Social Enterprise LLC v. Sociedad Agricola Cato S.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-04158

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 10:27 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Social Enterprise, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 844 3416 +1 716 566 5401 dmoar@goldbergsegalla.com
No Logo Sociedad Agricola Cato S.A., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mattioni, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Galati +1 215 629 1600 +1 215 923 2227 sgalati@mattioni.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Galati +1 215 629 1600 +1 215 923 2227 sgalati@mattioni.com
v.
No Logo Sociedad Agricola Cato S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mattioni, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Galati +1 215 629 1600 +1 215 923 2227 sgalati@mattioni.com
No Logo Social Enterprise, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 844 3416 +1 716 566 5401 dmoar@goldbergsegalla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 844 3416 +1 716 566 5401 dmoar@goldbergsegalla.com
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Summons Reissued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Sociedad Agricola Cato S.A.. (Galati, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Initial Conference Hearing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Pre Motion Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Letters Rogatory
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Clerks Notice of Rule 73
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?