Liu v. Credit Suisse Boston

Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-20459
District Judge Jose E. Martinez, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jose E. Martinez
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 3:02 PM EDT (6.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Amy Liu, Plaintiff

Represented by Dunaway & Watts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John G. Watts +1 205 879 2880 +8792 879 879 2882

Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudio Riedi +1 305 760 8541 +1 305 356 5720 criedi@lsrcf.com

Represented by Tew Cardenas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dexter Wayne Lehtinen +1 305 539 2481 +1 305 536 1116 dlehtinen@tewlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Thomas Tew, Jr. +1 305 536 1112 +5361 536 536 1116 tt@tewlaw.com
No Logo Antoine Kasprzak, Plaintiff

Represented by Suite 2200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claudio Riedi +1 305 760 8541 +1 305 356 5720 criedi@lsrcf.com

Represented by Tew Cardenas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dexter Wayne Lehtinen +1 305 539 2481 +1 305 536 1116 dlehtinen@tewlaw.com
v.
No Logo Airspan Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Allen D. Wheat, Defendant
No Logo Andre Vought, Defendant
No Logo Anthony C. Naughtin, Defendant
No Logo At Road, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Autoweb.com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Avantgo, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bernard J. Whitney, Defendant
No Logo Blue Coat Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brent R. Frei, Defendant
No Logo Brian Henry, Defendant
No Logo Brian M. Beattie, Defendant
No Logo Brian M. Nesmith, Defendant
No Logo Brian V. Turner, Defendant
No Logo BSquare Corp., Defendant
No Logo C. Rudy Puryear, Defendant
No Logo Centillium Communications, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Miller +1 305 374 5600 +1 305 374 5095 brian.miller@akerman.com

Represented by Kenny Nachwalter, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Howard Wakshlag +1 305 373 1000 +3721 372 372 1861 swakshlag@kennynachwalter.com
No Logo Charles Cotton, Defendant
No Logo Charles Ward, Defendant
No Logo Clarent Corp., Defendant
No Logo Commerceone, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Corillian Corp., Defendant

Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Miller +1 305 374 5600 +1 305 374 5095 brian.miller@akerman.com

Represented by Kenny Nachwalter, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Howard Wakshlag +1 305 373 1000 +3721 372 372 1861 swakshlag@kennynachwalter.com
No Logo Craig L. Klosterman, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston"
Officer/Director, Expressjet Holdings Inc
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston, Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston-USA, Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Group AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Group"
No Logo Daniel K. Atler, Defendant
No Logo David A. Denunzio, Defendant
No Logo David B. Cooper, Jr., Defendant
No Logo David D. Lee, Defendant
No Logo David M. Allen, Defendant
No Logo David M. Obstler, Defendant
No Logo David Oppenheimer, Defendant
No Logo Dean A. Debiase, Defendant
No Logo Dee J. Perry, Defendant
No Logo Design Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Digital Impact, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Donald M. Freed, Defendant
No Logo Donna L. Dubinsky, Defendant
No Logo Douglas S. Sinclair, Defendant
No Logo E-machines, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Miller +1 305 374 5600 +1 305 374 5095 brian.miller@akerman.com

Represented by Kenny Nachwalter, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Howard Wakshlag +1 305 373 1000 +3721 372 372 1861 swakshlag@kennynachwalter.com
No Logo Epiphany, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Edward Nadel, Defendant
No Logo Efficient Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eric Blachno, Defendant
No Logo Eric D. Stonestrom, Defendant
No Logo Eric M. Pillmore, Defendant
No Logo Erwin N. Lenowitz, Defendant
No Logo Evolve Software, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Faraj Aalaei, Defendant
No Logo Frank Quattrone, Defendant
No Logo Frederic T. Boyer, Defendant
No Logo Gaurav S. Dhillon, Defendant
No Logo George Boutros, Defendant
No Logo Glenn S. Ballman, Defendant
No Logo Globespanvirata Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gregory A. Effertz, Defendant
No Logo Handspring, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Henry F. Skelsey, Defendant
No Logo Howard Speaks, Defendant
No Logo Improvenet, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Informatica Corp., Defendant
No Logo Internap Network Services Corp., Defendant
No Logo InterTrust Technologies Corp., Defendant
No Logo Interwoven, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Imanage, Inc.
No Logo Intraware, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Iprint Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jack Tejavanija, Defendant
No Logo James P. Jackson, Defendant
No Logo James P. McCormick, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey A. Dachis, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey C Smith, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Shaw-Yau Chang, Defendant
No Logo Jill S. Manning, Defendant
No Logo John Buchanan, Defendant
No Logo John F. McDonnell, Defendant
No Logo John Hodge, Defendant
No Logo John M. Hennessy, Defendant
No Logo John M. Markovich, Defendant
No Logo John Major, Defendant
No Logo John P. Bantleman, Defendant
No Logo John T. Kernan, Defendant
No Logo John W. Luhtala, Defendant
No Logo Jomei Chang, Defendant
No Logo Joseph C. Consul, Defendant
No Logo Joseph J. Caffarelli, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen R. McElwee, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth E. Westrick, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth R. Vines, Defendant
No Logo Kevin C. Clark, Defendant
No Logo Kevin J. Yeaman, Defendant
No Logo Krish Panu, Defendant
No Logo Lante Corp., Defendant
No Logo Larry G. Tanning, Defendant
No Logo Larry M. Augustin, Defendant
No Logo Lightspan Partnership, Inc.,, Defendant

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Franklin Murphy +1 305 577 2957 +1 305 577 7001 lewis.murphy@squiresanders.com

Represented by Suite 3-e

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Susan Leavitt +1 305 720 4178 wleavitt@bellsouth.net
No Logo Luis P. Buhler, Defendant
No Logo Luminent, Inc., Defendant
No Logo M. Dwayne Nesmith, Defendant
No Logo Mark A. Floyd, Defendant
No Logo Mark B. Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo Mark T. Calvert, Defendant
No Logo Martin Brauns, Defendant
No Logo Mcdata Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Melvin Flowers, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL J. JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Robertson, Defendant
No Logo MP3.com, Defendant
No Logo Multilink Technology Corp., Defendant
No Logo New Focus, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Novatel Wireless, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Numerical Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Occam Networks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Onvia. Com. Inc., Defendant
No Logo Onyx Software Corp, Defendant
No Logo Paul Auvil, Defendant
No Logo Paul E. McBride, Defendant
No Logo Paul L.H. Ouyang, Defendant
No Logo Penelope A. Herscher, Defendant
No Logo Peter F. Per Vere, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacor Inc., Defendant
No Logo Radha R. Basu, Defendant
No Logo Rajen Jaswa, Defendant
No Logo Razorfish, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Retek, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Richard G. Reece, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Heaps, Defendant
No Logo Richard Mora, Defendant
No Logo Richard N. Nottenburg, Defendant
No Logo Richard, Owen, Defendant
No Logo Richard Thornburgh, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gett, Defendant
No Logo Roger S. Siboni, Defendant
No Logo Ronald B. Cooper, Defendant
No Logo Royal P. Farros, Defendant
No Logo Samuel M. Hedgpeth, III, Defendant
No Logo Sarwat H. Ramadan, Defendant
No Logo Selectica, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silicon Image, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Simplex Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stephen A. Dukker, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Bennion, Defendant
No Logo Steven H. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Steven Sipowicz, Defendant
No Logo Supportsoft, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Susan Black, Defendant
No Logo Tanning Technology Corp., Defendant

Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell E. Herr +1 305 374 8500 +1 305 789 7799 mitchell.herr@hklaw.com
No Logo Ted F. Spooner, Defendant
No Logo Thomas C. Hoster, Defendant
No Logo Tickets.com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Todd B. Schull, Defendant
No Logo Triton Network Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tumbleweed Communications Corp, Defendant

Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P. Miller +1 305 374 5600 +1 305 374 5095 brian.miller@akerman.com

Represented by Kenny Nachwalter, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Howard Wakshlag +1 305 373 1000 +3721 372 372 1861 swakshlag@kennynachwalter.com
No Logo Va Software Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Viant Corp., Defendant
No Logo Victor Shear, Defendant
No Logo Vitria Techology Inc., Defendant
No Logo W. Thomas Gimple, Defendant
No Logo William Brady, Defendant
No Logo William C. Park, Defendant
No Logo William L. Potts, Jr., Defendant
No Logo William Spivey, Defendant
No Logo William T. Baxter, Defendant
No Logo Y.C. Buno Pati, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Credit Suisse Group on 8/26/03; Answer due on 9/15/03 for Credit Suisse Group (bb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None
TRANSMITTAL letter requesting court file be sent to Southern District of NY (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Credit Suisse Group on 8/26/03 Answer due on 9/15/03 for Credit Suisse Group (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of NY re: MDL # 1554 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. ( Signed by Wm Terrell Chairman of the Panel, on 8/12/03) (ct, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Credit Suisse First on 8/13/03 Answer due on 9/2/03 for Credit Suisse First (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Credit Suisse Boston for appointment of lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [63-1] motion to extend time to respond to amended complaint ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/6/03) [EOD Date: 8/8/03] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Credit Suisse Group (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS(ES) issued for Credit Suisse First Boston (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [62-1] motion to extend time to respond to amended complaint, granting [59-1] motion to extend time to respond to amended complaint; Centillium Communications, Inc., Corillian Corporation, Tumbleweed Communications Corp., Tanning Technology Corporation, and E Machines, Inc. shall file a response to the Amended Complaint within 60 days of the date of the Court's Order appointing Lead Plaintiff; The Clerk is directed to mark Supportsoft, Inc. as termed ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/4/03) [EOD Date: 8/5/03] (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving [61-1] notice of voluntary dismissal as to Supportsoft, Inc (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 07/31/03) [EOD Date: 8/4/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None
AGREED MOTION by Lightspan Partnershi to extend time to respond to amended complaint (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED EMERGENCY MOTION by Tanning Techology Co to extend time to respond to amended complaint (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of dismissal as to defendant Supportsoft, Inc. by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of adoption of [59-1] motion to extend time to respond to amended complaint by E Machines, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED EMERGENCY MOTION by Corillian Corp., Centillium Communica, Tumbleweed Communica to extend time to respond to amended complaint (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [57-1] motion to extend time to respond to the amended complaint ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/25/03) [EOD Date: 7/28/03] (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Credit Suisse First, Airspan Networks, In, Lante Corp., McData Corporation to extend time to respond to the amended complaint (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Claudio Riedi by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak Re: [52-1] motion of Robert W. Tenney to be appointed lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing affidavit of Claudio Riedi by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak in support of [52-1] motion of Robert W. Tenney to be appointed lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
REFILING MOTION by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak of Robert W. Tenney to be appointed lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of dismissal of four defendants, Airspan Network Inc; Lante Corp; McData Corp and Support.com Inc. pursuant to F.R.C.P 41(a)(1) by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
Notice of compliance: by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak with [49-1] order (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part [47-1] motion to vacate [29-1] order of dismissal and denying all pending motions as moot ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 07/15/03) [EOD Date: 7/17/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Supportsoft, Inc. on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Supportsoft, Inc. (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Amy Liu to vacate [29-1] order of dismissal and denying all pending motions as moot (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Tumbleweed Communica on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Tumbleweed Communica (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Tanning Techology Co on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Tanning Techology Co (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Tanning Techology Co on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Tanning Techology Co (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Supportsoft, Inc. on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Supportsoft, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Simplex Solutions on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Simplex Solutions (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for McData Corporation on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for McData Corporation (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Lightspan Partnershi on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Lightspan Partnershi (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Lante Corp. on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Lante Corp. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Efficient Networks, on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Efficient Networks, (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for E Machines, Inc. on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for E Machines, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Centillium Communica on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Centillium Communica (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Corillian Corp. on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Corillian Corp. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Airspan Networks, In on 6/27/03 Answer due on 7/17/03 for Airspan Networks, In (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Credit Suisse Boston on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Credit Suisse Boston (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE executed for Credit Suisse Boston on 6/26/03 Answer due on 7/16/03 for Credit Suisse Boston (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [30-1] motion for John G. Watts to appear pro hac vice (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 07/08/03) [EOD Date: 7/10/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Amy Liu for John G. Watts to appear pro hac vice (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL and denying all pending motions as moot (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 07/01/03) [EOD Date: 7/7/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/07/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Tew Cardens Rebak Kelloff et al to withdraw as attorney, denying [11-2] motion to extend time to serve initial process (Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 06/24/03) [EOD Date: 6/26/03] (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/26/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Tanning Techology Co (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Credit Suisse First (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Credit Suisse First (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Airspan Networks, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Tumbleweed Communication Corp. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for McData Corporation (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Lightspan Partnership, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Efficient Networks, (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for E Machines, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Corillian Corp. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Centillium Communica (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Supportsoft, Inc. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Tanning Techology Co (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Simplex Solutions (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: None
SUMMONS issued for Lante Corp. (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: None
DEMAND for jury trial by Amy Liu, Antoine Kasprzak (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/20/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Amy Liu for Tew Cardens Rebak Kelloff et al to withdraw as attorney and to extend time to serve initial process (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: None
RESPONSE to [8-1] Order to Show Cause by Amy Liu (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of attorney appearance for Amy Liu by C. Thomas Tew Jr. (gz, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by plaintiff as to why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or perfect service of process. Response to Order to Show Cause due 6/6/03 ( Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/30/03) [EOD Date: 6/2/03] (hd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of concurrence with 5/12/03 letter of Wolf Haldenstein suggesting that court stay all proceedings pending determination by MDL Panel by Credit Suisse Boston (Former Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amy Liu, Robert W. Tenney (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Claudio Riedi by Amy Liu, Robert W. Tenney Re: [2-1] motion of Robert W. Tenney to be appointed lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing affidavit of Claudio Riedi by Amy Liu, Robert W. Tenney (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Amy Liu, Robert W. Tenney in support of [2-1] motion of Robert W. Tenney to be appointed lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
MOTION by Amy Liu, Robert W. Tenney of Robert W. Tenney to be appointed lead plaintiff (ra, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT-Class Action filed by Amy Liu. Filing fee $150.00 Receipt# 878075. Magistrate Judge Robert L. Dube (wc, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 279 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?