CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Livevol, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01298

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:33 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Livevol Inc., Defendant
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 19 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?