Code Revision Commission et al v. Public.Resource.Org, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02594
District Judge Mark H. Cohen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 3:07 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Code Revision Commission, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED taskew@mcciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder lpavento@mcciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WARREN J. THOMAS +1 678 771 7781 wthomas@mcciplaw.com
No Logo State of Georgia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Meunier Carlin & Curfman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED taskew@mcciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder lpavento@mcciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WARREN J. THOMAS +1 678 771 7781 wthomas@mcciplaw.com
v.
No Logo Public.Resource.org, Defendant
Officially listed as "Public.Resource.Org, Inc."
No Logo Matthew Bender & Company, Inc., Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Bowler +1 404 885 3190 +1 404 962 6513 john.bowler@troutmansanders.com
No Logo State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee, , Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michelle Jeanette Hirsch +1 404 463 8850 +1 404 651 5304 mhirsch@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jeanette Hirsch +1 404 463 8850 +1 404 651 5304 mhirsch@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Mississippi Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence A Schemmel +1 601 359 7600 +1 601 359 7774 lschemmel@mdot.ms.gov
No Logo State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee,, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jeanette Hirsch +1 404 463 8850 +1 404 651 5304 mhirsch@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jeanette Hirsch +1 404 463 8850 +1 404 651 5304 mhirsch@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jeanette Hirsch +1 404 463 8850 +1 404 651 5304 mhirsch@law.ga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jeanette Hirsch +1 404 463 8850 +1 404 651 5304 mhirsch@law.ga.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Detailed Specification and Itemization of Requested Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 56 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Other Costs filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Rader, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Attorney Fees with Brief In Support by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re 49 Notice of Appeal,. (Rader, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 53 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            USCA Acknowledgment of 49 Notice of Appeal filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-11589-HH. (kac) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 clerk's judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Notice of Filing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 49 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Notice of appeal
                      LREF
                      Blank 48 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Remark
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 Order on Motion for order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Motion for order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 44 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: 3/23/2017 Order on motion for summary judgment
                                LREF
                                Blank 43 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: 3/10/2017 Notice of Filing
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: 7/11/2016 Order on Application for Admission PHV
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 41 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Pavento, Lisa) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including July 5, 2016, to file replies to the pending Motions for Summary Judgement. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/27/16. (hfm) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
                                          Amicus Curiae Brief by Matthew Bender & Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(hfm) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/27/16. (hfm) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Arthur Schemmel Pro Hac Vice by State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee,. (Hirsch, Michelle) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 5 Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Additional Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Pavento, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts)(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Lawrence Schemmel Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6493289)by State of Mississippi Joint Legislative Committee,. (Hirsch, Michelle) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mark H. Cohen recused. Case reassigned to Judge Richard W. Story for all further proceedings NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:15-cv-2594-RWS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 5/23/16. (jpa) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Pavento, Lisa) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support, # 3 Exhibit Ex. A, # 4 Exhibit Ex. B, # 5 Exhibit Ex. C, # 6 Exhibit Ex. D, # 7 Exhibit Ex. E, # 8 Exhibit Ex. F, # 9 Exhibit Ex. G, # 10 Exhibit Ex. H, # 11 Exhibit Ex. I, # 12 Exhibit Ex. J, # 13 Exhibit Ex. K, # 14 Exhibit Ex. L, # 15 Exhibit Ex. M, # 16 Exhibit Ex. N, # 17 Exhibit Ex. O)(Parker, Sarah) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                              First MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff with Brief In Support by Matthew Bender & Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bowler, John) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order and parties shall comply with the following schedule: Summary Judgment motions due 5/17/2016; Responses to Summary Judgment motions due 21 days after service of the motion; Replies to such responses due 14 days after service of the response and if necessary, the Consolidated Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than 30 days after the entry of the Court's ruling on the parties' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/15/2016. (bdb) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/12/16. (jpa) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION of Facts by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Rosenberg, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Thomas, Warren) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: re: 12 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/18/2016. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 10/15/15. (jpa) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia. (Askew, Anthony) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Public.Resource.Org, Inc., filed by State of Georgia, Code Revision Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Askew, Anthony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to 6 Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Code Revision Commission, State of Georgia.(Askew, Anthony) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Parker on behalf of Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (Parker, Sarah) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Elizabeth Rader Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6046489)by Public.Resource.Org, Inc., Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Jason) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by Public.Resource.Org, Inc. by Public.Resource.Org, Inc..(Rosenberg, Jason) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 2/11/2016.), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand by Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Rosenberg, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed by State of Georgia, Code Revision Commission. Public.Resource.Org, Inc. served on 7/24/2015, answer due 8/14/2015. (Pavento, Lisa) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION, Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 7/22/15. (jpa) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AO 121 Form mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (cem) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Public.Resource.Org, Inc. (cem) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed by State of Georgia, Code Revision Commission. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-5942262.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(cem) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 321 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?