CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01309

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:12 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/1/2015. (ch, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice - Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/18/2015, Entered: 10/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 13 Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between CryptoPeak and Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading. Status Conference set for 11/2/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/15. (ch, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
          Joint MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between CryptoPeak and Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith A Walter, Jr on behalf of Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading (Walter, Keith)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.(Smiley, Keith)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading served on 7/28/2015. (ch, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC.(Smiley, Keith)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Plaintiff's Notice of Related Cases) (Tadlock, Charles)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Smiley, Keith)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Harvey, Jr on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Harvey, John)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            SUMMONS Issued as to Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading. (ch, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/19/2015, Entered: 7/19/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/19/15. (ch, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  COMPLAINT against Professional Trading Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Lightspeed Trading ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5300403.), filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?