CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01305

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 10:54 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?