Coleman v. Bureau of Prisons
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01376-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas F. Coleman, Jr., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
v.
No Logo Bureau of Prisons, Respondent
Office Baltimore
Filed 5/8/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 540 - Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 8/15/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED, PROSE
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Filing Fee Paid
Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 4.50 RECEIPT # 1183246 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Filing Fee Paid
    Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 4.00 RECEIPT # 1179340 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 Filing Fee Paid
      Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 1178695 (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [10-1] motion of plaintiff for Copywork; granting [8-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss, or in the alternative [8-2] motion for Summary Judgment; and ENTERING judgment on behalf of United States Bureau of Prisons and against Thomas Coleman. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 8/15/00 ) (c/m & microfilmed 8/16/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 8/15/00) (c/m 8/16/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Terminated Case
            Case closed (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/4/2000, Terminated: 8/15/2000 Motion for Copy Work
              MOTION by Thomas F. Coleman Jr. for Copywork (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 Rule
                Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed To Parties. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                  MOTION with memorandum in support by Defendant Bureau of Prisons to Dismiss , or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment , and Exhibit #1. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER "granting" [6-1] motion of Respondent to Extend Time to File a Response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus reset Answer deadline to 8/9/00 for Bureau of Prisons . ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 7/10/00 ) (c/m 7/10/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/6/2000, Terminated: 7/10/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                      MOTION by Bureau of Prisons to Extend Time to Petition for Habeas Corpus (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER DIRECTING plaintiff to inform this Court and all counsel of any change of address; DIRECTING Clerk to mail copies and withhold service, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 6/7/00 ) (c/m: 6/7/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [3-1] motion of plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING the finance officer to set aside monthly payments to the Court of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to plaintiff's account and to make monthly deductions until the entire 150.00 filing fee is paid. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 6/7/00) (c/m: 6/7/00 bh) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/6/2000, Terminated: 6/7/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION by Thomas F. Coleman Jr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis . (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 5/18/00 ) "advising" Plaintiff that the fee for filing this type of action is $150.00; "directing" Clerk to mail a copy of this Order and a form Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to Plaintiff; and "advising" Plaintiff that within twenty (20) days he must either pay the filing fee of $150.00 or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, as therein more particularly set forth. (c/m 5/22/00 cmh) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: 5/17/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                PETITION filed; (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?