Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
358 |
Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None |
USCA Mandate |
|
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
308 |
Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Denise L. Plunkett dated April 4, 2017 re: Basel El Tell Exhibits. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Kommatas, Alexander) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
307 |
Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Damian Cavaleri dated April 3, 2017 re: Disputed Exhibits. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PX272, # 2 Exhibit PX273, # 3 Exhibit PX274)(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
306 |
Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/15/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
305 |
Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/15/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay Fastow dated April 3, 2017 re: Khalil Alami Cross Examination Disputed Documents. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
303 |
Filed: 4/2/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated April 2, 2013 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Gallagher, Thomas) (Entered: 04/02/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
302 |
Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated March 31, 2017 re: Adverse Inference Instruction. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Gallagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
301 |
Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay Fastow dated March 31, 2017 re: Khalil Alami Cross Examination Disputed Documents. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
300 |
Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Damian Cavaleri dated March 31, 2017 re: MasterCard's Letter of 3/31/17. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
299 |
Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay Fastow dated March 31, 2017 re: Khalil Alami Cross-Examination Disputed Documents. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
298 |
Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated March 31, 2017 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Gallagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
297 |
Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,664,331.38. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
296 |
Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri in Support re: 293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,664,331.38.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
295 |
Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Fredric S. Newman in Support re: 293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,664,331.38.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
294 |
Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Prof. Roy D. Simon, Jr. in Support re: 293 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,664,331.38.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
293 |
Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs in the Amount of $4,664,331.38. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
292 |
Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Damian Cavaleri dated March 24, 2017 Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
291 |
Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated March 24, 2017 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that 1. The rulings on Plaintiff's proposed exemplar exhibits are as follows: a. PX 9, MasterCard MEPS Alliance Agreement - EXCLUDED, Rules 401, 402 (relevance), based on the Court's prior ruling excluding evidence of any alleged MEPS conspiracy, and MasterCard's representation that it does not intend to elicit expert testimony predicated on this Exhibit. (As further set forth herein.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/28/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
289 |
Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT FINAL TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6)(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, without any further explanation, the fact that ICC had designated certain documents confidential does not justify confidential treatment of the parties' respective March 24 letters submitted as part of their summary judgment submissions. See, e.g., Lown v. Salvation Army, Inc., No. 04 Civ. 01562, 2012 WL 4888534, at *2-4 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 12, 2012) (rejecting argument that documents attached to a summary judgment opposition should be filed under seal because they had been marked as confidential pursuant to a protective order). It is further ORDERED that, in accordance with Individual Rule I.C.3, any party with an interest in confidential treatment of the March 24 letters shall submit by March 30, 2017, a letter providing argument and a factual basis, if any, as to why the Court should permit the parties to file their letters under seal. If neither party has an interest in confidential treatment, then each party shall file on ECF by March 30, 2017, its March 24 letter and the accompanying exhibits. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/27/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
287 |
Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
OPINION AND ORDER re: 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing ICCs Breach of Contract Claim. filed by Mastercard International Inc. For the foregoing reasons, MasterCard's motion is GRANTED, and ICC's breach of contract claim is dismissed. In light of the dismissal, by March 28, 2017, at 5:00 p.m., the parties must submit revised versions of (1) their respective statements of the case (i.e., the short summary to be included in the voir dire and preliminary charge) and (2) a revised witness list and exhibit list. The parties shall advise the Court as soon as possible, and no later than March 25, 2016, whether any of the 5 exhibits submitted for an in limine ruling on admissibility is withdrawn in light of this Opinion. In addition, each party's total time allotted for trial, not including closing argument, is reduced from eight (8) hours to six-and-a-half (6.5) hours. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket Number 274. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/24/2017) (cf) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
286 |
Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jeffrey A Miller dated March 23, 2017 re: Trial Exhibits. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
285 |
Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated March 23, 2017 re: Trial Exhibits. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
284 |
Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
COUNTER STATEMENT TO 277 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
283 |
Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing ICCs Breach of Contract Claim. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
282 |
Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian Cavaleri in Opposition re: 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing ICCs Breach of Contract Claim.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
281 |
Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER granting 279 Motion for Thomas F. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting 280 Motion for Thomas J. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
280 |
Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED MOTION for Thomas J. Gallagher IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Thomas) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
279 |
Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Thomas F. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13444719. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
278 |
Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Peter Kommatas on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. (Kommatas, Alexander) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
277 |
Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
276 |
Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing ICCs Breach of Contract Claim. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
275 |
Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. in Support re: 274 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing ICCs Breach of Contract Claim.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
274 |
Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing ICCs Breach of Contract Claim. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
273 |
Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 181 Motion in Limine; granting 184 Motion in Limine; granting 186 Motion in Limine; denying as moot; 188 Motion in Limine; terminating 261 Motion for Reconsideration ; terminating 262 Motion for Reconsideration. ORDERED that, for the reasons discussed at the conference, the parties' motions in limine and MasterCard's motions for reconsideration/clarification of the Draft Order are decided as follows. All citations to Rules refer to the Federal Rules of Evidence: ORDERED that, for the reasons discussed at the conference, the parties' motions in limine and MasterCard's motions for reconsideration/clarification of the Draft Order are decided as follows. All citations to Rules refer to the Federal Rules of Evidence: ICC's motion to preclude the admission of evidence related to individual ICC credit card holders is GRANTED. ICC's motion to preclude evidence regarding ICC's MasterCard settlement account is DENIED. ICC's motion to preclude evidence regarding MasterCard's Merchant Satisfaction Survey is GRANTED. MasterCards motion to exclude evidence of MasterCard's motive in terminating ICC is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. MasterCard's motion to exclude evidence of MasterCard's motive in drawing down on the letter of credit is GRANTED as the evidence is not relevant, including as to purported punitive damages, which ICC concedes it has not demanded in any pleading. Such evidence would be substantially more confusing and prejudicial to the jury than it is probative. See Rules 402, 403. MasterCards motion to exclude evidence of MasterCard's "bad acts" -- (1) that prior to termination, MasterCard interfered with ICC's actual and potential business relationship and damaged ICC's reputation; (2) that MasterCard "turned a blind eye to alleged misconduct by MEPS"; (3) and that MasterCard required ICC to provide additional collateral -- is GRANTED. As stated above, MasterCard's state of mind is relevant only to evaluate MasterCard's evidence of ICC's non-payment. Evidence of other of MasterCard's misconduct is not relevant under Rule 402, and cannot be used to show propensity under Rule 404(b). The probative value of such evidence is substantially outweighed by the likelihood of confusing and prejudicing the jury, and wasting time. See Rule 403. The foregoing does not preclude any party from introducing evidence to prove the existence of the letter of credit or the fact that MasterCard drew down on it. MasterCard's motion to exclude evidence concerning the "notice and cure" termination provisions of the license agreements between the parties is GRANTED. MasterCard's motion regarding "after-acquired evidence" is GRANTED. MasterCard's motion to preclude evidence and argument that ICC entered into amendments to the payment terms in its agreements with merchants, not in writing, but pursuant to an alleged course-of-performance or asserted standard industry practices, is DENIED as moot, as ICC states that it does not intend to introduce evidence that the merchant agreements were amended. ICC may introduce evidence of its own and merchants' conduct regarding ICC's payment practices as extrinsic evidence of the meaning of the payment provision in the merchant agreements. ORDERED that the parties' cross-objections to Judge Netburn's March 9 Order are OVERRULED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at Dkt. Nos. 177, 181, 184, 186, 188, 261 and 262. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/16/2017) (ap) Modified on 3/24/2017 (ap). Modified on 3/27/2017 (ap). (Entered: 03/16/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
272 |
Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: WHEREAS, a final pretrial conference was held on March 15, 2017...ORDERED that MasterCards request for leave to move for summary judgment on the basis asserted at the March 15 conference is GRANTED. MasterCard shall file its motion for summary judgment by March 17, 2017, and ICC shall file its opposition by March 22, 2017, at noon. No reply briefs will be accepted. It is further ORDERED that MasterCards request to renew its trial subpoena for Leen Alami is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that ICCs objection to the admissibility of the Late Payment Spreadsheets is OVERRULED. It is further ORDERED that the MasterCards request that the Court include the adverse inference instruction in its preliminary jury instruction is DENIED. By March 31, 2017, the parties shall file a joint submission containing their proposals for the adverse inference instruction, which the Court will read to the jury during the trial. It is further ORDERED that with respect to the parties disputes regarding trial exhibits, the parties shall identify five Plaintiffs exhibits and five Defendants exhibits to which a party objects, confer on the grounds for objection, and each side shall prepare a letter brief as to theadmissibility or not of the 10 documents. The letter briefs shall be filed on ECF by March 23, 2017. The parties shall deliver directly to Chambers two paper copies of the selected 10 exhibits by 5:00 PM on March 23, 2017. It is further ORDERED that a conference is scheduled for March 30, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. It is further ORDERED that, due to a scheduling conflict, the Court will sit for only half of the day on April 5, 2017, and will not sit at all on April 6 and 7, 2017. (Motions due by 3/17/2017. Responses due by 3/22/2017 Status Conference set for 3/30/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/15/2017) (mt) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
271 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: WHEREAS, by Order dated March 9, 2017, Judge Netburn granted in part and denied in part MasterCard's Sanctions Motion. The March 9 Order granted MasterCard's request that the jury receive an adverse inference instruction that the documents relating to ICC's merchant payment and transaction data were unfavorable to ICC. It is hereby ORDERED that in light of Judge Netburn's March 9 Order, MasterCard's objection is DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/13/2017) (mro) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
270 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 265 Objection (non-motion), 269 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
269 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Objection re: 257 Order on Motion in Limine,,,, . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
268 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT FINAL TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 *CORRECTED*, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
267 |
Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT FINAL TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
266 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 265 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
265 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Objection re: 257 Order on Motion in Limine,,,, . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
264 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Damian Cavaleri dated March 13, 2017 re: MasterCard's Letter of 3/13/17. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
263 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 258 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/13/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
262 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Draft Order 4. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Reconsideration and/or Clarification of Draft Order 1. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
260 |
Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated March 13, 2017 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
259 |
Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 258 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc.: ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED IN PART. To the extent the parties disagree about the use or admissibility of any demonstrative aid, demonstrative exhibit, compilation or summary, and need a ruling from the Court, such ruling shall be sought and the document submitted to the Court no later than 2 full trial days in advance of when the document is proposed to be used. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 03/10/2017) (jcs) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Justin W. Lamson dated March 9, 2017 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER ON MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5 granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion in Limine. For the reasons set forth below, MasterCard's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and as further set forth herein. MasterCard's motion to preclude ICC's evidence concerning merchant payments and transactions is DENIED, but its application for an adverse inference instruction is GRANTED. Accordingly, MasterCard's motion in limine with respect to the recordings that ICC saved is DENIED as moot. In addition, the Court DENIES MasterCard's motion for an adverse inference about the telephone recordings. Accordingly, MasterCard's motion to preclude ICC from introducing evidence of its merchant payments and transactions is DENIED but its motion for an adverse inference instruction on such evidence is GRANTED. MasterCard's motion to preclude ICC from introducing the telephone recordings it did save is mooted by ICC's assertion that it will not be using those recordings at trial. MasterCards motion for an adverse inference instruction with respect to those recordings is, however, DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/9/2017) (anc) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file on ECF by March 14, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. a revised Joint Final Pretrial Order, Exhibits thereto and revised deposition designations, counter-designations and objections, in light of the Courts rulings reflected in the Draft Order. The parties shall make any other deletions to their proposed evidence as appropriate in light of their trial preparation. It is further ORDERED that the parties exhibit lists shall include a brief description of each exhibit in addition the information listed in Dkts. Nos. 235-3 and 253-4. It is further ORDERED that MasterCards revised deposition designations shall conform to the format and color of ICCs deposition designations to facilitate the Courts rulings. It is further ORDERED that each party shall provide two courtesy copies of its revised deposition designations in color by March 14, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall provide the Court at the final pretrial conference two copies of all disputed exhibits that the parties intend to use on their direct case for discussion and a possible ruling at the conference. The parties shall also bring two copies of all disputed demonstrative aides, compilations and summaries that the parties intend to use in their opening statements or their case in chief. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 03/09/2017) (jcs) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas J. Gallagher IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13402970. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas J. Gallagher IV, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Thomas) Modified on 3/9/2017 (bcu). (Entered: 03/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 253 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fredric S. Newman dated March 6, 2017 re: Mastercard Affidavit regarding Ajay Banga. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: The Court finds that Mastercard has complied with the Order. APPLICATION DENIED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/7/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
253 |
Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fredric S. Newman dated March 6, 2017 re: Mastercard Affidavit regarding Ajay Banga. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
252 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Mastercard's Motion in Limine Number 5 (Dkt. No. 190). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/17/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
251 |
Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court has a strong preference for live testimony but will permit deposition testimony to be presented in a parties' direct case if the witness is unavailable to testify at trial, except that any witness may be impeached on cross-examination with his own prior testimony. It is further ORDERED that, no later than March 8, 2017, for each witness proposed to appear solely by designation or prior testimony, the parties shall provide (1) the name of the witness, (2) his or her title or role, (3) a summary of the proffered testimony and (4) an explanation as to whether the witness is available to testify and, if not, why he or she cannot be compelled to testify by subpoena or is otherwise not subject to compulsion. It is further ORDERED that, no later than March 8, 2017, the parties shall submit a joint document for each witness with their respective deposition designations, counter-designations and objections in the following format: the relevant excerpts of the deposition testimony shall be quoted in full as they appear in the transcript with page and line numbers, consecutively paginated, regardless of which party is proposing the testimony; the text shall be highlighted in different colors or otherwise marked to clearly identify and distinguish each party's respective designations (e.g., Plaintiff's designations and counter-designations in blue font, and Defendants' in red; or in italics and non-italics respectively). Objections shall be noted in the margin directly adjacent to the testimony at issue in the same identifying font associated with the objecting party. (e.g. Plaintiff's designations in blue font, and Defendants' adjacent objection in red font). Objections shall be indicated with a Rule number and/or a descriptive word or phrase. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/17/2017) (cla) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/31/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/31/2017 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AFFIDAVIT of Brooke Pietrzak, Esq. re: 245 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
247 |
Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 246 Letter, filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Although it is the Court's experience that the physical presence of parties is critical to the success of a settlement conference, because this conference was scheduled expeditiously and because Mr. Alami lives abroad, the Court's grant the request. Mr. Alami may appear by telephone for the Court's February 10, 2017 settlement conference. The Court expects Mr. Alami to be available throughout the duration of the conference. Counsel shall attend the conference with a telephone number to reach Mr. Alami at all times. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/8/2017) (anc) (Entered: 02/08/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian Cavaleri dated February 7, 2017 re: Request for Mr. Khalil Alami to attend February 10, 2017 settlement conference by telephone. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER denying 244 Motion for Reconsideration. Application DENIED provided that Mr. Banga or Mastercard's counsel submit an affidavit regarding whether Mr. Banga was involved in the decision to execute the November 2010 license agreement and, if so, Mr. Banga's role in that decision. The affidavit shall be submitted no later than February 13, 2017. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/6/2017) (anc) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
244 |
Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Reconsideration re; 241 Order, . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Newman, Fredric) Modified on 3/3/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 02/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
243 |
Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Procedures for Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, a copy of which is available on the Courts website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge /Netburn. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Wednesday, February 08, 2017. Should the parties resolve the litigation before the conference date, they must notify the Court in writing immediately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/3/2017) (anc) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
242 |
Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: In light of the parties' February 2, 2017 application to the Honorable Lorna G. Schofield requesting a settlement conference before the Court, the parties are directed to jointly contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta immediately at (212) 805-0286 to schedule a settlement conference. The Court is available on February 10, 2017, at 2:00 p.m.; February 13, 2017, at 2:00 p.m.; and March 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/3/2017) (anc) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERD that Mastercards application to preclude ICC from calling at trial Ajay Bangais GRANTED. It is further ORDERD that Mastercard's application to preclude ICC from calling at trial Shadi Abdel Aziz is DENIED provided that (1) ICC makes Aziz available before trial for an in-person deposition, which shall last no more than five hours, and (2) ICC submits to Mastercard at least five business days before the deposition a summary of approximately one page that describes Aziz's trial testimony. As ICC stipulated at the January 31 conference, Aziz's trial testimony shall be limited to two-and-one-half hours. It is further ORDERED that ICC's motion to quash is GRANTED to the extent the subpoena commands Alami to produce tax returns or other documents. The motion to quash is GRANTED without prejudice to renewal to the extent the subpoena compels Alami to testify at trial. Mastercard may depose Alami for no more than two hours before the final pre-trial conference set for March 15, 2017, provided that the deposition is conducted by video or at a location that is convenient for Alami. It is further ORDERED that no later than February 3, 2017, the parties must submit a joint letter by email regarding the status of the settlement discussions, including whether they have retained a private mediator and when their mediation session is scheduled or, in the alternative, request that the Court refer them to either a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference or mediation through the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties shall proceed with settlement discussions expeditiously in light of the firm trial date. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/31/2017) (kgo) Modified on 1/31/2017 (kgo). (Entered: 01/31/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
240 |
Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated January 27, 2017 re: Pre-Motion Conference on January 31, 2017. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 238 Letter filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. ENDORSEMENT: ICC's application to quash MasterCard's trial subpoena for Leen Alami will be addressed at the conference set for January 31, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. MasterCard's response shall be filed by January 27, 2017, at noon. ( Motions due by 1/31/2017., Responses due by 1/27/2017) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/23/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fredric S. Newman dated January 20, 2017 re: Pre-Motion Conference on January 31, 2017. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 236 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a letter response not to exceed three pages by January 20, 2017. A telephone conference will be held on January 31, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. At the appointed time, the parties shall jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0288. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/31/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/10/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
236 |
Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated January 9, 2017 re: pre-motion conference. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
235 |
Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT PRELIMINARY TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
234 |
Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT FINAL TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
232 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Plaintiff ICC's Proposed Statement of the Case. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
231 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Plaintiff ICC's Proposed Verdict Sheet. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
230 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Defendant MasterCard International Incorporated's Proposed Verdict Form. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
229 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE of Defendant MasterCard International Incorporated's Proposed Statement of the Case. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Justin W. Lamson dated December 5, 2016 re: JOINT PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
227 |
Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
OPINION AND ORDER re: 167 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer . filed by International Cards Company, Ltd., 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages. filed by Mastercard International Inc., 164 MOTION MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill . filed by Mastercard International Inc.. For the foregoing reasons, MasterCard's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to ICC's Additional Issuing/Acquiring Opportunities damages and ICC's Additional Third-Party Processing Opportunities damages related to InvestBank and Jordan Commercial Bank and DENIED in all other aspects. MasterCard's motion to exclude O'Neill's report and testimony is GRANTED with respect to the damages on which summary judgment has been granted and DENIED in all other aspects. ICC's motion to exclude MasterCards the report and testimony of experts Gopal and Creamer is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 147, 164 and 167. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/29/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 11/30/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
226 |
Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Damian Cavaleri dated November 29, 2016 re: 11/22/16 Order Regarding Punitive Damages. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
225 |
Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 224 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application DENIED. This letter shall be deemed a reply. If ICC has put MasterCard on notice that it is asserting a punitive damages claim before the end of fact discovery, ICC shall so state in a letter by November 29, 2016, with a copy of said notice appended to the letter. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/22/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated November 18, 2016 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
223 |
Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
222 |
Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. in Opposition re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
221 |
Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Opposition re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
220 |
Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 190 MOTION in Limine Number 5: Evidence Preclusion and Adverse Presumptions as Discovery Sanctions. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
219 |
Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 188 MOTION in Limine Number 4: ICC Merchant Agreement Amendment. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
218 |
Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 186 MOTION in Limine Number 3: After-Acquired Evidence. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
217 |
Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri, Esq. in Opposition re: 181 MOTION in Limine Number 1: MasterCard's Motive and Other Alleged "Bad Acts".. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
216 |
Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 181 MOTION in Limine Number 1: MasterCard's Motive and Other Alleged "Bad Acts". . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
215 |
Filed: 11/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 202 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
214 |
Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that MasterCard's proposed redactions are accepted for all three exhibits. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)(4) ("Unless the court orders otherwise, in an electronic or paper filing with the court that contains... a financial-account number, a party or nonparty making the filing may include only... the last four digits of the financial-account number."); In re Zyprexa Prod. Liab. Litig., 2005 WL 2237789, at *2 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 2, 2005) (permitting redaction of cell phone number and other personal identifiers). It is further ORDERED that by November 19, 2016, MasterCard shall file its proposed submissions in redacted form on ECF and file the unredacted versions of the documents under seal. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/10/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Justin W. Lamson dated November 9, 2016 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
212 |
Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 202 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
211 |
Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 184 MOTION in Limine Number 2: Notice And Cure Termination Provisions Of License Agreements. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
210 |
Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial. Motion in Limine to Exclude MasterCard's 2012 Merchant Satisfaction Survey and Testimony Relating Thereto. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
209 |
Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
208 |
Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 190 MOTION in Limine Number 5: Evidence Preclusion and Adverse Presumptions as Discovery Sanctions. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
207 |
Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 188 MOTION in Limine Number 4: ICC Merchant Agreement Amendment. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
206 |
Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 186 MOTION in Limine Number 3: After-Acquired Evidence. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 181 MOTION in Limine Number 1: MasterCard's Motive and Other Alleged "Bad Acts". . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
204 |
Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
203 |
Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 202 Objection (non-motion) . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
202 |
Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
Objection re: 176 Order,, . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
201 |
Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court from 176 Order,,. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. Copies of Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court served on Attorney(s) of Record: Fredric S. Newman; Damian Raphael Cavaleri; Jeffrey Alan Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nd). (Entered: 10/31/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court from 176 Order,,. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. Copies of Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court served on Attorney(s) of Record: Fredric S. Newman; Damian Raphael Cavaleri; Jeffrey Alan Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 10/31/2016 (nd). (Entered: 10/31/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
199 |
Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 198 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. For each memorandum of law that is more than five pages, MasterCard must resubmit a version not to exceed five pages by November 2, 2016. ICC's memoranda in opposition shall be filed by November 14, 2016. The deadline for MasterCard's memoranda in opposition to ICC's motions in limine remains November 4, 2016. ( Responses due by 11/14/2016) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/31/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
198 |
Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. dated October 28, 2016 Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
197 |
Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER granting 195 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions In Limine; denying 195 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is hereby ORDERED that MasterCard's request to file under seal is granted in part and denied in part as provided below. It is further ORDERED that the parties' proposed briefing schedule is granted in part and denied in part. ICC's response to MasterCards motion shall be submitted no later than November 4, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the request to extend the deadline to file oppositions to the motions in limine is granted. It is further ORDERED that MasterCards request to file opposition memoranda up to 10-pages in length is denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 195.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/28/2016) (cf) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
196 |
Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilene B. Weininger on behalf of International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Weininger, Ilene) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
195 |
Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions In Limine addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. dated October 27, 2016., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. dated October 27, 2016. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
194 |
Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that in accordance with and as further provided in Individual Rule IV.B: 1. Any response to the pending motions in limine shall be filed by October 28, 2016. 2. No later than December 5, 2016, the parties shall file joint proposed jury instructions, a joint proposed verdict sheet, and a statement of the case, as provided in Individual Rule IV.B.4. The parties shall note any disagreement in the documents. 3. No later than December 15, 2016, the parties shall file a Joint Final Pretrial Order. 4. The parties shall appear for a final pre-trial conference on March 15, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. 5. A jury trial shall commence on April 3, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. Responses due by 10/28/2016 Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2016. Jury Trial set for 4/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/24/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
193 |
Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 192 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Court will hold a telephone conference on Wednesday, October 19, 2016, at 12:10 p.m. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0288, with all relevant individuals on the line. (Telephone Conference set for 10/19/2016 at 12:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/17/2016) (kl) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
192 |
Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jay N. Fastow dated October 14, 2016 re: Trial Schedule. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
191 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 190 MOTION in Limine Number 5: Evidence Preclusion and Adverse Presumptions as Discovery Sanctions. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
190 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION in Limine Number 5: Evidence Preclusion and Adverse Presumptions as Discovery Sanctions. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
189 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 188 MOTION in Limine Number 4: ICC Merchant Agreement Amendment. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
188 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION in Limine Number 4: ICC Merchant Agreement Amendment. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
187 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 186 MOTION in Limine Number 3: After-Acquired Evidence. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
186 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION in Limine Number 3: After-Acquired Evidence. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
185 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 184 MOTION in Limine Number 2: Notice And Cure Termination Provisions Of License Agreements. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
184 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION in Limine Number 2: Notice And Cure Termination Provisions Of License Agreements. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
183 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 181 MOTION in Limine Number 1: MasterCard's Motive and Other Alleged "Bad Acts". . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
182 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Support re: 181 MOTION in Limine Number 1: MasterCard's Motive and Other Alleged "Bad Acts".. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
181 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION in Limine Number 1: MasterCard's Motive and Other Alleged "Bad Acts". Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
180 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude MasterCard's 2012 Merchant Satisfaction Survey and Testimony Relating Thereto. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
179 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant and Prejudicial Evidence. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
178 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri, Esq. in Support re: 177 MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
177 |
Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION in Limine to preclude the admission of certain evidence at trial. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
176 |
Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: At a status conference on February 27, 2014, the Court had directed the plaintiff to provide a letter solely to facilitate settlement discussions, in reliance on the defendant's representation that any information contained in such letter would be used for settlement purposes only. Therefore, the defendant's request to use the plaintiff's March 10, 2014 letter in support of its forthcoming motions in limine is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/5/2016) (kko) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
175 |
Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian Cavaleri dated September 28, 2016 Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
174 |
Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian Cavaleri dated 9/23/2016 Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
173 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Opposition re: 167 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer .. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
172 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 167 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer . . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
171 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri in Opposition re: 164 MOTION MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill .. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
170 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 164 MOTION MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill . . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
169 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri in Support re: 167 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer .. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
168 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 167 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer . . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
167 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
166 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Support re: 164 MOTION MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill .. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
165 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 164 MOTION MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill . . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
164 |
Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
163 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. in Support re: 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
162 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Opposition re: 153 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
160 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 153 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc. (Lamson, Justin) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
159 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri in Opposition re: 150 MOTION in Limine / MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
158 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 150 MOTION in Limine / MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
157 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri in Opposition re: 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri in Support re: 153 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 153 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. (Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Reports of Kaushik Gopal and Anthony Creamer. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Support re: 150 MOTION in Limine / MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
151 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 150 MOTION in Limine / MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
150 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine / MasterCard International Incorporated's Motion to Exclude the Testimony and Report of Pamela O'Neill. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 9/8/2016 (db). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
149 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
DECLARATION of Denise L. Plunkett, Esq. in Support re: 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
148 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
147 |
Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Damages. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's proposed redactions are ACCEPTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file the above-discussed documents in redacted form and under seal by September 9, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file all other documents related to the parties' pending motions on ECF by September 9, 2016. The parties shall coordinate their filings so that they appear on the docket sheet in the correct order, i.e., the order in which they were originally submitted. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/31/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
145 |
Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, in accordance with Individual Rule I.C.3, the parties shall submit letters explaining why any portion of the submitted documents should be filed under seal or in redacted form by August 29, 2016. Absent further explanation, the mere fact that a party has previously designated a document or subject matter to be Confidential or Highly Confidential is insufficient to overcome the publics presumptive right of access to judicial documents. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/22/2016) (cf) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
144 |
Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None |
Unknown Document Type |
|
ORDER denying 143 Motion for Reconsideration. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 143.(Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2016) (ama) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
143 |
Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Reconsideration re; 136 Memorandum & Opinion, . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
142 |
Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None |
 |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER: WHEREAS, a conference was held on June 8, 2016, to schedule a jury trial and pre-trial submissions. For the reasons discussed at the conference, it is hereby ORDERED that in accordance with and as further provided in Individual Rule IV.B: 1. No later than June 30, 2016, the parties shall file any Daubert motions. Responses shall be filed by July 29, 2016. No replies shall be filed. The parties' briefs shall not exceed 10 pages per side, per expert; except that the briefs pertaining to any damages expert shall not exceed 15 pages per side. 2. No later than June 30, 2016, MasterCard shall file a summary judgment motion relating exclusively to damages. Any responses shall be filed by July 29, 2016. Any reply shall be filed by August 19, 2016. The opening briefs and response shall not exceed 10 pages; any reply shall not exceed 5 pages. 3. Any motions in limine shall be filed by October 18, 2016. Responses shall be filed by October 28, 2016. Page limits are set forth in the Court's Individual Rules. No replies shall be filed. 4. No later than October 28, 2016, the parties shall file joint voir dire, joint proposed jury instructions, a joint proposed verdict sheet, and a statement of the case, as provided in Individual Rule IV.B.4. The parties shall note any disagreement in the documents. 5. No later than November 4, 2016, the parties shall file a Joint Final Pretrial Order. 6. The parties shall appear for a final pre-trial conference on November 18, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. 7. A jury trial shall commence on December 5, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Motions due by 10/18/2016. Responses due by 10/28/2016 Replies due by 8/19/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2016 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Pretrial Order due by 11/4/2016. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/8/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
141 |
Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for June 8, 2016 at 11:20 a.m., shall be rescheduled for June 8, 2016 at 10:50 a.m., due to a scheduling conflict. Any parties not located within the metropolitan area who wish to participate telephonically may do so by advising the Court, convening all parties on the line and calling into chambers at (212) 805-0288. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2016 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/7/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
140 |
Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: On May 27, 2016, the Honorable Lorna G. Schofield issued an Opinion and Order, granting in part and denying in part the defendant's motion for summary judgment. As soon as practicable, the parties are directed to meet and confer as to whether a settlement conference would be productive at this time. The parties should then, jointly, contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta at (212) 805-0286 to either say that a settlement conference would not be productive or to schedule one for the near future. The parties are further advised that, with few exceptions, the Court's calendar cannot accommodate a settlement conference before the end of July. Accordingly, if the parties seek a conference before any pretrial filings are due, they are urged to contact the Court immediately. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/2/2016) (kko) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
139 |
Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miriam Jerry Manber on behalf of International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Manber, Miriam) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
138 |
Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: WHEREAS, by Opinion and Order dated May 26, 2016, Defendant's motion for summary judgment was granted in part and denied in part. It is hereby ORDERED that a case management conference will be held on June 8, 2016, at 11:20 a.m. to set dates for a final pre-trial order, other pre-trial submissions, a final pre-trial conference and trial. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2016 at 11:20 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/27/2016) (kgo) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
137 |
Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None |
|
|
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated May 26, 2016, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted with respect to ICC's claim for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, but denied as to all other claims. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/27/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal, # 2 Right to Appeal)(km) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
136 |
Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None |
 |
|
OPINION AND ORDER re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mastercard International Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED with respect to ICC's claim for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, but DENIED as to all other claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket No. 122. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/26/2016) (ama) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
135 |
Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER denying as moot 110 Letter Motion for Discovery (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
134 |
Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Laura P. Wexler. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
133 |
Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
132 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
131 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE re: 127 Rule 56.1 Statement . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
130 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Damian R. Cavaleri, Esq. in Opposition re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
129 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Khalil Alami in Opposition re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
128 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
127 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
126 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson, Esq. in Support re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
125 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Hassan Mayassi in Support re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
124 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Crystal Dai in Support re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
123 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 122 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's proposed redactions are accepted in part and rejected in part as provided below. "The common law right of public access to judicial documents is firmly rooted in our nation's history," and courts "must balance competing considerations against" the presumption of access. Lugosch v. Pyramid Co. of Onondaga, 435 F.3d 110, 11920 (2d Cir. 2006) (internal quotation marks omitted); see also Nixon v. Warner Commc'ns., Inc., 435 U.S. 589, 599 (1978) ("[T]he decision as to access is one best left to the sound discretion of the trial court, a discretion to be exercised in light of the relevant facts and circumstances of the particular case."). Exhibit 3 - the proposed redactions are rejected except for the following: percentages, currency amounts, ratio amounts on all pages. On Bates page M0018490, the identity of the prior largest shareholder may be redacted. Exhibit 10 - the proposed redactions are rejected. Exhibit 13 - Bates number M0007099, M0007100: the proposed redactions of currency amounts and percentages are accepted. The remaining redactions ("profit of," "losses of," and "accumulated losses of" are rejected. Bates number M0031945, paragraph "1)" - the proposed redactions are rejected except the numerals; paragraph "2)" - the proposed redactions are rejected; paragraph "3)" - the proposed redactions are rejected; the remaining redaction on the page is rejected. Exhibit 22 - The proposal to seal the entire document is rejected. The document shall be redacted except for the following which shall be disclosed: p. 1 - everything above Recital (C); pp. 7-8. On pages 5 and 6 of the summary judgment brief the proposed redactions to dollar amounts and percentages are accepted. The remaining redactions are rejected. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/4/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
120 |
Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's proposed redactions are accepted as to the bank account numbers found on page 6 footnotes 12-14 of MasterCard Exhibit 3 and on two spreadsheets submitted as part of MasterCard Exhibit 15. It is further ORDERED that the remainder of Plaintiff's proposed redactions are rejected. It is further ORDERED that the parties' shall file all summary judgment papers in redacted form on ECF by November 10, 2015, and versions of the documents without redactions under seal by November 13, 2015. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/2/2015) (kgo) Modified on 11/2/2015 (kgo). (Entered: 11/02/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
119 |
Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 118 Letter filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. ENDORSEMENT: The scope of the summary judgment motion is to be as discussed at the pre-motion conference. The Court does not anticipate a second summary judgment motion. Each party may file up to 30 exhibits in support of the motion, and no exhibit shall exceed 15 pages. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/4/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
118 |
Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fredric S. Newman dated September 2, 2015 re: MasterCard's Request for Clarification re: Summary Judgment. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
117 |
Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from MasterCard International Incorporated dated September 2, 2015 re: Clarification re: Summary Judgment and Permission to file more than 15 exhibits. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
116 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson in Support re: 110 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
115 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 110 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
114 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Fredric S. Newman in Opposition re: 110 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
113 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 110 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission. . Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Justin W. Lamson in Support re: 110 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
111 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 110 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
109 |
Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 107 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission. . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit / Reply Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 8/13/2015 (db). (Entered: 08/11/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
108 |
Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Fredric S. Newman in Opposition re: 107 MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/13/2015 (db). (Entered: 08/11/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
107 |
Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Discovery re: Sufficiency of Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Admission. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Lamson, Justin) Modified on 8/13/2015 (db). (Entered: 08/11/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
106 |
Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: For the aforementioned reasons, ICC shall, if it so chooses, amend its answers in compliance with this order within 14 days, and the parties shall file these motions, with the redactions directed, within three business days. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/7/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MasterCard International Incorporated dated July 30, 2015 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
104 |
Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Fredric S. Newman dated July 29, 2015 re: MasterCard's Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
103 |
Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MasterCard International Incorporated dated July 29, 2015 re: Request for Oral Argument. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 07/08/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/8/2015 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2015.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
100 |
Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Discovery Hearing proceeding held on 06/26/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
99 |
Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Discovery Hearing held on 6/26/2015 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2015.(ca) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
98 |
Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Margulis-Ohnuma terminated. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
97 |
Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for Mary Margulis-Ohnuma to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Margulis-Ohnuma, Mary) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
96 |
Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: On July 10, 2015, the defendant filed a motion requesting that the Court deem admitted certain of its Requests for Admission, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 36. Because documents submitted in connection with the motion have been designated as "Highly Confidential" by the parties, the defendant filed this motion by serving it upon the plaintiff with a courtesy copy to the Court, but did not file it on the Court's ECF system. The parties may serve courtesy copies on the Court as a temporary measure until the Court has ruled whether the "Highly Confidential" information may be filed under seal. Within three business days of the defendant's motion having been fully submitted, the party that seeks to file documents under seal shall submit a letter motion requesting such relief as required by my Individual Rules of Practice. The fact that the parties have agreed that certain information is confidential will not, alone, be grounds to file documents or portions thereof under seal. The party opposing the filing of documents under seal may file an opposition two business days later. The Court will thereafter issue a ruling and direct that the entire motion be filed on ECF, with certain portions redacted, if appropriate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/13/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
95 |
Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: WHEREAS, on July 8, 2015, a conference was held in this matter. It is hereby ORDERED that, by September 9, 2015, Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall file its response, if any, by October 13, 2015. Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by October 28, 2015. Motions due by 9/9/2015. Responses due by 10/13/2015 Replies due by 10/28/2015. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/8/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
94 |
Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from International Cards Company, Ltd. dated June 30, 2015 re: Response to Pre-Motion Letter regarding Summary Judgment. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
93 |
Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
DISCOVERY ORDER: The Court held a discovery conference on June 26, 2015. As discussed at the conference, the defendant's discovery motion shall be filed by July 10, 2015. The plaintiff shall file its response by July 21, 2015. The defendant shall file its reply by July 24, 2015. Defendant shall file a courtesy copy of the fully submitted motion immediately thereafter. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 7/10/2015. Responses due by 7/21/2015 Replies due by 7/24/2015. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/26/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
92 |
Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated June 24, 2015 re: MasterCard's requests for pre-motion conference. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ICC's Initial Responses to MasterCard's First Requests for Admission)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MasterCard International Incorporated dated June 24, 2015 re: Request for pre-motion conference re: International Cards Company's responses and objections to MasterCard's Requests for Admission. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MasterCard International Incorporated dated June 24, 2015 re: Request for pre-motion conference re: renewed request for security bond for taxable costs. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
89 |
Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: WHEREAS, by letter dated June 19, 2015, Defendant MasterCard International Inc. requested a pre-motion conference concerning its anticipated Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that, no later than June 30, 2015, Plaintiff International Cards Company, Ltd. shall file its response, if any, to Defendant's letter. It is further ORDERED that a pre-motion conference shall be held on July 8, 2015, at 10:50 a.m. in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/8/2015 at 10:50 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/23/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from MasterCard International Incorporated dated June 19, 2015 re: request for pre-motion conference regarding summary judgment. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 85 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc., re: Final Status Conference. ENDORSEMENT: It is unclear why MasterCard is unable to file its pre-motion letter with Judge Schofield in advance of the resolution of any outstanding matters before me. The Court will, however, grant defendant one additional week to file their letter, or until June 26, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/19/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated June 18, 2015 re: Final Status Conference. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
85 |
Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MasterCard International Incorporated dated June 18, 2015 re: Final Status Conference. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
CONFERENCE ORDER: A final status conference to discuss any outstanding discovery matters is scheduled for Friday, June 26, 2015, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties shall each submit a letter setting forth any issues they anticipate raising at this conference by June 24, 2015. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 6/26/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/17/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 82 Letter, filed by International Cards Company, Ltd., re: Request for permission for Mr. Khalil Alami to attend June 5th Settlement Conference by telephone. ENDORSEMENT: The plaintiff's request is GRANTED. Mr. Alami shall attend the June 5th settlement conference by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall appear at the conference with a telephone number to reach Mr. Alami. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/27/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Fredric S. Newman dated May 26, 2015 re: Request for permission for Mr. Khalil Alami to attend June 5th Settlement Conference by telephone. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
PRE-MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert discovery closed on May 1, 2015, and pursuant to the October 18, 2013 Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, a request for a pre-motion conference related to summary judgment was to be filed within one week of discovery's close. (ECF No. 19.) On May 5, 2015, in light of the parties' June 5, 2015, settlement conference before this Court, the defendant MasterCard International, Inc. requested that the deadline to request a pre-motion conference be extended. (ECF No. 79.) The defendant's request is GRANTED. The parties shall file a pre-motion letter related to summary judgment within 14 days of June 5, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
AMENDED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: The settlement conference in this matter, previously scheduled for Monday, June 01, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for Friday, June 05, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/5/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from MasterCard International Incorporated dated May 5, 2015 re: Request for Clarification Regarding Timing of Summary Judgment-Related Proceedings. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Monday, June 01, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. If this date is unavailable for any party, they must contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta immediately at (212) 805-0286. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Procedures for Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, a copy of which is available on the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Netburn. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Tuesday, May 26, 2015. Should the parties resolve the litigation before the conference date they must notify the Court in writing immediately. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 6/1/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/4/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn dated May 1, 2015 re: Status Report. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: Because MasterCard has demonstrated substantial need, and undue hardship, it has overcome the protections of the work product doctrine and may retain the Spreadsheets. The parties shall file a joint status letter on May 1, 2015 (or sooner, if they believe it appropriate) addressing whether a settlement conference would be productive. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/8/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn dated January 5, 2015 re: Status Report. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett dated 12/12/2014 re: Extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/12/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: In light of this factual background and legal framework, MasterCard is ordered to show cause by December 16, 2014, why it should not be directed to return the documents at issue. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/12/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Discovery Conference proceeding held on 9/8/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days(soh) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Discovery Conference held on 9/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer (Mary Greco), (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2015.(soh) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: Fact discovery having closed on or about November 14, 2014, the parties shall submit a joint letter informing the Court about the status of the case within 45 days of this Order. In the letter, the parties should also indicate whether they wish to schedule a second settlement conference and, if so, include proposed dates on at least two consecutive weeks. The parties are, however, encouraged to contact the Court earlier if they believe a settlement conference sooner would be productive. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/20/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/14/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for October 31, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss the discovery disputes raised by the defendant's letter, dated October 28, 2014, and the plaintiff's response, dated October 29, 2014. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers, at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 10/31/2014 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/29/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: Because the Court does not have jurisdiction over MEPS, it does not have the power to command MEPS to comply with the subpoena. And even if the Court could exercise such power, it would be required to quash the subpoena in light of the territorial limits imposed by Rule 45(c) and the requirements imposed by Rule 45(d). Accordingly, ICCs application is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/10/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: A discovery conference is scheduled for Tuesday, October 14, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties should come prepared to discuss the discovery disputes raised by the plaintiff's letters, dated September 30, 2014 and October 8, 2014, and the defendant's letter, dated October 6, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/9/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett dated September 29, 2014 re: Plaintiff's Middle East Payment Services Subpoena. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Wexler, Laura) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri, Esq. dated September 22, 2014 re: Middle East Payment Services Subpoena. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: The Court held a telephone conference on September 16, 2014, to discuss the parties' dispute over a Rule 45 subpoena the plaintiff served on a third party during his deposition. The subpoena commands the presence of the third party's employer, who is located in Jordan, in New York for a deposition. The plaintiff represents to the Court that it will not serve any additional subpoenas on third parties' deponents. The Court accepts and orders compliance with this representation. The Court instructs the parties to submit letters stating their positions with respect to the enforceability of the subpoena. The plaintiff shall file its letter by September 22, 2014, and the defendant shall respond by September 29, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/16/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Jeffrey A Miller dated September 12, 2014 re: Deposition Scheduling. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: As a settlement agreement was not reached, the Court rules as follows for the reasons discussed on the record at the September 8 conference: The Court GRANTS the defendant's request for a protective order precluding the plaintiff from deposing MasterCard Chief Executive Officer Ajay Banga. The Court GRANTS the defendant's request for a protective order precluding the plaintiff from deposing Michael Miebach, President of MasterCard's Middle East & Africa Region, WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the plaintiff renewing its request for a deposition if warranted after the deposition of Raghu Malhotra. The Court GRANTS the defendant's request for a protective order barring the plaintiff from commanding Beena Pothen's presence in New York for a deposition. The defendant is ORDERED to produce Pothen for a deposition but may do so by videoconference. The Court GRANTS the defendant's request for a 45-day extension of the fact discovery period. Fact discovery shall now end on November 14, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 11/14/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/9/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated September 5, 2014 re: Response to MasterCard's August 29 and September 2 Letters. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit E)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 56 Letter filed by Mastercard International Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The defendant filed letters regarding discovery disputes on August 29, 2014, and September 2, 2014. A settlement conference in this matter is scheduled for September 8, 2014. If the settlement discussions are not successful, the Court intends to address the defendant's letters at the conclusion of the settlement conference. If the plaintiff wishes to file a response letter, it must do so by September 5, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 9/4/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise L. Plunkett, dated 09/02/2014 re: Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline and Relief from 7-hour time limit for 30(b)(6) deposition of plaintiff ICC. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise L. Plunkett, dated 08/29/2014 re: Discovery Conference Regarding Depositions. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: For the reasons herein, the Court finds that Documents 300-309 are privileged and may be withheld in their entirety. No other exemplar documents may be withheld entirely. MasterCard may produce the documents identified in this order with the redactions as directed above. The Court takes no position as to whether any documents, in whole or in part, are appropriate to produce under the parties' March 5, 2014 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. MasterCard is directed to review the documents it has withheld or redacted and to produce all documents that do not contain communications seeking or reflecting direct legal advice from in-house attorneys in accordance with the guidance in this order. Documents shared with in-house attorneys are not presumptively privileged, nor are documents arising from conferences at which in-house attorneys were present. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/27/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Margulis-Ohnuma on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. (Margulis-Ohnuma, Mary) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated August 7, 2014 re: MasterCard's Privilege Assertions. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett, dated August 6, 2014 re: Documents for in camera review. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE proceeding held on 06/26/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/26/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2014.(ca) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett, dated August 1, 2014 re: MasterCard Privilege Log. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: In response to the plaintiff's July 24, 2014 letter regarding the sufficiency of the defendant's privilege log, the Court orders the following. Each party shall identify 10 documents for the Court to review in camera. By August 6, 2014, the defendant shall file a letter setting forth its basis for asserting a privilege with respect to these 20 documents. The letter shall also include as an attachment a list identifying by title or other relevant description all of the individuals who sent or received the communications. By email or hand delivery, the defendant shall also submit the 20 documents for in camera review. The plaintiff may file a letter setting forth its position on the defendants privilege assertion by Monday, August 11, 2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/30/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated July 24, 2014 re: MasterCard Privilege Log. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 MasterCard Privilege Log)(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: The Court held a telephone conference on June 26, 2014. As discussed during the conference, the deadline for fact discovery is extended to September 30, 2014. The Court SCHEDULES a settlement conference for September 8, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties shall review and comply with the Procedures for Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Netburn, a copy of which is available on the Courts website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Netburn. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Tuesday, September 02, 2014. Should the parties resolve the litigation before the conference date, they must notify the Court in writing immediately. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/27/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: The Court SCHEDULES a telephone conference for Thursday, June 26, 2014 at 3:00 p.m., to discuss whether holding a settlement conference before depositions are taken would be productive. At that time, the parties should jointly call chambers at (212) 805-0286. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2014 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/5/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri and Denise Plunkett dated 6/02/14 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER. The Court GRANTS the defendant's request to extend the fact discovery deadline to July 31, 2014, and GRANTS the plaintiff's request that defendant add Stephen Ruch and Dharma Bajpai as custodians for purposes of ESI discovery. By June 2, 2014, the parties shall submit a joint status letter informing the Court as to the status of settlement negotiations and whether a settlement conference would be productive at that time. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/4/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: The Court SCHEDULES a telephone conference on Thursday, April 3, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the issues raised in the parties joint letter submitted on March 31, 2014. (Telephone Conference set for 4/3/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/1/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a STATUS CONFERENCE proceeding held on 02/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/27/2014 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer/Mary Greco, (518) 581-8973. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2014.(ca) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Page Wexler on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. (Wexler, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/5/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated February 20, 2014 re: Responsive Letter Regarding Discovery Conference. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ahmed Zu'bi)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett, dated February 20, 2014 re: Responsive Letter Regarding Discovery Conference. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jay N. Fastow on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. New Address: Ballard Spahr LLP, 425 Park Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10022, (212) 223-0200. (Fastow, Jay) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated February 13, 2014 re: Discovery Conference. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett, dated February 13, 2014 re: Discovery Conference. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Denise Plunkett on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. New Address: Ballard Spahr LLP, 425 Park Ave., New York, NY, USA 10022, (212) 223-0200. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Justin Ward Lamson on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. New Address: Ballard Spahr LLP, 425 Park Avenue, New York, NY, USA 10022, 212-223-0200. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER granting 27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to file discovery letters. The telephone conference scheduled for 2/14/2014 is adjourned. The parties shall appear for an in-person conference on 2/27/2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219 in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, NY, NY. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
AMENDED ORDER: The telephone conference in this matter, previously scheduled for Friday, February 14, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. is RESCHEDULED for Friday, February 14, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 219 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 2/14/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/05/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re pre-motion letters regarding current discovery disputes addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Denise Plunkett dated 2/06/2014. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: To the extent any disputes cannot be resolved between the parties, a letter from the moving party shall be filed by Monday, February 10, 2014. Any responsive letter shall be filed by Thursday, February 13, 2014 by 12:00 p.m. The Court will hold a telephone conference on Friday, February 14, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. At that time, the parties should jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0286, with all relevant individuals on the line. On this conference call, the Court will discuss any discovery disputes and the parties' positions regarding settlement. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/14/2014 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/04/2014) (ama) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Damian R. Cavaleri dated February 4, 2014 re: Request for Pre-Motion Discovery Conference. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for GENERAL PRETRIAL (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/31/2014) (ja) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fredric S. Newman and Jay N. Fastow dated January 30, 2014 re: Joint Status Report on Settlement. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Ward Lamson on behalf of Mastercard International Inc.. (Lamson, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 20 Letter filed by International Cards Company, Ltd., Mastercard International Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered., ( Deposition due by 4/14/2014., Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2014.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/15/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fredric S. Newman dated 11/15/2013 re: Current Discovery Plan. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd., Mastercard International Inc..(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is approximately three weeks. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2013. Deposition due by 4/14/2014. Fact Discovery due by 4/14/2014. Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/18/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Alan Miller on behalf of International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from All Parties dated October 9, 2013 re: Initial Pretrial Conference and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Case Management Plan, # 2 Exhibit ICC's Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to ICC's Second Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit D to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit E to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit F to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit G to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit H to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit I to MasterCard's Answer and Counterclaims, # 14 Exhibit ICC's Reply to Counterclaims)(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
ANSWER to 15 Counterclaim. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Newman, Fredric) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against International Cards Company, Ltd.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 12 Amended Complaint, against Mastercard International Inc. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. Related document: 12 Amended Complaint, filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (rjm) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION: The parties agree as follows: 1. ICC will file a Second Amended Complaint in accordance with the above on or before August 21, 2013; 2. MasterCard will file its Answer and Counterclaims (if any) to the Second Amended Complaint on or before September 13, 2013; 3. ICC will answer, move or otherwise respond to MasterCard's Counterclaims, if any, on or before September 27, 2013; 4. The Case Management Conference (currently scheduled for August 28, 2013), with the Court's permission, shall be adjourned until October 16, 2013 (or any date thereafter that is convenient for the Court); 5. The parties will exchange Initial Disclosures no later than September 27, 2013; 6. The parties will have an initial settlement discussion no later than October 4; and 7. The parties will file a Joint Proposed Case Management Order no later than seven (7) days before the Case Management Conference. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances., ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/19/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Mastercard International Inc. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by International Cards Company, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(mro) (Main Document 12 replaced on 7/25/2013) (sdi). (Entered: 07/16/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Denise Plunkett dated 7/3/2013 re: We write on behalf of all parties to request an adjournment of the Case Management Conference, currently scheduled for July 22, 2013, and all related deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), for 30 days. ENDORSEMENT: The conference shall be adjourned to August 28, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. All related deadlines are extended 30 days., ( Initial Conference set for 8/28/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/10/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION: The parties hereto, by their undersigned attorneys, hereby stipulate and agree as follows: NOW THEREFORE, the parties agree as follows: ICC will amend its Complaint on or before July 12, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2013.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/17/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that included with the Proposed Civil Case Management Plan, the parties submit one copy of the parties pleadings and a joint letter, not to exceed 5 pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as outlined within this order. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: July 22, 2013, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 1106 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/7/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Denise Plunkett dated 5/8/2013 re: We represent defendant MasterCard International Incorporated ("MasterCard") in connection with the above-referenced action. We respectfully request an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint until June 17, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: The deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to June 17, 2013. Mastercard International Inc. answer due 6/17/2013. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/9/2013) (ft) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mastercard Incorporated for Mastercard International Inc.. Document filed by Mastercard International Inc..(Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay N. Fastow on behalf of Mastercard International Inc. (Fastow, Jay) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Denise Plunkett on behalf of Mastercard International Inc. (Plunkett, Denise) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate International Brokerage and Financial Markets Co. for International Cards Company, Ltd.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd..(Cavaleri, Damian) Modified on 4/24/2013 (lb). (Entered: 04/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. All Defendants. Service was accepted by Christine Zieminski, Specialist, Paralegal. Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.. (Cavaleri, Damian) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
COMPLAINT against Mastercard International Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401065427)Document filed by International Cards Company, Ltd.(mqu) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |