USA v. Noland et al
Criminal Case Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:14-cr-00401

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 8:21 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Katherine Noland, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard N. Stuckey, Attorney at Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Richard N. Stuckey +1 303 292 0110 +1 303 292 0522 dick@richardstuckeylaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20/30 Payment Authorization as to Thomas Noland, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/16/2015. (tscha, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    CJA 20/30 Payment Authorization as to Katherine Noland, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/17/2015. (tscha, ) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
      CJA 20/30 Payment Request as to Thomas Noland. (Attachments: # 1 CJA Attachment)(Tatum, John) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        JUDGMENT as to defendant Thomas Noland (2): Count 1s, Defendant committed to the United States Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of TIME SERVED. Special Assessment of $100.00. Fine of $500.00; Count 2, Dismissed on Motion of the Government by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/8/2015. (vbarn) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          CJA 21/31 Payment Authorization as to Thomas Noland by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/20/15. (dbrow, ) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            CJA 21/31 Payment Authorization as to Katherine Noland, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/3/2015. (tscha, ) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER Granting 94 MOTION to Dismiss Counts as to Thomas Noland. The Indictment as to Defendant Thomas Noland is DISMISSED. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/02/2015. (athom, ) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Sentencing held on 9/2/2015 as to defendant Thomas Noland. ORDERED granting 94 Motion to Dismiss Counts as to Thomas Noland (2). Defendant sentenced as reflected on the record. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (vbarn) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Dismiss Counts by USA as to Thomas Noland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Korver, Michele) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER as to Thomas Noland. Sentencing RESET for 2:00 PM on 9/2/2015 in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/27/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec ) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                      RESTRICTED ADDENDUM to Presentence Report 91 as to Thomas Noland (srich, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                        RESTRICTED PRESENTENCE REPORT as to Thomas Noland (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(srich, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                          OBJECTION/RESPONSE to Presentence Report 89 by Thomas Noland (Tatum, John) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 88 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                            FINAL ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE as to Katherine Noland. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/06/2015. (cthom, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                              RESTRICTED PRESENTENCE REPORT first disclosure for attorney review as to Thomas Noland (srich, ) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 CJA 21/31 Payment Request
                                CJA 21/31 Payment Request as to Katherine Noland. (Stuckey, Richard)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                  MOTION for Forfeiture of Property FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE by USA as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hurd, Laura)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 85 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Judgment*Court Filing
                                    JUDGMENT as to defendant Katherine Noland (1). Count 1, Dismissed. Count 2, 5 years probation, $100 special assessment, $20,000 restitution. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/18/2015. (cpear)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: 6/23/2015 CJA 21/31 Payment Request
                                      CJA 21/31 Payment Request as to Katherine Noland. (Stuckey, Richard)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 CJA 20/30 Payment Request
                                        CJA 20/30 Payment Request as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Interim payments order, # (2) Final spreadsheets)(Stuckey, Richard)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Order on Motion For Downward Departure Pursuant to 5K1.1Court Filing
                                          COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Sentencing held on 6/18/2015 as to defendant Katherine Noland (1). Defendant sentenced as reflected on the record. Government's oral motion for third point for acceptance of responsibility is granted. [80] Motion for Downward Departure Pursuant to 5K1.1 as to Katherine Noland (1) is granted. [81] Motion to Dismiss Counts as to Katherine Noland (1) is granted. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss Counts by USA as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Korver, Michele)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Motion for Downward Departure Pursuant to 5K1.1
                                              MOTION For Downward Departure Pursuant to 5K1.1 by USA as to Katherine Noland. (Korver, Michele)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 79 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Statement
                                                STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF PLEA OF GUILTY by Defendant Thomas Noland. (cpear)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                  RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: as to Thomas Noland. (cpear)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to RestrictCourt Filing
                                                    COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Change of Plea Hearing as to Thomas Noland held on 6/10/2015. [72] Motion for Leave to Restrict as to Thomas Noland (2) is granted. Waiver of Indictment and Information are accepted for filing. Guilty plea entered by Thomas Noland (2) to Count 1 of the Information. Sentencing set for 9/2/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Court Reporter: Darlene Martinez. (cpear)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Information - Felony
                                                      INFORMATION as to Thomas Noland (2) count(s) 1s. (Attachments: # (1) Penalty Sheet) (athom, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 CJA 21/31 Authorization for ServiceCourt Filing
                                                      CJA 21/31 Authorization for Service as to Katherine Noland by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/9/2015. (shugh)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                        WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Thomas Noland. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/10/2015. (cpear)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                          RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: as to Thomas Noland. (Korver, Michele)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Motion for Leave to Restrict
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Restrict by USA as to Thomas Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Korver, Michele)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Restricted Presentence Report Addendum
                                                              RESTRICTED ADDENDUM to Presentence Report [70] as to Katherine Noland (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(srich, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Restricted Presentence Report - Final
                                                                RESTRICTED PRESENTENCE REPORT as to Katherine Noland (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(srich, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: 6/9/2015 Restricted Bail Status Report-Reconsideration - Level 4
                                                                  RESTRICTED BAIL STATUS REPORT-RECONSIDERATION - Level 4: re: [24] as to Thomas Noland. (athom, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 CJA 21/31 Payment Request
                                                                    CJA 21/31 Payment Request as to Katherine Noland. (Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 CJA 21/31 Request for Service
                                                                      CJA 21/31 Request for Service as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) CJA Attachment)(Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Objection/Response to Presentence Report
                                                                        OBJECTION/RESPONSE to Presentence Report by Katherine Noland (Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/27/2015 CJA 20/30 Payment AuthorizationCourt Filing
                                                                          CJA 20/30 Payment Authorization as to Katherine Noland by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/14/2015. (shugh)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Restricted Presentence Report - Attorney Disclosure
                                                                            RESTRICTED PRESENTENCE REPORT first disclosure for attorney review as to Katherine Noland (srich, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                                                                              PRELIMINARY ORDER re [62] Motion for Forfeiture of Property as to Katherine Noland (1). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/15/2015. (tscha, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
                                                                                MOTION for Forfeiture of Property FOR PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE by USA as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hurd, Laura)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: 5/14/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Laura Beth Hurd appearing for USA. Attorney Laura Beth Hurd added to party USA(pty:pla) (Hurd, Laura)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to Thomas Noland. At the request of the parties, the Change of Plea Hearing presently scheduled for 5/27/2015 at 11:30 AM is RESET for 6/10/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/13/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/28/2015 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to Thomas Noland. Change of Plea Hearing RESET for 5/27/2015 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/28/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to RestrictCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [54] Motion for Leave to Restrict as to Thomas Noland (2). SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/24/2014. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                                                          RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: as to Thomas Noland. (Tatum, John)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                                                            RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: as to Thomas Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tatum, John)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Motion for Leave to Restrict
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Thomas Noland. (Tatum, John)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 CJA 20/30 Payment Request
                                                                                                CJA 20/30 Payment Request as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) CJA Attachment)(Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER as to Thomas Noland. Change of Plea Hearing RESET for 4/29/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/8/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [50] Joint Motion to Continue Change of Plea Hearing as to Thomas Noland (2). The Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/6/2015 is vacated. Counsel shall confer and contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2784) before 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, April 8, 2015, to RESET the Change of Plea Hearing in this matter. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/2/2015. Text Only Entry (cpear)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: 4/2/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Change Of Plea Hearing by Thomas Noland. (Tatum, John)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Statement
                                                                                                        STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF PLEA OF GUILTY by Defendant Katherine Noland. (cpear)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                                                                          RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: as to Katherine Noland. (cpear)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Order on Motion for Leave to RestrictCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Change of Plea Hearing as to Katherine Noland held on 3/27/2015. Guilty plea entered by Katherine Noland (1) to Count 2 of the Indictment. [45] Government's Motion to Restrict Document as to Katherine Noland (1) is GRANTED. Sentencing set for 6/18/2015 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Court Reporter: Teri Lindblom. (cpear)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Restricted Document - Level 2
                                                                                                              RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: as to Katherine Noland. (Korver, Michele)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Motion for Leave to Restrict
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Restrict by USA as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Korver, Michele)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Restricted Bail Status Report-Reconsideration - Level 4
                                                                                                                  RESTRICTED BAIL STATUS REPORT-Level 4: re: [25] as to Katherine Noland. (tscha, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Order Setting HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing as to Thomas Noland re [41] Notice of Disposition. Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/6/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/13/2015. (tscha, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to Thomas Noland. In response to the Notice of Disposition [ECF No. 41], it is ORDERED that counsel shall confer and contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2784) on or before 5:00 pm on Thursday, March 12, 2015 to set this matter for a Change of Plea Hearing. SO ORDERED BY Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/9/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Notice of Disposition
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disposition by Thomas Noland (Tatum, John)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: 3/9/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference as to Thomas Noland held on 3/9/2015. Further Status Conference set for 4/13/2015 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: 3/5/2015 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [38] Motion to Continue as to Katherine Noland (1). Change of Plea Hearing RESET for 3/27/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/5/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Change of Plea Hearing Date by USA as to Katherine Noland. (Korver, Michele)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 CJA 20/30 Payment AuthorizationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                CJA 20/30 Payment Authorization as to Katherine Noland by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/22/2015. (shugh)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Order Setting HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing as to Katherine Noland re [34] Notice of Disposition. Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/10/2015. (tscha, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER as to Katherine Noland. In response to the Notice of Disposition [ECF No. 34], it is ORDERED that counsel shall confer and contact Chambers via conference call (303-335-2784) on or before 5:00 pm on Tuesday, February 10, 2015 to set this matter for a Change of Plea Hearing. SO ORDERED BY Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/4/2015. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Notice of Disposition
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disposition by Katherine Noland, Thomas Noland (Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Status Conference as to Katherine Noland and Thomas Noland held on 1/26/2015. Motions due by 3/23/2015. Responses due by 4/2/2015. Status Conference set for 3/9/2015 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 CJA 20/30 Payment Request
                                                                                                                                          CJA 20/30 Payment Request as to Katherine Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Interim payments order, # (2) Spreadsheets, # (3) Cellphone billing)(Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 CJA Order for Interim PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            CJA Order for Interim Payment as to Katherine Noland by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/20/2014. (shugh)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 CJA 21/31 Payment AuthorizationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              CJA 21/31 Payment Authorization as to Thomas Noland by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/1/2014. (shugh)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Tonya Shotwell Andrews appearing for USA. Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla) (Andrews, Tonya)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 CJA Request for Interim Payment
                                                                                                                                                  CJA Request for Interim Payment as to Katherine Noland, Thomas Noland. (Stuckey, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Order on Motion to Declare Case ComplexCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference as to Katherine Noland and Thomas Noland held before Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/10/2014. Defendants present on bond. Granting [22] Government's Unopposed Motion for an Ends of Justice Continuance and Excludable Time as to Katherine Noland and Thomas Noland. The Court finds that this matter is complex. The ends of justice served by the granting of the continuance outweigh the best interests of the public at trial. The Court grants a speedy trial exclusion from today's date through March 10, 2015. Reciprocal Discovery deadline reset to 12/15/2014. Status Conference set for 1/26/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Bonds continued. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (eseam)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 CJA 21/31 Payment Request
                                                                                                                                                      CJA 21/31 Payment Request as to Thomas Noland. (Attachments: # (1) CJA Attachment)(Tatum, John)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Restricted Bail Report - Level 4
                                                                                                                                                        RESTRICTED BAIL REPORT - Level 4: as to Katherine Noland. (trlee, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Restricted Bail Report - Level 4
                                                                                                                                                          RESTRICTED BAIL REPORT - Level 4: as to Thomas Noland. (trlee, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: 10/20/2014 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER as to Katherine Noland, Thomas Noland. Status Conference set for 11/10/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Defendants are required to be present. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/20/2014. (Text Only Entry ) (rmsec )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Motion to Declare Case Complex
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Declare Case Complex and for Ends of Justice Continuance by USA as to Katherine Noland, Thomas Noland. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Korver, Michele)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/14. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                  Unsecured Bond Entered as to Thomas Noland in amount of $ $10,000. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/14. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                      Unsecured Bond Entered as to Katherine Noland in amount of $ $10,000. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Discovery Conference Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery Conference Memorandum and ORDER: Estimated Trial Time - 10 days as to Thomas Noland by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/14. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Discovery Conference Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery Conference Memorandum and ORDER: Estimated Trial Time - 10 days as to Katherine Noland by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/15/14. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Arraignment, Discovery, and Detention Hearing as to Katherine Noland and Thomas Noland held on 10/15/2014. Defendants present in custody. Plea entered by Katherine Noland and Thomas Noland Not Guilty on all counts. Discovery memorandum executed as to both Defendants. Defendants advised of conditions of bond and remanded for processing and release. Counsel is directed to chambers. (Total time: 24 minutes, Hearing time: 10:24-10:48 a.m.)APPEARANCES: Michelle Korver on behalf of the Government, Richard Stuckey on behalf of the defendant Katherine, John Tatum on behalf of Defendant Thomas, Seth Junker on behalf of pretrial. FTR: CRIMINAL DUTY AM. (amont) Text Only Entry
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John S. Tatum as Court-Appointed Counsel appearing for Thomas Noland (Tatum, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 CJA 20/30 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 20/30 Appointment of Richard N. Stuckey for Katherine Noland by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/10/2014. (shugh)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 CJA 20/30 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20/30 Appointment of John S. Tatum for Thomas Noland by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/10/2014. (shugh)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Thomas Noland. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Financial Affidavit (CJA 23)
                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Katherine Noland. (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Order Appointing CJA CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL as to Thomas Noland by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/9/14. Text Only Entry (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Order Appointing CJA CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL as to Katherine Noland by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 10/9/14. Text Only Entry (amont)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Initial Appearance as to Katherine Noland and Thomas Noland held on 10/9/2014. Defendants present in custody. Defendants advised. Criminal Justice Act counsel appointed as to both Defendants. Arraignment, Discovery, and Detention Hearings as to both Defendants is set for 10/15/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. Defendants remanded. (Total time: 12 minutes, Hearing time: 2:26-2:38 p.m.)APPEARANCES: Michelle Korver on behalf of the Government, Paige Meador on behalf of pretrial. FTR: CRIMINAL DUTY PM. (amont) Text Only Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 ArrestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest of Katherine Noland Initial Appearance set for 10/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer.. (Text Only entry)(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 ArrestCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest of Thomas Noland. Initial Appearance set for 10/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. (Text Only entry)(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Restricted Document - Level 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 4 (trlee, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Thomas Noland. (trlee, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Katherine Noland. (trlee, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Katherine Noland (1) counts 1, 2, Thomas Noland (2) count 2. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet, # (2) Criminal Information Sheet) (trlee, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 440 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?