Doe v. Kink.Com, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-03377
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 19, 2017 at 12:47 AM EST (8.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo John Doe, Plaintiff

Represented by John Doe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doe

Represented by Suite 2

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra Lynn Ribera +1 415 576 1600 +1 415 842 0321 sribera@riberalaw.com
v.
No Logo Armory Studios, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Kennick +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 mkennick@kennicklaw.com
No Logo Cybernet Entertainment LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Kennick +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 mkennick@kennicklaw.com
No Logo Hogan Karl, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known asVan Darkholme Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known asVan Darkholme John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Kennick +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 mkennick@kennicklaw.com
No Logo Kink Studios, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Kennick +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 mkennick@kennicklaw.com
No Logo Kink.Com, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
No Logo Kinkmen.Com, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Kennick +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 mkennick@kennicklaw.com
No Logo Peter Acworth, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen Fuller Tynan +1 707 395 0062 +1 707 921 7352 dktynan@comcast.net

Represented by Kennick & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Christopher Ellis +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 jellis@kennicklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T Kennick +1 714 992 6600 +1 714 992 6602 mkennick@kennicklaw.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Order Remanding Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Remand
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Removal
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 136 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?