CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01295

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:12 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Commonwealth Annuity And Life Insurance Company, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: 1/28/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The cases above are CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial matters (except venue) with the Lead Case being 2:15-cv-01284-RWS-RSP. The parties shall docket all future filings (except for those relating to venue) in the Lead Case., Cases associated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/28/2016. (nkl, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.(Tadlock, Charles)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Amended Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference) (Tadlock, Charles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Forethought Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Global Atlantic Financial Group Limited, Corporate Parent Global Atlantic Financial Company, Corporate Parent Forethought Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company, Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 1 Complaint Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC by Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Heather Marie Schneider on behalf of Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5404714. (Schneider, Heather)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eugene L Chang on behalf of Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5404653. (Chang, Eugene)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.(Smiley, Keith)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company served on 7/30/2015. (ch, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: 8/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.(Smiley, Keith)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases) (Tadlock, Charles)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Smiley, Keith)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Harvey, Jr on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Harvey, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company. (ch, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/17/2015. (ch, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT against Commonwealth Annuity & Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5300202.), filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?