USA v. Jawa
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-mj-00332
Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:14 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rohit Jawa, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender Kevin Richard Brehm +1 703 600 0800 +1 703 600 0880 kevin_brehm@fd.org
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, for the reasons stated in open court, the Court finds under Title 18 U.S.C. 3142 that there are no conditions under which the defendant would not pose a risk of flight or a danger to the community. The defendant is therefore detained until further order of the court as to Rohit Jawa. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 7/24/15. (dper) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady: Motion Hearing as to Rohit Jawa held on 7/24/2015 re 17 MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Grant Release on Bond filed by Rohit Jawa. USA appeared through: Whitney Russell. Defendant appeared with: Kevin Brehm. Motion argued and denied. Defendant remanded. Order to follow. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(dper) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
      Reply by Rohit Jawa to Opposition to Motion to Revoke Detention (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit electronic monitoring)(Brehm, Kevin) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
      Opposition by USA as to Rohit Jawa re 17 MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Grant Release on Bond (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Russell, Whitney) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
      Supplemental Memorandum by Rohit Jawa re 17 MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Grant Release on Bond (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letters from father and friend)(Brehm, Kevin) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Preliminary Hearing as to Rohit Jawa held on 7/21/2015. US appeared through: Whitney Russell. Deft appeared with counsel: Kevin Brehm. Gov't adduced evidence and rests. Affidavit entered into evidence as govt's exhibit no. 1 admitted. Court finds PC. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
        MOTION to Revoke Detention Order and Grant Release on Bond by Rohit Jawa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US Attoney's manual)(Brehm, Kevin) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Status Conference as to Rohit Jawa held on 7/17/2015. US appeared through: William Sloan. Deft appeared w/counsel: Kevin Brehm. Detention order entered in Ohio. Defense counsel believes a PH needs to be held in this district. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/21/2015 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Deft remanded.(Tape #FTR.)(cmar, ) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
            Reply by Rohit Jawa to Response of Government re Venue (Brehm, Kevin) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Rohit Jawa re 13 MOTION to Dismiss re Lack of Venue (Russell, Whitney) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                MOTION to Dismiss re Lack of Venue by Rohit Jawa. (Brehm, Kevin) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Rohit Jawa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 07/14/15. (cmar, ) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff:Initial Appearance as to Rohit Jawa held on 7/14/2015. US appeared through: Samantha Bateman. Deft appeared w/o counsel. Deft informed of rights, charges and penalties. Court to appoint counsel. Govt advised that PH/DH held in Ohio. Status Conference set for 7/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Deft remanded.(Tape #FTR.)(cmar, ) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                      CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Rohit Jawa (nhall ) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                        Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Rohit Jawa (nhall ) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/16/15 in case as to Rohit Jawa. (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff in case as to Rohit Jawa. (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 5 Motion to Seal Case as to Rohit Jawa (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 6/15/15. (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Rohit Jawa. (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Rohit Jawa 1 Complaint (Sealed) (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                      SEALED COMPLAINT as to Rohit Jawa (1). (krob, ) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 1,467 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?