CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Beach Trading Co. Inc. d/b/a buydig.com
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01289

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 11:03 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Beach Trading Co. Inc. d/b/a buydig.com, Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 82 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?