CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. SogoTrade, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01313

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:37 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo SogoTrade, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/18/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?