El-Nahal v. Yassky et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03690
District Judge Katherine B. Forrest, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 5:03 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hassan El-Nahal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller, Gallagher & Grimley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Ackman +1 917 282 8178 +1 917 591 8300 dan@danackmanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Commissioner Matthew Daus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
No Logo David Yassky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City Of New York ,"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherrill Kurland +1 212 788 0821 +1 212 791 9714 skurland@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 41 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Hassan El-Nahal USCA Case Number 14-0405. This appeal was withdrawn subject to reinstatement upon terms agreed to by the parties. Counsel for the appellant has submitted a timely notice of reinstatement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is reinstated. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 04/24/2014. (nd) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 41 Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Hassan El-Nahal USCA Case Number 14-405. The parties have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 3/31/2014. (nd) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
      CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: 40 Notice of Appeal, 38 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, 39 Clerk's Judgment,. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
        FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9341216. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Decision, # 2 Exhibit Judgment)(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 2/10/2014 (tp). (Entered: 02/10/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
          CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated January 29, 2014, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted, and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/31/14) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER granting 11 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. For these reasons, defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF Nos. 11 and 17 and to terminate this action. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/29/2014) (mro) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: All dates and deadlines in this matter, including the January 7, 2014 status conference, are adjourned pending the Court's decision on summary judgment. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/30/2013) (mro) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                        COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Rule 56.1 Statement of Material Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 11/1/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 11/1/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Sherrill Kurland in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit "C")(Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 26 Letter filed by Hassan El-Nahal. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: Conference adjourned to 1/7/14 at 1 pm. ( Status Conference set for 1/7/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/25/2013) (mro) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Daniel L. Ackman dated 10-25-13 re: El-Nahal v. Yassky, et al. - scheduling. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for Friday, January 10, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. is adjourned to Tuesday, January 14, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 1/14/2014 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/24/2013) (mro) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Daniel L. Ackman dated 10-24-13 re: El-Nahal v. Yassky, et al.. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US v Katzin)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - TLC Rules, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Mullings aff., # 4 Exhibit 4 - Alexandre Brief, # 5 Exhibit 5 - TLC statement, # 6 Exhibit 5A - TLC FAQ, # 7 Exhibit 6 - TLC press rel., # 8 Exhibit 7 - Press reports, # 9 Exhibit 8 - NYT article, # 10 Exhibit 9 - TLC press rel., # 11 Exhibit 10 - DA press rel., # 12 Exhibit 11 - Yassky test., # 13 Exhibit 12 - Royter Aff., # 14 Exhibit 13 - Royter test., # 15 Exhibit 14 - Mullings test., # 16 Exhibit 15 - penalty sched, # 17 Exhibit 16 - TLC directive to El-Nahal, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Commendation, # 19 Affidavit 18 - El-Nahal Aff., # 20 Exhibit 19 - TLC Directive, # 21 Exhibit 20 - TLC Appeal ruling, # 22 Exhibit 21 - TLC ALJ Dec., # 23 Exhibit 22 - TLC Appeal Dec., # 24 Exhibit 23 - TLC ALJ Dec., # 25 Exhibit 24 - TLC Appeal Dec., # 26 Exhibit 25 - Taxi fact book, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Goldstein aff.)(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Also in opposition to defs. motion to dismiss. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #22) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. cross motion brief; also in opposition to motion to dismiss. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 9/25/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 18 - El-Nahal Aff., # 2 Exhibit 19 - TLC directive, # 3 Exhibit 20 - TLC Appeal Ruling, # 4 Exhibit 21 - TLC ALJ Ruling, # 5 Exhibit 22 - TLC AppealRuling, # 6 Exhibit 23 - TLC ALJ Rulings, # 7 Exhibit 24 - TLC Appeal Ruling, # 8 Exhibit 25 - taxi fact book, # 9 Exhibit 26 - Goldstein aff.)(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 10/18/2013 (db). (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Daniel L. Ackman in Support re: 17 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - TLC Rules, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Mullings aff., # 4 Exhibit 4 - Alexandre Brief, # 5 Exhibit 5 - TLC statement, # 6 Exhibit 5A - TLC FAQ, # 7 Exhibit 6 - TLC press rel., # 8 Exhibit 7 - Press reports, # 9 Exhibit 8 - NYT article, # 10 Exhibit 9 - TLC press rel., # 11 Exhibit 10 - DA press rel., # 12 Exhibit 11 - Yassky test., # 13 Exhibit 12 - Royter Aff., # 14 Exhibit 13 - Royter test., # 15 Exhibit 14 - Mullings test., # 16 Exhibit 15 - penalty sched, # 17 Exhibit 16 - TLC directive to El-Nahal)(Ackman, Daniel) Modified on 10/18/2013 (db). (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal.(Ackman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: As set forth at the September 13 initial pretrial conference, Defendants' motion to dismiss is deemed a motion for summary judgment. The parties shall submit briefs on the following schedule: By Tuesday, September 24, 2013, at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment and his own motion for summary judgment. By Thursday, October 31, 2013, at 5:00 p.m., Defendants shall file a Statement of Material Facts in support of their motion for summary judgment in accordance with Local Civil Rule 56.1, as well as their opposition to Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment. By Friday, November 15, 2013, at 5:00 p.m., Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment, as well as his reply in support of his motion for summary judgment. By Friday, December 6, 2013, at 5:00 p.m., Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment. The parties shall appear for a status conference on Friday, January 10, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. The parties are further encouraged to submit a core set of undisputed facts to the Court. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/13/2013) (mro) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Sherrill Kurland dated 8/21/13 re: The parties jointly seek the Court's approval for a modified briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiff requests September 24, 2013 to serve and file the opposition to the motion to dismiss; and Defendants seek October 10, 2013 to file a Reply. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: Schedule accepted. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment: ( Responses due by 9/24/2013, Replies due by 10/10/2013.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/26/2013) (mro) Modified on 9/16/2013 (mro). (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Declaration with Exhibits, Memorandum of Law served on Daniel L. Ackman, Esq. for Plaintiff on August 20, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 9/16/2013 (mro). (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Sherrill Kurland in Support re: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 9/16/2013 (mro). (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. Responses due by 9/9/2013(Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 9/16/2013 (mro). (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss with supporting documents and Memo of Law served on Daniel A. Ackman, Esq. for Plaintiff on August 20, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 8/21/2013 (db). (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. Responses due by 9/6/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kurland, Sherrill) Modified on 8/21/2013 (db). (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Sherrill Kurland dated 6/20/13 re: Counsel writes to request an enlargement of time to 8/20/13 to respond to the complaint. Counsel also requests that the 8/30/13 initial conference be rescheduled. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: Extension to respond to the complaint on or before 8/20/13 is granted. Conference adjourned to 9/13/13 at 9 am. Michael Bloomberg answer due 8/20/2013; Matthew Daus answer due 8/20/2013; The City Of New York, answer due 8/20/2013; David Yassky answer due 8/20/2013.( Initial Conference set for 9/13/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/24/2013) (mro) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sherrill Kurland on behalf of All Defendants. New Address: NYC Law Department, 100 Church Street, Room 5-167, New York, NY, USA 10007, 212-356-2605. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sherrill Kurland on behalf of Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York,, David Yassky. (Kurland, Sherrill) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Lead counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference ("IPTC") promptly at 12:00 p.m., August 30, 2013. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/18/2013) (mro) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/13) (mn) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, Matthew Daus, The City Of New York, David Yassky. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401068694)Document filed by Hassan El-Nahal.(mn) (jd). (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?