 2/15/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/15/2001
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                  CONSENT MOTION by John R. Young to Extend Discovery . (jlb, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/15/2001
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER GRANTING [13-1] Consent motion of Plaintiff to Extend Discovery to 2/14/01 and DIRECTING Plaintiff will have 15 days from the close of discovery to respond on the merits to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/17/01 ) (c/m 1/17/01-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001, Terminated: 1/17/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                      CONSENT MOTION by John R. Young to Extend Discovery . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000, Terminated: 12/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Heidi S. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 12/8/00 ) (c/m 12/11/00-skp) (fee paid) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000, Terminated: 12/11/2000 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                          MOTION by John R. Young for Heidi S. Rhodes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER denying [7-2] motion of Apfel for Summary Judgment, granting [10-1] motion of Young for Rule 56(f) Motion, denying [7-1] motion of Apfel to Dismiss at this juncture in order to permit adequate discovery so that Plaintiff may have a fair opportunity to respond to that motion; DIRECTING discovery be started at once and completed within 90 dyas hereof; DIRECTING Plaintiff thereafter to submit his opposition on the merits. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 10/17/00) (c/m 10/18/00-chambers) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                              MOTION by John R. Young for Rule 56(f) Motion and Declaration. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING [8-1] motion of Plaintiff for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment to 10/16/00. ( signed by Judge N. Smalkin 10/9/00 ) (c/m 10/10/00-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000, Terminated: 10/10/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                  MOTION by John R. Young for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/19/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Kenneth F. Apfel to Dismiss , or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment with Exhibits 1-28 (EXHIBITS ONLY FILED SEPARATELY) (c/s) (mms, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Kenneth F. Apfel 6/16/00 Answer due on 9/18/00 for Kenneth F. Apfel; as to Attorney General. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING [4-1] motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint SET Answer deadline to 9/18/00 for Kenneth F. Apfel . ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 8/31/00 ) (c/m 8/31/00-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 8/31/2000, Terminated: 8/31/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                          MOTION by Kenneth F. Apfel for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint . (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U. S. Attorney. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Summons Issued
                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Kenneth F. Apfel (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Jury Demand
                                                                                                DEMAND for jury trial by John R. Young (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150 RECEIPT # 2280840 (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 06/08/2000
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?