USA v. Allen
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01976-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Space Nadira Clarke +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 962 9947 nadira.clarke@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Katherine B. Allen, Defendant
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/27/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 152 - Contract: Defaulted Student Loan
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1345 Debt to US - FHA/HUD Title I
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Baltimore City
Terminated 9/8/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [5-1] motion of USA to Dismiss complaint pursuant to FRCP 12. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 9/8/00) (c/i 9/11/00) (microfilmed 9/8/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (das, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000, Terminated: 9/8/2000 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION by USA to Dismiss complaint pursuant to FRCP 12 . (das, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Waiver of Service Executed
        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Katherine B. Allen; 6/30/00 Answer due on 8/29/00 for Katherine B. Allen (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: 7/5/2000 Request for Waiver of Service
          REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service as to Katherine B. Allen. (das, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 6/29/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of LIS PENDENS by USA (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 Complaint
              COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1 thru 5 filed. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 07/03/2000
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 36 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?