CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. PetSmart Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01306

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:08 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Petsmart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Petsmart Store Support Group, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?