Yankton Sioux Tribe v. Kempthorne
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Dakota District Court, Case No. 4:06-cv-04091

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:45 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by David Lopez, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J. Van Norman +1 605 964 8665 tjvannorman@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Susan V. Tipograph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca L. Kidder +1 605 791 1515 +1 605 791 1915 rebasgarden@yahoo.com
No Logo Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 495

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rollyn H. Samp +3346 334 334 6630 rsamp@samplaw.com
No Logo Loneman School, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro
No Logo Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by Deceased

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julian H. Brown
No Logo Marty Indian School, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro
No Logo Oglala Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro
No Logo Porcupine School, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro
No Logo Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven C. Emery +1 605 964 6686 +1 605 964 1166 Steve_Emery1989@hotmail.com
No Logo Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro

Toggle Switch Represented by Highway 5 West

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/23/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY Bernice C. Delorme +1 701 477 2641 bernicedelorme@tmbci.net
No Logo Wounded Knee District School, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro
No Logo Yankton Sioux Tribe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by azlaw.pro Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles T. Abourezk Charlie@azlaw.pro
v.
No Logo Bureau of Indian Affairs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dirke Kempthorne, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Dr. Charles M. Roessel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Ed Parisian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Interior United States Department of the Interior, Defendant
Officially listed as "Interior, United States Department of"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo James Cason, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin Washburn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo Sally Jewell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Response
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Notice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Notice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Leave to
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Notice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Notice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Extend Deadlines
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Leave to
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Leave to
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Joinder
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Extend
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Extend Deadlines
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Leave to
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER re 75 Proposed Order, filed by Marty Indian School, Oglala Sioux Tribe, Wounded Knee District School, Loneman School, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Porcupine School, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe that the $1,00 surety bond submitted by Arlouine Kingman be returned to Arlouine Kingman. Signed by Chief Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 26, 2008. (JLH) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (Abourezk, Charles) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/26/07. (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement.)(SST) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 70 Motion to Extend Deadlines: Form 35 report due 4/13/2007. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/15/2007. (KC) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Deadlines)(Abourezk, Charles) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Deadlines)(Abourezk, Charles) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 65 Motion for Leave to add additional plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/21/06. (KC) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                JOINT MOTION and Stipulation to Allow Additional Plaintiffs (Little Wound School, American Horse School, Sicangu Owayawa Oti School, and Rosebud Sioux Tribe) to Join Lawsuit, filed by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 63 Motion to Extend Deadlines: Discovery plan due to the Clerk by 2/13/2007. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/19/06. (KC) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Extend for Filing Rule 26 Discovery Plan by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 59 Motion to Extend Deadlines: Discovery plan due 12/15/06. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/26/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER For Form 35 Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/31/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian.(Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Dirke Kempthorne answer due 8/16/2006; Interior, United States Department of answer due 8/16/2006; Bureau of Indian Affairs answer due 8/16/2006; James Cason answer due 8/16/2006; Ed Parisian answer due 8/16/2006. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/15/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Dirke Kempthorne answer due 8/14/2006; Interior, United States Department of answer due 8/14/2006; Bureau of Indian Affairs answer due 8/14/2006; James Cason answer due 8/14/2006.. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/07/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER granting 47 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 07/24/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 45 Order Granting Preliminary Injunction by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 07/14/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 42 POST-HEARING MEMORANDUM filed by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUBPOENA for Dan Shroyer returned (MWT, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  POST-HEARING MEMORANDUM by Defendants Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) Modified on 7/12/2006 (SST, ). (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Joint Exhibit List (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction). (SST, ) Modified on 7/13/2006 (MWT, ). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Evidentiary Hearing on Request for Preliminary Injunction held on 7/07/2006 before Judge Karen E. Schreier. (Court Reporter Judy Thompson) (SST, ) Modified on 7/13/2006 (MWT, ). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lower Brule Sioux Tribe (SST, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION Verifying Complaint by Michael B. Jandreau. (SST, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 35 Motion for Attorney Bernice C. Delorme to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 07/07/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION for attorney Bernice C. Delorme to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians. (Pro Hac Vice Fee not paid) (JLH, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (JLH, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Motion Hearing held on 7/5/2006 re 29 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Interior, United States Department of,, Bureau of Indian Affairs,, James Cason,, Dirke Kempthorne,, Ed Parisian, before Judge Karen E. Schreier (Court Reporter Judy Thompson) (MWT, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SUBPOENA for Sharon Wells returned on 6/29/06. (SST, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SUBPOENA for James Carson returned on 6/29/06. (SST, ) Modified on 7/24/2006 (SST, ). (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SUBPOENA for Edward Parisian returned (MWT, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to 17 Brief, filed by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(MWT, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2006 (MWT, ). (Entered: 07/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/28/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Correct Exhibits Attached to 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT, Petition for Preliminary Injunction, or in the Alternative, Petition for a Temporary Restraining Order, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST, ) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT Verifying Complaint of Avis Little Eagle, Vice Chairperson, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe. (BBH, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Emery on behalf of Standing Rock Sioux Tribe (BBH, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 17 Brief, Petition for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dirke Kempthorne, Interior, United States Department of, Bureau of Indian Affairs, James Cason, Ed Parisian. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Parisian # 2 US Dept of the Interior, Bureau of Indian Affairs, Office of Indian Education Programs - Aug 2003 # 3 Declaration of Sharon Wells)(Bensing, Daniel) Text added on 6/26/2006 (SLL, ). (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 18 Motion for briefing schedule and hearing. Hearing scheduled for Friday, July 7, 2006, at 9 a.m. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/22/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Bensing on behalf of all defendants (Bensing, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Court Hearing Date by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (Signature page containing Attorney Daniel Bensing's signature is a fax, not an original.)(SST, ) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Support re 1 Verified COMPLAINT and PETITION for Preliminary Injunction, or in the alternative, PETITION for a Temporary Restraining Order and PETITION for Writ of Mandamus by Plaintiffs Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST, ) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 13 Motion to exceed page limit. Signed by Judge Karen E. Schreier on 06/02/06. (KC, ) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (SST, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Allow Additional Pages for Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Petition for Preliminary Injuction or, in the Alternative, Petition for a Temporary Restraining Order, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Allow Additional Pages For Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Petition for Preliminary Injuction or, in the Alternative, Petition for Terporary Restraining Order, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RECEIPT and ACKNOWLEDGEMENT Of Summons and Complaint executed by Diana Ryan and filed by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, and Oglala Sioux Tribe. (SST, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Julian H. Brown on behalf of Lower Brule Sioux Tribe (SLL, ) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rollyn H. Samp on behalf of Flandreau Santee Sioux Sioux Tribe (SLL, ) Modified on 6/6/2006 (SST, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Ed Parisian. (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to James Cason. (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Dirke Kempthorne. (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Bureau of Indian Affairs. (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Interior, United States Department of. (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RECEIPT for filing fee (SKM) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            VERIFIED COMPLAINT, Petition for Preliminary Injunction, or in the alternative, Petition for a Temporary Restraining Order, and Petition for Writ of Mandamus; 5 Summons(es) issued - handed. Receipt Number SDX400003116 in the amount of $ 350, filed by Loneman School, Porcupine School, Wounded Knee District School, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians, Lower Brule Sioux Tribe, Yankton Sioux Tribe, Marty Indian School, Flandreau Santee Sioux Tribe, Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, Oglala Sioux Tribe. (Attachments: # 1 Administrative Appeal; # 2 Letter dated 7/22/05 from Associate Deputy Secretary of the Interior; # 3 Memo dated 6/14/05; # 4 Consultation Packet; # 5 Transcript of Tribal Consultation Meeting; # 6 Transcript of Tribal Consultation Meeting (con't); # 7 Transcript of Tribal Consultation Meeting (con't); # 8 Letter dated 8/24/05 to Messrs. Cason and Parisian from Harold Frazier; # 9 Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians Testimony Office of Indian Education Programs Consultation Aberdeen, SD 8/13/03; # 10 Transcript of Tribal Consultation; # 11 Transcript of Tribal Consultation (con't); # 12 Transcript of Tribal Consultation (con't); # 13 Transcript of Tribal Consultation (con't); # 14 Cason Letter to Tribal Leaders dated 12/22/05; # 15 Gipp Letter to Cason dated 1/26/06 with attached Resolution of United Tribes of North Dakota; # 16 Resolution No. 01-02-06; # 17 Resolution No. TMBC99-03-03 Elected and Certified Governing Body of the Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians; # 18 Memo to Education Line Officers from Director, Office of Indian Education Programs dated 1/18/06; # 19 Affidavit of Shirley Bernie; # 20 Affidavit of Harold Frazier; # 21 Education Program Administrator Job Announcement; # 22 Parisian Letter to Tribal Leaders of North and South Dakota dated 3/6/06; # 23 Frazier Letter to Parisian dated 3/6/06; # 24 Frazier Letter to Messrs. Cason and Parisian dated 3/8/06; # 25 Statement of James Cason and Ross Swimmer before the Senate Committee on Indian Affairs; # 26 BIA's 2007 Budget Summary; # 27 Education Line Offices; # 28 Congressional Inquiry of 5/11/06 by SD Congressional Delegation; # 29 Department of Interior Departmental Manual)(SKM) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2006 (SLL, ). Modified on 6/29/2006 (SKM). (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 301 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?