Silogram Lubricants Corp. v. Jospey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00038
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 2:51 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Silogram Lubricants Corp., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Wolnerman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Y. Wolnerman +1 212 308 0603 +1 212 308 7090
v.
No Logo Advantage Environmental, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Henry +1 518 487 7650 jhenry@woh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Anne Maleszweski +1 518 487 7612 amaleszweski@woh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Perks Quinlan equinlan@woh.com
No Logo Alison Savo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Antoinette Rizzica, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Carlos Romero, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Citilube, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by nyct.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Clark Wimpfheimer +1 212 247 8448 +1 212 247 8196 mcw@nyct.net
No Logo Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Gary Moran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Ginger Berens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Grace Jospey, Defendant
No Logo Gregory Bass, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by nyct.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Clark Wimpfheimer +1 212 247 8448 +1 212 247 8196 mcw@nyct.net
No Logo Hermino Lopez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo III William Bryant, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Jane Does, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Juan Quila-Moran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Luis Lebron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Morris Wilson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Northeastern Fuel, Defendant
No Logo Phoebe Ferentz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Richard D'Auria, Defendant
No Logo Rosalyn Jospey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Stevan Jospey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jordan, Hyden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Z. Marangos +1 718 273 8324 +1 718 273 8096 kathycampbell1201@gmail.com
No Logo Advantage Environmental, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Henry +1 518 487 7650 jhenry@woh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Anne Maleszweski +1 518 487 7612 amaleszweski@woh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Emily Perks Quinlan equinlan@woh.com
No Logo Alison Savo, Cross Defendant
No Logo Antoinette Rizzica, Cross Defendant
No Logo Carlos Romero, Cross Defendant
No Logo Citilube, Inc., Cross Defendant
No Logo Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Cross Defendant
No Logo Gary Moran, Cross Defendant
No Logo Ginger Berens, Cross Defendant
No Logo Grace Jospey, Cross Defendant
No Logo Gregory Bass, Cross Defendant
No Logo Hermino Lopez, Cross Defendant
No Logo III William Bryant, Cross Defendant
No Logo Jane Does, Cross Defendant
No Logo John Does, Cross Defendant
No Logo Juan Quila-Moran, Cross Defendant
No Logo Luis Lebron, Cross Defendant
No Logo Morris Wilson, Cross Defendant
No Logo Northeastern Fuel, Cross Defendant
No Logo Phoebe Ferentz, Cross Defendant
No Logo Richard D'Auria, Cross Defendant
No Logo Rosalyn Jospey, Cross Defendant
No Logo Stevan Jospey, Cross Defendant
No Logo White & Wolnerman, PLLC, All Plaintiffs

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White & Wolnerman, PLLC +1 212 308 0667 +1 212 308 7090 dwolnerman@wwlawgroup.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125la
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 43 Status Report filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Next status report due 9/4/15. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/8/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order of April 1, 2015, plaintiff was to update the Court of the status of this action not later than June 1, 2015. (ECF No. 42.) The Court has not received an update. This action shall be dismissed for failure to prosecute if no update is received prior to June 11, 2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/5/2015) (kko) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp..(Donovan, Joseph) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 41 Status Report filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Next status report due in 60 days. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/31/2015) (kko) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp..(Donovan, Joseph) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 39 Status Report filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: Next status update due 3/30/15. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/8/2015) (tn) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp..(Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: that Plaintiff shall file a status update by Wednesday, January 7, 2015. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/5/2015) (tn) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 Status Report filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Next status report to be filed with this Court not later than Dec. 30, 2014, or resolution of the bankruptcy proceeding, whichever comes first. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/24/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                    STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(White, Randolph) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMO ENDORSED on re: 34 Order: ENDORSEMENT: This action shall be dismissed on 9/26/2014 if no update is received on or prior to that date. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/18/2014) (js) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order of July 10, 2014, plaintiff was to update the Court every 60 days of the status of this action, with the first such update due on September 8, 2014. (ECF No. 33.) The Court has not received an update. Plaintiff shall file a status update by Monday, September 15, 2014. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/11/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: This action is STAYED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(a). Plaintiff shall write a letter to the Court every 60 days to inform the Court of the status of this action. Plaintiff shall file the first such update on Monday, September 8, 2014. All scheduled dates and deadlines, including the status conference scheduled for Friday, July 25, 2014 at 3:30 p.m., are ADJOURNED. The Clerk of Court shall place this action on the suspense docket. Case stayed. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/10/2014) (tn) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                            SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record . Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp.(White, Randolph) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to 10 Crossclaim. Document filed by Advantage Environmental. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Henry, John) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, 10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,,., ANSWER to 1 , 10 Crossclaim. Document filed by Gregory Bass, Citilube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Wimpfheimer, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Clark Wimpfheimer on behalf of Gregory Bass, Citilube, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Wimpfheimer, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gregory Bass, Citilube, Inc..(Wimpfheimer, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Perks Quinlan on behalf of Advantage Environmental. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Quinlan, Emily) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Perks Quinlan on behalf of Advantage Environmental. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Quinlan, Emily) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ginger Berens, William Bryant, Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Phoebe Ferentz, Rosalyn Jospey, Stevan Jospey, Luis Lebron, Hermino Lopez, Gary Moran, Juan Quila-Moran, Antoinette Rizzica, Carlos Romero, Alison Savo.(Marangos, John) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 11/17/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2014; Responses due by 12/15/2014; Replies due by 12/23/2014. Trial will not be before a jury. Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Pretrial materials, including the Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2015 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Trial in this matter shall commence on 1/26/15. Trial is anticipated to take 3 days. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/11/2014) (tn) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Ginger Berens, William Bryant, Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Phoebe Ferentz, Rosalyn Jospey, Stevan Jospey, Luis Lebron, Hermino Lopez, Gary Moran, Juan Quila-Moran, Antoinette Rizzica, Carlos Romero, Alison Savo, Morris Wilson.(Marangos, John) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp..(White, Randolph) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO MOVE AND ANSWER: that the time in which defendants, Citilube, Inc. and Gregory Bass have to move and/or answer in connection with the Summons served upon them herewith, is extended until 3/25/2014. So Ordered. (But counsel should note my rules re stips.: not generally allowed). Gregory Bass answer due 3/25/2014; Citilube, Inc. answer due 3/25/2014. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/4/2014) (tn) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/11/2014 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/3/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                      DECLARATION of Oscar Margolis re: 18 Order, Declaration of Oscar Margolis in Response to Order of the Court, entered February 25, 2014. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp.. (White, Randolph) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: Accordingly, not later than Friday, February 28, 2014, plaintiff shall provide the Court with facts describing how the seven Silogram customers listed in paragraph 6 of its submission relate to a "substantial part" of the events underlying the action. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/25/2014) (tn) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEF re: 15 Order, Terminate Hearings,, Plaintiff's Submission Regarding Venue. Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(White, Randolph) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from John Z. Marangos, Esq. dated 02/20/14 re: Order dated 2/19/14. Document filed by Ginger Berens, William Bryant, Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Phoebe Ferentz, Rosalyn Jospey, Stevan Jospey, Luis Lebron, Hermino Lopez, Gary Moran, Juan Quila-Moran, Antoinette Rizzica, Carlos Romero, Alison Savo, Morris Wilson.(Marangos, John) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for today, February 19, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED. The parties shall write to the Court no later than Friday, February 21, 2014 with their views as to why the proper venue for this action is the Southern District of New York rather than the Eastern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/19/2014) (tn) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Z. Marangos on behalf of Ginger Berens, William Bryant, Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Phoebe Ferentz, Rosalyn Jospey, Stevan Jospey, Luis Lebron, Hermino Lopez, Gary Moran, Juan Quila-Moran, Antoinette Rizzica, Carlos Romero, Alison Savo, Morris Wilson. (Marangos, John) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Randolph E. White on behalf of White & Wolnerman, PLLC. New Address: White & Wolnerman, PLLC, 110 E. 59th Street, 25th Fl, New York, New York, USA 10022, 212-308-0667. (White, Randolph) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Amended Certificate of Service served on Silogram Lubricants Corp. D/B/A Royal Lube Co. on February 04, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Advantage Environmental. (Maleszweski, Amanda) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Answer to Complaint served on Silogram Lubricants Corp. D/B/A Royal Lube Co. on February 3, 2014. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Advantage Environmental. (Maleszweski, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint,., CROSSCLAIM against Gregory Bass, Ginger Berens, William Bryant, Citilube, Inc., Richard D'Auria, Jane Does, John Does, Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Phoebe Ferentz, Grace Jospey, Rosalyn Jospey, Stevan Jospey, Luis Lebron, Hermino Lopez, Gary Moran, Northeastern Fuel, Juan Quila-Moran, Antoinette Rizzica, Carlos Romero, Alison Savo, Morris Wilson. Document filed by Advantage Environmental.(Maleszweski, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Advantage Environmental.(Maleszweski, Amanda) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 5 Letter, filed by Advantage Environmental. ENDORSEMENT: OK if she has full authority to set the trial schedule and deal with all other issues that may arise. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/31/2014) (tro) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of John J. Henry, Esq., and Notice of Appearance of Amanda A. Maleszweski, Esq. and letter request served on Silogram Lubricants Corp. d/b/a Royal Lube Co. on January 29, 2014. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Advantage Environmental. (Maleszweski, Amanda) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Anne Maleszweski on behalf of Advantage Environmental. (Maleszweski, Amanda) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from John J. Henry, Esq. dated January 29, 2014 re: request that Amanda Maleszweski, Esq. be permitted to appear at the IPTC in place of Mr. Henry.. Document filed by Advantage Environmental.(Henry, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Henry on behalf of Advantage Environmental. (Henry, John) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Lead counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference ("IPTC") promptly on Wednesday, February 19, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. ( Initial Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/14/2014) (mro) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (laq) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Advantage Environmental, Gregory Bass, Ginger Berens, William Bryant, Citilube, Inc., Richard D'Auria, Jane Does, John Does, Encore Petroleum, L.L.C., Phoebe Ferentz, Grace Jospey, Rosalyn Jospey, Stevan Jospey, Luis Lebron, Hermino Lopez, Gary Moran, Northeastern Fuel, Juan Quila-Moran, Antoinette Rizzica, Carlos Romero, Alison Savo, Morris Wilson. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1084714)Document filed by Silogram Lubricants Corp..(laq) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,117 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?