Kalk v. State of Maryland, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01325-FNS
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robert H. Kalk, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Arrie W. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Attorney Grievance Commission of Maryland, Defendant
No Logo Charles E. Moylan, Jr., Defendant
No Logo D. Warren Donohue, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Sweet Byrnes, Defendant
No Logo Delawrence Beard, Defendant
No Logo G. Edward Dwyer, Jr., Defendant
No Logo James A. Kennedy, III, Defendant
No Logo James Patrick Salmon, Defendant
No Logo James R. Eyler, Defendant
No Logo John J. Bishop, Defendant
No Logo Paul E. Alpert, Defendant
No Logo Paul H. Weinstein, Defendant
No Logo The State of Maryland, Defendant
No Logo Theodore G. Bloom, Defendant
No Logo William P. Turner, Defendant
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/8/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $100100000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Baltimore City
Terminated 5/15/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00-1800(CaseMgr.JeanSt.Jo[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court, copy of opinion attached hereto (certified copy) Re: [7-1] appeal by Robert H. Kalk (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Appeal Record Returned
Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: [7-1] appeal by Robert H. Kalk (vol. 1) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/22/2000 Order
ORDER of the USCA "DENYING" Appellant's petition for rehearing. (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 USCA Case Number
USCA Case Number Re: [7-1] appeal by Robert H. Kalk USCA NUMBER: 00-1800 (Case Mgr. Jean St.John) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [7-1] appeal by Robert H. Kalk (Volume 1) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [7-1] appeal by Robert H. Kalk (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Robert H. Kalk . Fee Status: (Filing fee paid) (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER denying [5-2] motion for More Definite Statement. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 5/30/00) (c/m 5/30/00-skp) (das, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/26/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Motion for Reconsideration
MOTION by Robert H. Kalk for Reconsideration of [4-1] order , and for More Definite Statement . (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISING case for failure to state any non-frivolous claim within the jurisdiction of the court pursuant to FRCP 12 (h)(3). ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 5/15/00) (c/m 5/15/00-chambers) (microfilmed 5/15/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Memorandum OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 5/15/00) (c/m 5/15/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/15/2000 Terminated Case
Case closed (das, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) (20 days) issued for State of Maryland, Attorney Grievance, Delawrence Beard, Paul H. Weinstein, D. Warren Donohue, William P. Turner, G. Edward Dwyer Jr., Arrie W. Davis, James A. Kennedy III, Theodore G. Bloom, James Patrick Salmon, James R. Eyler, Paul E. Alpert, Charles E. Moylan Jr., Deborah Sweet Byrnes, John J. Bishop (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Robert H. Kalk (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/10/2000 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1166539 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 14 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?