CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Aetna, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01285

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 10:38 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
Aetna, Inc. Aetna, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?