Advanced Powder Solutions, Inc. et al v. Sherman et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-02128

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2017 at 11:46 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Powder Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Louis Friedman +1 713 646 1389 +1 713 751 1717 efriedman@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sturm Law, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Alfred Sturm +1 832 447 1300 +1 832 447 1400 csturm@sturmlegal.com
No Logo Bubbletight, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Louis Friedman +1 713 646 1389 +1 713 751 1717 efriedman@bakerlaw.com
No Logo SWM Enterprises, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Louis Friedman +1 713 646 1389 +1 713 751 1717 efriedman@bakerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Sherman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulkerson Lotz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley Graham Lotz +1 713 654 5830 +1 713 654 5801 wlotz@fulkersonlotz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Renee Edwards +1 713 353 2041 +1 713 353 2000 allison.edwards@wilsonelser.com
No Logo James Huddleston, Defendant
No Logo Terves, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulkerson Lotz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley Graham Lotz +1 713 654 5830 +1 713 654 5801 wlotz@fulkersonlotz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kent Morrison Adams +1 713 353 2000 +1 713 785 7780 kent.adams@wilsonelser.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Renee Edwards +1 713 353 2041 +1 713 353 2000 allison.edwards@wilsonelser.com
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Response
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Minute Entry Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Return of Service Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Summons - Request for Issuance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Expedite
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?