CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. BNSF Railway Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01291

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:13 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo BNSF Railway Company, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/2/2015. (ch, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 19 Joint MOTION to Stay (Motion to Extend Stay and Notice of Settlement. Status Conference set for 12/18/2015 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/21/2015. (ch, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
          Joint MOTION to Stay (Motion to Extend Stay and Notice of Settlement) by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: 11/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/16/2015. (ch, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
              Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between CryptoPeak and BNSF Railway Company by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Change of Address by Nathaniel St. Clair (St. Clair, Nathaniel)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BNSF Railway Company.( St. Clair, Nathaniel)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. BNSF Railway Company served on 7/27/2015. (ch, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BNSF Railway Company.( St. Clair, Nathaniel)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Thomas Dietrich on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Dietrich, Blake)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Acosta, Matthew)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathaniel St. Clair on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (St. Clair, Nathaniel)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases) (Tadlock, Charles)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Smiley, Keith)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Harvey, Jr on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Harvey, John)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (ch, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/17/2015. (ch, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5300135.), filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?