Fernandez v. Supreme Ct St of IL, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-03402
District Judge James B. Moran, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge James B. Moran
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 9:56 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Connie R Fernandez, Plaintiff

Represented by P.O. Box 7608

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Connie R Fernandez +1 480 600 6975
v.
No Logo Annie L Herling, Defendant
No Logo Antoinette Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Arizona Tenants Association, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ava M Gould, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Griffin-Silz, Defendant
No Logo Chicago Property Owners Coalition, Defendant
No Logo David G Lichtenstein, Defendant
No Logo David Levin, Defendant
No Logo Ditkowsky & Conteror, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-1001, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Pensack, Defendant
No Logo Ernest Summers, III, Defendant
No Logo Gary S Rapaport, Defendant
No Logo Gilbert Grossi, Defendant
No Logo Illinois Tenants Union, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jack Wayne, Defendant
No Logo James K Leven, Defendant
No Logo Joe Jackson, Defendant
No Logo John N Hourihane, Defendant
No Logo Karen L Patton, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth G Jablonski, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth J Ditkowsky, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth J Volk, Defendant
No Logo Leonard, Murray, Defendant
No Logo Mary J Robinson, Defendant
No Logo Merle K Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Michael M Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Michael Pensack, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Funderburk, Defendant
No Logo Robert L Gordon, Defendant
No Logo Robin Harkness, Defendant
No Logo Rosalyn B Kaplan, Defendant
No Logo Scott Silz, Defendant
No Logo Sheldon C Garber, Defendant
No Logo Supreme Court of the State of Illinois, Defendant
No Logo Willie M Whiting, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Timeline
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None
ENTERED JUDGMENT (yap) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER of 5/16/02 by Hon. James B. Moran: Plaintiff has violated Rules 8(a) and (e) and her complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis [3-1] is denied as moot. Entered Memorandum Opinion and Order. terminating case Mailed notice (yap) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None
APPLICATION by Connie R Fernandez to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ar) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None
CIVIL cover sheet. (ar) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None
RECEIVED COMPLAINT with thirty-four copies. (ar) (Entered: 05/14/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 29 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?