Alexsam, Inc. v. Green Dot Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-05742

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:04 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexsam, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com
No Logo Green Dot Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Bennett Clark +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 259 2020 ben.clark@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Franco +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 nancy.franco@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfred Shaumyan +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 alfred.shaumyan@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Edward Yackey +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 552 8799 scott.yackey@bryancave.com
No Logo Next Estate Communications, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Bennett Clark +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 259 2020 ben.clark@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Franco +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 nancy.franco@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfred Shaumyan +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 alfred.shaumyan@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Edward Yackey +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 552 8799 scott.yackey@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Green Dot Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Bennett Clark +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 259 2020 ben.clark@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Franco +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 nancy.franco@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfred Shaumyan +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 alfred.shaumyan@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Edward Yackey +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 552 8799 scott.yackey@bryancave.com
No Logo Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Bennett Clark +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 259 2020 ben.clark@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nancy Franco +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 nancy.franco@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alfred Shaumyan +1 310 576 2100 +1 310 576 2200 alfred.shaumyan@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Edward Yackey +1 314 259 2000 +1 314 552 8799 scott.yackey@bryancave.com
No Logo Alexsam, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Whitefield Ritcheson +1 818 882 1030 +1 818 337 0383 swritcheson@hgdlawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (280) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/1/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/1/2017, Entered: None Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None For Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                (REDACTED) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - GREEN DOT CORP.'S MOTION TO STRIKE BAKER EXPERT REPORT AND PRECLUDE HIS TESTIMONY, AND FOR SANCTIONS [255 and 273] by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court finds this motion appropriate for decisions without or al argument. Accordingly, the hearing currently scheduled for June 26, 2017, is hereby vacated. Green Dots request for sanctions pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1927 and the Court's inherent authority is DENIED. Green Dot's request for leave to file a discovery-related motion is GRANTED. The discovery deadline for filing a motion to compel the testimony of Baker is hereby extended. Green Dot is directed to file such a motion before the Magistrate Judge no later than July 5, 2017. The Court leaves to the Magistrate Judge scheduling issues relating to said motion; however, the Court intends to maintain the trial date of September 5, 2017. See document for details. (smo)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          REDACTED MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Strike Alexsam's Second Amended Complaint and Special Motion to Strike Under California's Anti-SLAPP Statute 239 . Defendan ts' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim for intentional misrepresentation is GRANTED. Defendants' request that the Court strike allegations is DENIED. Defendants' request that the Court strike the claim for intentional misrepresentation is DENIED as moot. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Summary Judgment (Partial)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Ruling
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Clarification of the Court's 4/10/2017 Order regarding the discovery cutoff date 241 . On 5/10/2017, Magistrate Judge Abram s denied plaintiff's motion to compel discovery because the motion could not be argued prior to the discovery cutoff of 5/10/2017, and was therefore untimely. Plaintiff now requests clarification of the Court's 4/10/2017 order and asserts t hat the proper interpretation would permit plaintiff to FILE a motion to compel discovery no later than 5/10/2017 rather than set the discovery cutoff as 5/10/2017. Plaintiff is incorrect. On 4/10/2017, the Court continued the "discovery cutoff& quot; to 5/10/2017, and expressly instructed the parties to direct briefing schedule concerns to the Magistrate Judge. Magistrate Judge Abrams's 5/10/2017 ruling regarding plaintiff's motion to compel discovery was consistent with the discovery cutoff set by the Court. Accordingly, plaintiff's ex parte application is DENIED.Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Exceed Page Limitation
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Ruling
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Dismiss (cause or other)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              REDACTED MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Plaintiff's motion to amend the schedule to accommodate a motion to compel discovery 193 is GRANTED. The Discovery cut-off is hereby extended to 5/10/2017. Plaintiffs mo tion for leave to amend the First Amended Complaint 181 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint, consistent with the Court's ruling here, no later than 7 days after the issuance of this order. The Court sets a Further Status Conference regarding the schedule for 5/8/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The parties shall file a joint stipulation regarding the appropriate schedule in this case, no later than 5/4/2017. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) Modified on 4/12/2017 (gk).
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Stay Pending Resolution of Writ of Mandamus 189 ; Defendants' Request for Leave to File a Reply in Support of the Ex Parte Application for Stay 194 ; Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order 193 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 3/7/2017, the Court ordered defendants to "produce unredacted versions of documents produced with redactions and any documents withheld on the basis of privilege," based upon their failure to provide plaintiff with a privilege log for purportedly privileged documents produced during discovery 185 . Because defendants have now produced a privilege log, the Court's 3/7/2017 order to produce documents withheld on the basis of privilege is vacated. Defendants' Ex Parte Application for a stay of the 3/7/2017 order regarding production of purportedly privileged documents 189 and Defendants' Request to File a Reply 194 are DENIED as moot. The parties sh all present any further disputes regarding the applicable privilege or adequacy of defendants' privilege log to the magistrate judge assigned to this case. Plaintiff has a pending motion for leave to amend the complaint 181 . Plaintiffs also fi led a motion to amend the scheduling order so that plaintiff can bring a motion to compel production of documents relating to damages 193 . In its motion to modify the scheduling order, plaintiff "requests dispensing with any hearing requiremen t" and that briefing be set according to the same schedule as plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint. Defendants shall file any opposition to plaintiffs motion to amend the scheduling order no later than 3/23/2017. Thereafter, plaintiff will be permitted to file a reply no later than 3/30/2017. Unless otherwise ordered, the matter will thereafter remain under submission. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Writ of Mandamus
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/12/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Stay Order (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion (Generic sealed motion type event)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/4/2017, Entered: None Shorten Time for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 171 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 11/4/2016, defendants filed a motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim for breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, which was added to plaintiff's claims when plaintiff amended its pleadings 155 . Because the litigation privilege is an absolute defense to plaintiff's claim, defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff's fourth claim for relief is DISMISSED with prejudice. In light of the foregoing, defendants motion to strike plaintiff's fourth claim for relief is DENIED as moot. Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's claim for breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams re Stipulation for Protective Order 147 ( NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT) (sbu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend the Answer and Counterclaims 127 ; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint 130 . Plaintiff's motion for leave to am end the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to file its proposed amended complaint within seven days of this Order. Thereafter, defendants shall have 14 days to answer or otherwise respond. Defendants' motion for leave to amend the answer and counterclaim is GRANTED. Defendants shall file an amended answer and counterclaim within seven days of this Order. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS the Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion to Amend and Supplement its Complaint 128 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, an unredacted copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion to Amend and Supplement its Complaint and the Proposed Amended Complaint attached thereto shall be filed under seal by the plaintiff forthwith. (gk) (Entered: 09/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT Notice of Manual Filing or Lodging of Defendants' First Amended Counterclaim and Redline re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Counterclaim and Answer Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaim and Answer 127 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 131 filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Defendants' First Amended Counterclaim, # 2 Unredacted Document Redline showing changes between First Amended Counterclaim and original Counterclaim)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Defendants' Application 125 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that unredacted copies of Defendants' proposed First Amended Counterclaim and a redline showing the changes to their original Counterclaim shall be accepted for filing under seal. Defendants/Counterclaimants shall file a under seal a Notice of Lodging, attaching these documents, forthwith. (gk) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend the Initial Complaint (non-confidential) filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Redacted Document Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint, # 4 Proposed Order) (Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (1) unredacted version of Alexsam's Motion to Amend and Supplement Its Complaint, (2) unredacted version of Alexsam's Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint under seal 128 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document (Attachment I) unredacted version of Alexsam's Motion to Amend and Supplement Its Complaint, # 2 Unredacted Document Attachment II) unredacted version of Alexsam's Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to file document (1) unredacted version of Alexsam's Motion to Amend and Supplement Its Complaint, (2) unredacted version of Alexsam's Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Motion to Amend and Supplement Complaint, # 3 Redacted Document Proposed First Amended and Supplemental Complaint)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Counterclaim and Answer Motion for Leave to Amend Counterclaim and Answer filed by Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/17/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Bennett Clark, # 2 Exhibit A of J. Bennett Clark Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B of J. Bennett Clark Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C of J. Bennett Clark Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend) (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Defendants' Proposed First Amended Counterclaim under seal 125 filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to file document Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Defendants' Proposed First Amended Counterclaim under seal filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal)(Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Motion Hearing RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: On 8/3/2016, plaintiff filed a motion for reconsideration of the 6/14/2016 Claim Construction Order with regard to the term "encoded" 120 . Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. The Court hereby modifies the June Order with regard to the construction of the term "encoded," and concludes that the term does not require construction and is best given its plain and ordinary meaning. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, 112 120 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: 8/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, 112 120 -- Defendants' Opposition to Alexsam's Motion to Reconsider Order Regarding Claim Construction, with Proof of Service filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 112 120 , previously scheduled for 8/29/2016 at 10:00 AM has been rescheduled, due to improper notice of the motion and pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court. Motion Hearing is continued to 9/12/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, 112 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/14/2017. Status Conference set for 4/24/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference 117 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties 9/19/2016. Settlement Completion Cutoff 4/14/2017. Factual Discovery Cut-off 2/1/2017. Last Day to File Motions 5/5/2017. Exchange of Expert Reports Cut-off 2/15/2017. Exchange of Rebuttal Reports Cut-off 3/15/2017. Expert Discovery Cut-off 4/14/2017. Status Conference re: Settlement set for 4/24/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/17/2017 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Bench Trial set for 9/5/2017 9:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Motions in limine shall be noticed for the same date and time of the Pretrial Conference, and filed 21 days prior thereto. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)Final Pretrial Conference (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court confers with counsel and schedules the following dates: Request for leave to file amended pleadings or to add parties: September 19, 2016; Settlement Completion Cutoff: April 14, 2017; Factual Discovery Cut-off: February 1, 2017; Last Day to File Motions: May 5, 2017; Exchange of Expert Reports Cut-off: March 15, 2017; Expert Discovery Cut-off: April 14, 2017; Status Conference re: Settlement (11:00 A.M.): April 24, 2017; Pretrial Conference/Hearing on Motions in Limine (11:00 A.M.): July 17, 2017; and Court Trial (9:30 A.M.): September 5, 2017.Motions in limine shall be noticed for the same date and time of the Pretrial Conference, and filed 21 days prior thereto. Motions in limine/oppositions shall not exceed five (5) pages in length and no replies will be accepted. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. If the parties have not selected and obtained the consent of a Panel Mediator within twenty-one (21) days, the ADR Program (213-894-2993) will assign one.The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 14, 2017. The Court further sets a status conference for: April 24, 2017, at 11:00 A.M. (lom) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nada Tadic at ntadic@hgdlawfirm.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Updated ; estimated length of trial 5 to 8 days, filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc... (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Travis E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc., designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel 111 . (gk) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court concludes that (1) the limitation "encoded" is construed to mean "encoded on a magnetic strip of a card, or as a bar code on the card"; (2) the limitation "information retrieval card" is construed to mean "a card that is used to retrieve information"; (3) the limitation "purchase data" is construed to mean "data that refers to a purchase"; (4) the limitation "loyalty data" is construed to mean "data transmitted when a loyalty card is swiped through an [Patent '608: unmodified existing]/[Patent '787: pre-existing] standard retail point of sale device, comprising the unique identification number of the loyalty card and purchase data representing the purchase amount"; (5) the limitation "loyalty points" to mean "a unit of measurement earned from or relating to a loyalty card program"; (6) and "loyalty card" to mean "a card used to reward consumers, where the information regarding the consumer's loyalty account is transmitted at the point of sale in real time as a purchase takes place." The Court declines to construe the following terms: (1) "directly or indirectly"; (2) "entering"; (3) "unique identification number"; and (4) the disputed alleged means-plus-function-claims. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Travis E. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-18131030) filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Propose d Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing Eastern District of TX, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing Middle District of AL, # 4 Certificate of Good Standing Northern District of AL, # 5 Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of AL) (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document 108 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by July 15, 2016. Utilize correct event and pay the appropriate fee (see Notice of Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents 109 . Utilize up-to-date forms. Attach Proposed order separately to the main efiled document. Mandatory hard copies delivered to chambers of efiled documents by noon the next business day and email proposed order in "Word" or "Wordperfect" format to the chamber's email, pursuant to Judge Snyder's procedures. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 108 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below The correct event is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests >> Application>> Appear Pro Hac Vice. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought.: Fee of $325 due for pro hac vice application filed on 6/22/16 not paid. The fee must be immediately paid online using the CM/ECF event Pay Filing Fee. Applicants name has been removed as counsel of record until payment is remitted in full. See LR 83-2.1.3.3 (c). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***STRICKEN*** Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc. for Travis Lynch (Ritcheson, Steven) Modified on 7/5/2016 110 (iv). (Entered: 06/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF Markman/Claims Construction Hearing and Motions Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The Court takes Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction 89 and Plaintiff's Motion for Claim Construction Pursuant to Docket Numbers 46, 69 and 88 90 under submission. The Court informs counsel that the parties may begin their discovery. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder re Stipulation to Limit Terms for Claim Construction 104 . The following claim terms will be considered by the Court at the claim construction hearing set for 6/14/2016: a. Claim Term 7: Directly or Indirectly; b. Claim Term 8: Encoded; c. Claim Term 9: Entering; d. Claim Term 11: Information Retrieval Card; e. Claim Term 12: Loyalty Card; f. Claim Term 15: Loyalty Data; g. Claim Term 16: Loyalty Points; h. Claim Term 32: Purchase Data; and i. Claim Term 35: Unique Identification Number. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Telephone Further Status Conference before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held by telephone and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel regarding the Markman hearing set for6/14/2016 at 10:00 AM., as stated in Court and on the record. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (jp) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to LIMIT Terms for Claim Construction filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court hereby sets a telephone status conference on June 8, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for DEFENDANT is ordered to initiate the telephone conference call THROUGH THE TELEPHONE OPERATOR to include all counsel of record, and CHAMBERS at (213) 894-8551 on the date and time scheduled. If the Courts conference line is busy, continue to try to connect, the Court may be finalizing a previous conference call. Counsel shall be available 30 minutes prior and 30 minutes after the time scheduled for the telephone conference. NOTE: During the telephonic hearing, counsel must identify themselves before they speak for the benefit of the Court and the Court Reporter. (clee) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Telephone Status Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel regarding the Markman hearing set for 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM. Counsel are ordered to further meet and confer before the hearing. The Court continues the Markman hearing to 6/14/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Pursuant to the parties' request, the Court hereby sets a Telephonic Status Conference on 6/2/2016 04:00 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel for DEFENDANT is ordered to initiate the telephone conference call THROUGH THE TELEPHONE OPERATOR to include all counsel of record, and CHAMBERS on the date and time scheduled. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING AND EXCLUDING DECLARATION FROM PLAINTIFF'S UNDISCLOSED EXPERT ALEX CHENG, AND PRECLUDING MR. CHENG FROM TESTIFYING AT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Having read and considered Defendants' Ex Parte Application For an Order Striking and Excluding Declaration From Plaintiff's Undisclosed Expert Alex Cheng, and Precluding Mr. Cheng From Testifying at Claim Construction Hearing (the "Application") 96 , and good cause appearing therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendants' Application is GRANTED. The Declaration of Alex Cheng in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Opening Motion for Claim Construction 94 is stricken and excluded from the record, and will not be considered by the Court. Mr. Cheng will not be permitted to testify at the claim construction hearing scheduled for June 13, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. (iv) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Striking and Excluding Declaration From Plaintiff's Undisclosed Expert Alex Cheng, and Precluding Mr. Cheng From Testifying at Claim Construction Hearing Declaration (Motion related), 94 96 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction 89 Defendants' Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff's Motion for Claim Construction per Dkt. Nos. 46, 69, and 88 90 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike Striking and Excluding Declaration From Plaintiff's Undisclosed Expert Alex Cheng, and Precluding Mr. Cheng From Testifying at Claim Construction Hearing Declaration (Motion related), 94 filed by Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alfred Shaumyan, # 2 Declaration of J. Bennett Clark, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application) (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction 89 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***STRICKEN*** DECLARATION of Alex Cheng Response to Defendants' Claim Construction Brief NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction 89 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Ritcheson, Steven) Modified on 5/24/2016 100 (iv). (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction 89 Defendants' Responsive Brief on Claim Construction filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Motion for Claim Construction filed 4/29/2016 90 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Motion lacks a formally noticed hearing date, Local Rule 7-4, however, filer has placed this matter on calendar for 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction filed 4/29/2016 89 . The following error(s) was found: Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Hearing Plaintiff's Motion for Claim Construction per Dkt. Nos. 46, 69, and 88 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), # 5 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 2), # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F (Part 1 of 2), # 9 Exhibit F (Part 2 of 2), # 10 Exhibit G (Part 1 of 2), # 11 Exhibit G (Part 2 of 2), # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L (Part 1 of 3), # 17 Exhibit L (Part 2 of 3), # 18 Exhibit L (Part 3 of 3)) (Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Special Hearing Defendants' Motion for Claim Construction filed by Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO AMEND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE 87 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The Court enters the following schedule: 1. The parties shall serve and file a motion for claim construction by April 29, 2016. 2. The parties shall serve and file any responsive brief by May 12, 2016. 3. Any reply brief and any evidence directly rebutting the supporting evidence contained in an opposing partys response shall be served and filed by May 19, 2016. (lom) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to AMEND Claim Construction Schedule Order, 69 filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Amend Claim Construction Schedule)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 03/28/16 - 10:00 A.M. re Transcript 85 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Gonzalez, Lisa) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 03/28/16 - 10:00 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Lisa M. Gonzalez, phone number 213-894-2979; CSRLISAG@AOL.COM. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (Gonzalez, Lisa) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Nada Tadic at Nada Tadic with any questions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE BASIS OF RES JUDICATA. (gk) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)- PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE BASIS OF RES JUDICATA 59 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE BASIS OF RES JUDICATA 59 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: Hearing held and counsel are present. Tentative order provided. The Court confers with counsel and counsel argue. The Court takes the above-referenced motions under submission. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (clee) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59 Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Alexsam's Confidential Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO FILE SUR-REPLY by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Request Pursuant to L.R. 7-10 For Leave To File Sur-Reply 78 is GRANTED. Defendants may file a Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Alexsam's Confidential Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata Pursuant to L.R. 7-10 filed by Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Alexsam's Confidential Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request to File Sur-Reply) (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: 3/10/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting 73 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan R. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of UNDISPUTED AND DISPUTED FACTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59, APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata under seal 66 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59, APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata under seal 66 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17404905 paid.) filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing Eastern District of Texas, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing Northern District of Georgia, # 4 Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of Georgia) (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction Chart and Joint Prehearing Statement filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED OPPOSITION RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 70 filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Defendants' Statement of Genuine Disputes in Support of Their Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder granting 66 APPLICATION to Seal Document: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, unredacted copies of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On The Basis of Res Judicata and Defendants' Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact shall be accepted for filing under seal. (bm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER AMENDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 65 , the Claim Construction Schedule set out in Dkt. No. 46 is modified as follows: Joint Claim Construction Chart and Joint Prehearing Statement is due 2/26/2016. (gk) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59 Redacted Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Document Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Support of Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata, # 2 Evidentiary Objections in Support of Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata, # 3 Declaration of J. Bennett Clark in Support of Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata)(Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata under seal 66 filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Exhibit A - Unredacted Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B - Unredacted Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata under seal filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal, # 2 Redacted Document Defendants' Redacted Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata, # 3 Redacted Document Defendants' Redacted Statement of Genuine Disputes of Material Fact in Support of Their Opposition to Alexsam's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata)(Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to AMEND Claim Construction Schedule filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Amending Claim Construction Schedule)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17279652 paid.) 63 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment.Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: No signature on Application. Local counsel failed to sign the application. See LR 11-1. See Instructions for Applicants (1) note that electronic signatures are not accepted. (G-64); Submitted Good Standing Certificate that is over 30 days old. Supreme Court Certificate was issued on 12/30/15 and application was filed on 2/12/16. See Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: 2/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Jonathan R. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17279652 paid.) filed by plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc., re Sealed Document, 61 Unredacted Version of Confidential Motion For Partial Summary Judgment served on 02/04/2016. (Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 61 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT unredacted versions of Motion and two attachments re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata 59 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, 60 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support plus Exhibits A-J, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Facts/Conclusions of Law)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata 57 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, an unredacted copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Basis of Res Judicata shall be accepted for filing under seal. (gk) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Dismiss Invalidity Claims Based on Res Judicata filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/28/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support plus Exhibits A-J (redacted), # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Facts/Conclusions of Law (redacted), # 3 Proposed Order) (Burt, Jacqueline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based On Res Judicata (and supporting materials) under seal 57 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document Motion, # 2 Unredacted Document Declaration plus Exhibits A-J, # 3 Unredacted Document Proposed Statement)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to file document Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based On Res Judicata (and supporting materials) under seal filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Redacted Document Motion, # 3 Redacted Document Declaration plus Exhibits A-J, # 4 Redacted Document Proposed Statement)(Burt, Jacqueline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO DEFENDANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT filed by Counter Defendant Alexsam, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER 54 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The "Stipulated Motion To Amend Plaintiff's Answer To Defendants' Cross-Complaint" made by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Alexsam, Inc. ("Alexsam") in this matter 54 having come before the Court, and the Court having read and considered the same, the Court, for good cause shown, GRANTS said Motion. The Clerk is instructed to file "Plaintiff's First Amended Answer To Defendants' Cross-Complaint" that was attached to Alexsam's motion. (lom) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim 42 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Answer, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting 47 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jacqueline K. Burt on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ALEXSAM'S RES JUDICATA MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 50 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Stipulation to Amend Briefing Schedule for Alexam's Res Judicata Motion for Summary Judgment made by the Parties in this matter having come before the Court, and the Court having read and considered the same, the Court, for good cause shown, GRANTS said Motion. The Briefing Schedule set out in Dkt. No. 46 is modified as follows: Alexsam to file its Motion: February 1, 2016; Defendants to file Opposition: February 22, 2016; Alexsam to file Reply: March 7, 2016; Hearing: March 28, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (clee) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re APPLICATION for attorney Jacqueline K. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17054192 paid.) 47 (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Steven W Ritcheson counsel for Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. Changing Firm Name to Insight, PLC. Changing E-mail to swritcheson@insightplc.com. Filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Jacqueline K. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17054192 paid.) 47 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Jacqueline K. Burt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-17054192 paid.) filed by plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standings) (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ALEXSAM'S RES JUDICATA MSJ by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation 45 , the parties shall complete and file a Joint Claim Construction Chart and Joint Prehearing Statement by 2/19/2016. The parties shall complete all discovery related to claim construction, including any discovery pertaining to experts, by 4/4/2016. The parties shall serve and file a motion for claim construction by 4/19/2016. Markman Hearing set on 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Alexsam's Res Judicata Motion for Summary Judgment due 1/11/2016. Defendants' Opposition due 2/15/2016. Hearing set for 2/29/2016 at 10:00 AM. Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Order Regarding Claim Construction Schedule and Briefing Schedule on Alexsam's Res Judicata MSJ filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Claim Construction Schedule and Briefing Schedule on Alexsam's Res Judicata MSJ)(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Status Conference Re Scheduling Conference held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court confers with counsel as stated in Court and on the record. Counsel are ORDERED to meet and confer regarding a claims construction schedule, and submit a stipulation and proposed order for the Court's approval. The stipulation and proposed order shall also include a briefing schedule and hearing date for the motion for summary judgment and a new date for the Scheduling Conference thereafter. The hearing for the motion for summary judgment shall be set two weeks after the filing of the last brief, on a Monday at 10:00 AM. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PURSUANT TO FRCP 26f REPORT of MEETING OF COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim (filed as "Cross Claim") filed by Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Alexsam, Inc..(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - MINUTES (UNDER SEAL) - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND AND MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSS-CLAIMS. (gk) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REMAND AND MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CROSSCLAIMS(Dkt. 29, filed August 25, 2015) 29 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court DENIES Alexsams motion to remand the action to state court; DENIES Alexsams motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; and DENIES Alexsams motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pj) Modified on 10/1/2015 (pj). (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff / Cross-Defendant Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Order Of Dismissal From Prior Case)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to 29 filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Alfred Shaumyan in Support of Defendants' Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Remand. (gk) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AN UNREDACTED COPY OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND REMAND by Judge Christina A. Snyder: 35 (pj) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for an order to file UNDER SEAL an unredacted copy of Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion to dismiss and remand filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (pj) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: 9/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to 29 -- Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claims and for Remand, with Proof of Service filed by Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc. of Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Remand; Declaration of Alfred Shaumyan; [Proposed] Order. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason Scott Meyer on behalf of Defendants Green Dot Corporation and Next Estate Communications, Inc., designating Nancy Franco as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Per Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Counter Defendant Alexsam, Inc., Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc. (Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion 23 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Remand Case to State Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - ALEXSAM, INC.'S MOTION to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims and Remand. (gk) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER. (gk) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Steve W. Ritcheson in Support of Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims and for Remand. (gk) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - APPLICATION for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims and for Remand. (gk) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Amending Hearing Date for the Notice Regarding Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Alexsam, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Certain Affirmative Defenses and Cross Claims and for Remand filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: 8/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Jason Scott Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16342517 paid.) filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Franco, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: 8/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support Motion to Dismiss and Remand filed by Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ritcheson, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed Alexsam, Inc. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Scott Edward Yackey counsel for Counter Claimants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. Scott Edward Yackey is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Scott Edward Yackey. (Yackey, Scott) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only 18 Proof of Service of Notice of Assignment to United States Judges and Notice to Counsel served on August 6, 2015. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Alfred Shaumyan in Support of Defendants' Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, Defendants' Cross-Complaint, and Settlement and License Agreement. (gk) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AN UNREDACTED COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, DEFENDANTS' CROSS-COMPLAINT, AND SETTLEMENT AND LICENSE AGREEMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder: 16 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, the following documents shall be accepted for filing under seal: (1) Unredacted copy of Plaintiff's Complaint; (2) Unredacted copy of Defendants' Cross-Complaint; and (3) Unredacted copy of the Settlement and License Agreement (pj) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Seal (Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for an order to file UNDER SEAL an Unredacted copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, Defendants' Cross-Complaint and Settlement and License Agreement filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (pj) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven W Ritcheson on behalf of Plaintiff Alexsam, Inc. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Bennett Clark on behalf of Defendants, designating Nancy Franco as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott Edward Yackey on behalf of Defendants, designating Nancy Franco as local counsel. (lt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants and Cross-Complainants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court served on July 30, 2015. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for attorney Scott Edward Yackey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16181410 paid.) filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Franco, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney James Bennett Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-16181281 paid.) filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Franco, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc. of Application for an Order to File Under Seal an Unredacted Copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, Defendants' Cross-Complaint, and Settlement and License Agreement; Declaration of Alfred Shaumyan; and [Proposed] Order. (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (rn) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc., (Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Green Dot Corporation, Next Estate Communications, Inc.. (Shaumyan, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC585032 Receipt No: 0973-16172201 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Next Estate Communications, Inc., Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Verified Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Defendants' Verified Answer to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendants' Cross-Complaint) (Attorney Alfred Shaumyan added to party Green Dot Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred Shaumyan added to party Next Estate Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Shaumyan, Alfred) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 262 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?