CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. New York Life Insurance Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01301

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:21 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo New York Life Insurance Company, Defendant
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?