Moran, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02702-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marion Moran, Plaintiff
No Logo Matthew Moran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Prescott Ross, Jr +1 410 685 1190
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "The United States of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "The United States of America"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman
No Logo Marion Moran, Counter-Defendant
No Logo The Ohio Casualty Group of Insurance Companies, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H Barnes Mowell +1 410 329 6488 +1 410 357 4663
Office Baltimore
Filed 9/8/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $15000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Baltimore City
Terminated 10/9/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Settlement OrderCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING Case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause within 90 days to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 10/9/01) (c/i 10/9/01) (MICROFILMED 10/9/01) (eg, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Terminated Case
    Case closed (eg, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [6-1] motion of Ohio Casualty to Consolidate Cases JFM-99-1799 and JFM-00-2702 for all purposes. ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 6/1/01) (c/i 6/1/01) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Create Case Association
        Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 99 -1799 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Remark
          FOR ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS SEE CIVIL ACTION JFM 99-1799. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000, Terminated: 12/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [9-1] motion of defendant to Withdraw [8-1] motion for Entry of Judgment by USA ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 12/15/00) (c/i 12/15/00) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000, Terminated: 12/15/2000 Motion to Withdraw
              MOTION by USA to Withdraw [8-1] motion for Entry of Judgment by USA (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 ~Motion for Judgment
                MOTION by USA for Entry of Judgment (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER CONFIRMING schedule set in this case ( signed by Chf Judge J. F. Motz 12/14/00) (c/i 12/15/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Scheduling Conference
                    Scheduling conference held before Motz, J (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2001 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                      MOTION by Ohio Casualty Group to Consolidate Cases JFM-99-1799 and JFM-00-2702 (c/s) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000, Terminated: 10/9/2001 Answer to Counterclaim
                        ANSWER by Marion Moran to [4-2] counter claim by USA (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Counterclaim
                          ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against Marion Moran (c/s) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Jury Demand
                              DEMAND for jury trial by Marion Moran, Matthew Moran (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1169677 (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?