Bennett v. USA U.S. Army
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02295-BEL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward Bennett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald J Kearns +1 410 686 8585 +1 410 692 0342
v.
United States Army United States Army, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States of America U.S. Army Ordnance Corps"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lilore Huesman

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynne Ann Battaglia +1 410 209 4800 +1 410 260 1543
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/27/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Harford
Terminated 2/28/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ARCHIVE, CLOSED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER granting [17-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/28/02) (c/i 2/28/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/28/2002
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/28/02) (c/i 2/28/02) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Terminated Case
      Case closed (hml, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001, Terminated: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [19-1] motion of Defendant to Substitute Attorney; terminated attorney Andrea Leahy-Fucheck for USA U.S. Army; Added Jennifer Lilore Huesman. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 7/20/01 ) (c/m 7/23/01-das) (das, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001, Terminated: 7/20/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney
          MOTION by USA U.S. Army to Substitute Attorney . (c/s) (das, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2002 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE by Edward Bennett to [17-1] motion of defendant to Dismiss, [17-2] motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum in support and attachments (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2002 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION with memorandum in support by USA U.S. Army to Dismiss , or in the alternative for Summary Judgment and exhibits 1-7 (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER GRANTING defendant's [15-1] motion to Extend Time Nunc Pro Tunc to file dispositive motions to 3/30/01 and permitting plaintiff to respond by 4/30/01 ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 3/28/01) (c/i 3/29/01) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001, Terminated: 3/29/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                  MOTION by USA U.S. Army to Extend Time Nunc Pro Tunc to file dispositive motions (c/s) (hml, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 2/17/01 ) (c/i 2/21/01) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 1/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion of USA to Substitute Attorney terminated attorney Allen F. Loucks for USA U.S. Army Added Andrea Leahy-Fucheck ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 1/15/01) (c/i 1/16/01) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001, Terminated: 1/16/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                        MOTION by USA U.S. Army to Substitute Attorney (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant USA U.S. Army to response of plaintiff to [7-1] motion to Dismiss by USA U.S. Army. (c/s) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER DENYING without prejudice the government's Motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 1/4/01 ) (c/i 1/8/01) (bmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000, Terminated: 1/8/2001 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by Edward Bennett to [7-1] motion to Dismiss by USA U.S. Army. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Correspondence
                                CORRESPONDENCE by Edward Bennett RE: Response to Motion to Dismiss. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER DIRECTING Mr. Bennett show good cause in writing on or before 1/5/01 why defendants' motion should not be granted ( signed by Judge Benson E. Legg 12/19/00) (c/i 12/21/00) (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to USA U.S. Army (JANET RENO) 11/6/00. (das, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/14/2000
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION by USA U.S. Army to Dismiss (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Summons Issued
                                        SECOND SUMMONS(ES) (60 day) issued for USA U.S. Army to U.S. Attorney and Attorney General only. (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Correspondence
                                          CORRESPONDENCE by Edward Bennett RE: Request to re-issue summons for U.S. Attorney and Attorney General, and Attachments. (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Summons Returned Executed
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Defendant USA U.S. Army, by Commanding General John N. Adams 8/8/00, Lieutenant General Billy K. Solomon 8/10/00, and Chief of Staff General Shinseki (acceptance card signed but not dated). (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Correspondence
                                              CORRESPONDENCE by USA U.S. Army (U.S. Attorney) RE: It has not received service of summons. (c/s directly to chambers) (das, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Summons Issued
                                                SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for USA U.S. Army (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Jury Demand
                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by Edward Bennett (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 1168862 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?