Vilex, Inc. v. U.S. Probation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02695-AMD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Vilex, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan A Mobley +1 410 385 0398 +1 410 385 5850
v.
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by griffinleahylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea M Leahy Fucheck +1 301 572 9292 +1 301 572 9220 andrea@griffinleahylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/7/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 12/11/2000
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 24-C-00-003999[CC/BALTIMORE CITY]
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and APPROVAL (signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 12/11/00) (c/i 12/11/00) (MICROFILMED 12/11/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER EXTENDING the time for U.S. Probation to answer complaint reset Answer deadline to 12/4/00 for U.S. Probation ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 11/29/00) (c/i 11/29/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Letter MOTION by U.S. Probation to Extend Time to answer complaint . (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
          Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 11/27/00 for U.S. Probation . (das, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [5-1] unopposed motion of U.S. Probation to Extend Time to respond to complaint to 11/27/00. ( signed by Judge Andre M. Davis 11/14/00) (c/i 11/16/00) (das, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Remark
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL MAILED TO PARTIES/COUNSEL. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000, Terminated: 11/15/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                UNOPPOSED MOTION by U.S. Probation to Extend Time to respond to complaint . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/11/2000
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Local Rule
                  Local Rule 103.5 certification of filing of state court papers by U.S. Probation. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/11/2000
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of filing of notice of removal by U.S. Probation. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/11/2000
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT and exhibit filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/11/2000
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Notice of Removal
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Remark
                          Pleadings 2 and 3 are copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City. (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/11/2000
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 83 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?