CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Discover Financial Services
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01296

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:12 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Discover Financial Services LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Discover Financial Services"
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/17/2015. (nkl, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Extend Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/16/2015. (nkl, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
          Agreed MOTION to Stay (Extend the Stay between CryptoPeak and Discover) by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
            Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between CryptoPeak and Discover Financial Services by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Filed with Permission and on behalf of Discover Financial Services re CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.( Smiley, Keith)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC for Discover Financial Services. (nkl, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.(Smiley, Keith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases) (Tadlock, Charles)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Smiley, Keith)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Harvey, Jr on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Harvey, John)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            SUMMONS Issued as to Discover Financial Services c/o The Corporation Trust Company. (nkl, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/17/2015. (ch, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT against Discover Financial Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5300219.), filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?