Elrod v. Department Veterans
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01854-CCB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dewey Lee Elrod, Jr., Plaintiff
v.
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Veterans Affairs"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/16/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore County
Terminated 9/6/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 02-1650[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned: [11] Notice of Appeal, (vol. 1) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Order
    Attested copy of the ORDER of the USCA for the Fourth Circuit DISMISSING the appeal prusuant to Local Rule 45. (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      MARGINAL ORDER denying [14-1] Plaintiff's motion for Appointment of Counsel, granting [14-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/21/02) (c/m 6/21/02 ko) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002, Terminated: 6/21/2002 Motion to Appoint Counsel
        MOTION by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. for Appointment of Counsel (ko, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002, Terminated: 6/21/2002 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
          MOTION with affidavit in support by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ko, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/21/2002 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
            Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [11-1] appeal by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. (vol. 1) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 USCA Case Number
              USCA Case Number Re: [11-1] appeal by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. USCA NUMBER: 02-1650 (Case Manager: Sue Ellen Nagle) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER DENYING [12-1] Plaintiff's motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/14/02) (c/m & USCA 6/14/02 ko) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 6/14/2002 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                  MOTION with affidavit in support by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002, Terminated: 8/21/2002 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr.. Fee Status: (Filing Fee Not Paid) (c/m: Plaintiff and J. Huesman) (c/s) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                      Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [11-1] appeal by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. (c/m) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING [8-1] motion of Defendant to Dismiss and DIRECTING Clerk shall Close this Case. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/6/00 ) (c/m 9/6/00-vl) (MICROFILMED 9/6/00-vl) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000 Terminated Case
                          Case closed (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 Rule
                            Rule 12/56 Letter Mailed to Parties. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000, Terminated: 9/6/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Department Veterans to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1-4. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Attorney General 7/5/00. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Department Veterans 7/3/00 Answer due on 8/3/00 for Department Veterans (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Attorney. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 Summons Issued
                                      SUMMONS(ES) (30 Days) issued for Department Veterans. (c/hd USM 6/26/00) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/23/2000, Entered: 6/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to amend the docket to reflect that this action is brought under 5 U.S.C. 552; GRANTING [2-1] motion of Plaintiff to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING Plaintiff to inform the Court of any change of address during the pendency of this action; DIRECTING the Clerk to issue 30 Days summoneses on Togo D. West, Jr. Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs; United States Attorney General and U.S. Attorney and US Marshall to effectuate service of process on Defendants. ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 6/23/00 ) (c/m/USM 6/26/00-jan) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000, Terminated: 6/23/2000 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                          MOTION by Dewey Lee Elrod Jr. to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/16/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT and attachments filed; (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?