United States of America v. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01423

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 1, 2017 at 2:59 PM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McNamara and McNamara

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Bryan +1 614 228 6131 +1 614 228 6126 jbryan@bryanandbrewer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1250

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee M. Brewer +1 614 228 6131 +1 614 228 6126 lbrewer@bryanandbrewer.com
v.
No Logo Chuck Zell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
No Logo Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Haliw , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Haliw, III +1 248 761 2222

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste E

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy L. Butler +1 419 241 1050 amy.butler@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. +1 419 214 1050 +1 484 251 7797 anthony.calamunci@fisherbroyles.com
No Logo DEC, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
No Logo Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Haliw , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Haliw, III +1 248 761 2222

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste E

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy L. Butler +1 419 241 1050 amy.butler@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. +1 419 214 1050 +1 484 251 7797 anthony.calamunci@fisherbroyles.com
No Logo Kelly Zell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
No Logo Shannon Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Subashi & Wildermuth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren K. Epperley +1 937 427 8800 +1 937 427 8816 lepperley@swohiolaw.com
TERMINATED: 01/04/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian L. Wildermuth +081520 081 815 2011 E.bwildermuth@swohiolaw,com
No Logo Chuck Zell, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
No Logo Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste E

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy L. Butler +1 419 241 1050 amy.butler@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. +1 419 214 1050 +1 484 251 7797 anthony.calamunci@fisherbroyles.com
No Logo DEC, LLC, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1250

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee M. Brewer +1 614 228 6131 +1 614 228 6126 lbrewer@bryanandbrewer.com
No Logo Kelly Zell, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
No Logo Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste E

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy L. Butler +1 419 241 1050 amy.butler@fisherbroyles.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy L. Butler +1 419 241 1050 amy.butler@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. +1 419 214 1050 +1 484 251 7797 anthony.calamunci@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. +1 419 214 1050 +1 484 251 7797 anthony.calamunci@fisherbroyles.com
No Logo DEC, LLC, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Billmaier & Cuneo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Lowenstein +1 419 931 0067 +1 419 931 0065 jmlowenstein@bcatlaw.com
No Logo Fidelity And Deposit Company Of Maryland, Cross Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste E

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy L. Butler +1 419 241 1050 amy.butler@fisherbroyles.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony J. Calamunci, Sr. +1 419 214 1050 +1 484 251 7797 anthony.calamunci@fisherbroyles.com
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Leave
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Minute Order _ Telephone Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                Answer filed by Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp. Related document(s) 38 . (Calamunci, Anthony) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Crossclaim
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Minute Order _ Case Management Conference
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                              Sur-Reply to Plaintiff United States for the Use and Benefit of Auto-Owners Insurance Company's Sur-Reply to 23 Motion to dismiss Complaint filed by Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Butler, Amy) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures filed by Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Butler, Amy) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Leave
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                      Sur-Reply to 23 Motion to dismiss Complaint filed by United States of America. (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Brian L. Wildermuth and adding attorney Lauren K. Epperley filed by on behalf of Shannon Smith. (Epperley, Lauren) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Leave
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                              Report of Parties' Planning Meeting , parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by United States of America. (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                Reply in support of 23 Motion to dismiss Complaint filed by Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp, Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Butler, Amy) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Opposition to 23 Motion to dismiss Complaint filed by DEC, LLC. (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Answer to 1 Complaint, filed by Shannon Smith. (Wildermuth, Brian) Modified text on 11/13/2015 (H,JD). (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DEC, LLC. (Lowenstein, Jacob) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Crossclaim
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon DEC, LLC on 10/28/2015, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) 15 , 1 . (M,L) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Leave
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Original Summons issued for service upon DEC, LLC. (H,JD) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        Request to Clerk for service upon DEC, LLC by Certified Mail filed by United States of America. (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons for Defendant DEC, LLC filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for DEC, LLC)(Brewer, Lee) Modified text on 10/22/2015 (H,JD). (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by certified mail executed upon Shannon Smith on 9/25/2015, filed on behalf of United States of America. Related document(s) 1 , 9 . (M,L) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  Original Summons issued for service upon Shannon Smith. (H,JD) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Request to Clerk for service upon Shannon Smith by certified mail filed by United States of America. Related document(s) 1 . (H,JD) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Kelly Zell waiver sent on 8/11/2015, answer due 10/12/2015. filed on behalf of United States of America (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Chuck Zell waiver sent on 8/11/2015, answer due 10/12/2015. filed on behalf of United States of America (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland waiver sent on 9/9/2015, answer due 11/9/2015. filed on behalf of United States of America (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Custom Mechanical Systems, Corp waiver sent on 9/9/2015, answer due 11/9/2015. filed on behalf of United States of America (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Magistrate Consent Form issued. (H,JD) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United States of America. (Brewer, Lee) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?