D'Aquin v. Rodriguez et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-02637

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 3:49 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas L D'Aquin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas L dAquin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L dAquin +1 225 614 7100
v.
No Logo Leon Rodriguez, Defendant
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
No Logo USCIS New Orleans, Defendant
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Continue
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Memorandum
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Request
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Summons Issued as to Leon Rodriguez, USCIS, USCIS New Orleans. (via USPS w/ cc Pauper Order & Pauper Letter) (cml) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 39 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?