Concepcion v. City of Sandy Springs et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02784
District Judge Marvin H. Shoob, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 6:55 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Orlando Concepcion, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Susan S. Shook, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curt Blackburn Thompson, II +1 404 643 2649 +1 678 615 3539 curtbthompson@bellsouth.net
v.
No Logo CITY OF SANDY SPRINGS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Elarbee Thompson Sapp & Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT +1 404 659 6700 Gignilli@elarbeethompson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy Lynn Glanton +1 404 659 6700 glanton@elarbeethompson.com
No Logo Sandy Springs Police Department, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Elarbee Thompson Sapp & Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT +1 404 659 6700 Gignilli@elarbeethompson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy Lynn Glanton +1 404 659 6700 glanton@elarbeethompson.com
No Logo Terry Sult, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Elarbee Thompson Sapp & Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD READ GIGNILLIAT +1 404 659 6700 Gignilli@elarbeethompson.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy Lynn Glanton +1 404 659 6700 glanton@elarbeethompson.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
Costs Taxed in the amount of $1,424.15 against Plaintiff. (jtj) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
    BILL OF COSTS by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
      CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of the Defendants and against the Plaintiff for costs of this civil action and that the same is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (jtj)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 09/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER ADOPTING 27 Final Report and Recommendation, GRANTING 25 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Marvin H. Shoob on 9/17/2013. (jtj) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER for Service of 27 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/27/13. (klb) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - For the reasons stated above, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 25 be GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 8/27/13. (klb) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Orlando Concepcion. (Thompson, Curt) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Brief, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Supplement, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Glanton, Tracy) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE Of Manually Filing Electronic Media by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                    DEPOSITION of Orlando J. Concepcion taken on June 13, 2013 by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript (Pages 71-140), # 2 Exhibit Transcript (Pages 141-222), # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE Of Filing Original Discovery Materials by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby extended to 35 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/26/13. (klb) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for the Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                            Supplemental Initial Disclosures by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult.(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Orlando Concepcion filed by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult (Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 1-10, by Richard Read Gignilliat. (Gignilliat, Richard) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Orlando Concepcion.(Thompson, Curt) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Responses to Requests for Porductions of Documents by Orlando Concepcion.(Thompson, Curt) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 6/30/2013 and the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to 7/30/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/5/13. (klb) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants' First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult.(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Defendants' First Interrogatories to Plaintiff by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult.(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: re: 9 Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 5/3/2013. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 2/4/2013. Motions for summary judgment no later than 6/3/13. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2013 or within 30 days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/24/13. (klb) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                Joint PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER - The parties shall file their Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Schedule within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon expiration of the above-allotted time period if the parties have not filed the proper documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/10/13. (klb) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Initial Disclosures by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult.(Gignilliat, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Certificate of Interested Persons by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (Gignilliat, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Defendants' ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. Discovery ends on 5/3/2013.(Gignilliat, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Lynn Glanton on behalf of City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult (Glanton, Tracy) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Summons Issued as to City of Sandy Springs, Sandy Springs Police Department, Terry Sult. (mdy) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Initial Disclosures by Orlando Concepcion.(tcc) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions provided. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 113E-4094677.), filed by Orlando Concepcion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?