DiMartino, et al v. Buckley, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01860-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony DiMartino, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry DiMartino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by gtb.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Lipsitz +1 410 484 3050 +1 410 653 1546
v.
No Logo Bradley A. Buckley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
No Logo Mary Jo Hughes, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/19/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Baltimore County
Terminated 1/3/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 01-1166[]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 USCA Mandate
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) "AFFIRMING" the judgment of the District Court Re: [16-1] appeal by Larry DiMartino and Anthony DiMartino, copy of opinion attached hereto. (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 USCA Case Number
    USCA Case Number Re: [16-1] appeal by Larry DiMartino, Anthony DiMartino USCA NUMBER: 01-1166 (Case Manager: Pamela Stump) (ko, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Certificate of Clerk
      Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [16-1] appeal by Larry DiMartino, Anthony DiMartino (sls, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
        Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [16-1] appeal by Larry DiMartino, Anthony DiMartino (sls, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Anthony DiMartino, Larry DiMartino . Fee Status: (Filing Fee Paid) (c/s) (sls, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Correspondence
            REASSIGNMENT letter mailed to parties (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/09/2001
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [8-1] motion of ATF's for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING the petition with prejudice ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 1/2/01 ) (c/i 1/3/01) (MICROFILMED 1/3/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 1/2/01) (c/i 1/3/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Terminated Case
                  Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    CASE reassigned from Judge Blake to Chf Judge J. F. Motz (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/08/2001
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY by Bradley A. Buckley to petitioners' response to its [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000, Terminated: 1/3/2001 Response to Motion
                        RESPONSE by Anthony DiMartino, Larry DiMartino to [8-1] motion of Bradley A. Buckley for Summary Judgment and Memorandum and Exhibit (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [9-1] motion of Anthony DiMartino and Larry DiMartino for Enlargement of Time to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment to 11/10/00 ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 10/16/00) (c/i 10/16/00) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000, Terminated: 10/16/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            MOTION by Anthony DiMartino, Larry DiMartino for Enlargement of Time to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000, Terminated: 1/3/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Bradley A. Buckley for Summary Judgment and Attachments and Exhibits A-C, 1-34 and Audio Tapes of Hearing (c/s) (Attachments, Exhibits and Audio Tapes FILED SEPARATELY) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Attorney 7/6/00, Attorney General 7/10/00, Bradley A. Buckley, Mary Jo Hughes 7/6/00 Answer due on 7/26/00 for Mary Jo Hughes, for Bradley A. Buckley (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion of respondent to Extend Time to respond to the complaint set Answer deadline to 9/26/00 for Bradley A. Buckley ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/20/00) (c/i 9/21/00) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000, Terminated: 9/20/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                    MOTION by Bradley A. Buckley to Extend Time to respond to the complaint (c/s) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [3-1] motion of Bradley A. Buckles to Extend Time to respond to complaint set Answer deadline to 9/19/00 for Bradley A. Buckley ( signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake 9/7/00) (c/i 9/11/00) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/5/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000, Terminated: 9/8/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        MOTION by Bradley A. Buckley to Extend Time to respond to complaint (eg, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Summons Issued
                                          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Larry DiMartino, Bradley A. Buckley, Mary Jo Hughes (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/22/2000 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT and Exhibits A thru C filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1167789 (nrm, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 37 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?