Cohen v. Trump
Federal Court Proceeding Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-mi-00044-LMM
District Judge Leigh Martin May, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 12:59 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Art Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Adeeb Forge +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jforge@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Christopher Herman +1 404 504 6500 +1 404 504 6501 jherman@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Lynn Jensen +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 rachelj@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen Elizabeth Mueller +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 mmueller@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 DPfefferbaum@csgrr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes & Haeggquist, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber L. Eck +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alreen Haeggquist +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron M. Olsen +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen I. Zeldes +1 619 342 8000 +1 619 342 7878
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
Citation FRCP 45 Subpoena
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Office Atlanta
Filed 5/28/2015
Jury Demand None
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 9/2/2015
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 13cv2519-GPC[USDC SD CA]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags 4months,CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Terminate MI Case
Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (ddm)
    LREF
    Blank  Clerks Entry of Dismissal
    Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING [6] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i). (ddm)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Art Cohen (Pfefferbaum, Daniel)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: 8/10/2015 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER approving the [4] Joint Stipulation of Movant Art Cohen and Non-Party James Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/7/15. (ddm)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
          Clerks Certificate of Mailing to all attorneys not receiving an electronic copy re [5] Order. (ddm)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 Stipulation
            STIPULATION [Joint Stipulation of Movant Art Cohen and Non-Party James Harris] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Submission to Magistrate Judge
              Submission of [3] Movant's Request for a Status Conference, submitted to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ddm)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015, Terminated: 9/2/2015 Motion for Hearing
                Movant's Request for a Status Conference filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # (2) Exhibits A-H to Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) Modified on 7/8/2015 to edit docket entry (ddm).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Submission to Magistrate Judge
                  Submission of [1] MOTION for Order to Show Cause, submitted to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (ddm)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Order on Application for Admission PHV
                    ORAL ORDER granting [2] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel J. Pfefferbaum. Approved by Judge Leigh Martin May on 06/15/2015. (rvb)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                      APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [2] APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5857740). Attorney Daniel J. Pfefferbaum added appearing on behalf of Art Cohen (pb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015, Terminated: 6/15/2015 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                        APPLICATION for Admission of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5857740)by Art Cohen. (Herman, John)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                          MOTION for Order to Show Cause why Non-Party, James Harris Should Not be Held in Contempt for Failure to Comply with Deposition Subpoena with Memorandum of Law in Support by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Fee Payment Received
                            Filing Fee Paid: $ 46.00, Receipt Number 73902 (eop)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 504 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?