Tassio v. OneMain Financial, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-00484

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 11:02 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DISMISSING CASE for 45 Report and Recommendation. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's objections are overruled and the Report of the Magistrate Judge (Dkt. #45) is ADOPTED as the opinion of the court. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. #32) and Defendants Supplemental Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dkt. #37) are GRANTED and the above- styled civil action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs are taxed to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/16/2016. (kls, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/21/2016, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ***WITHDRAWN PER 34 *** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by OneMain Financial, Inc., Christi Merritt. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Dk t. 5) should be GRANTED, Plaintiff's claims should be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim, and this matter should be closed on the Court's docket with all costs to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 2/3/2016. (kls, ) Modified on 3/8/2016 (cm, ).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?