Smith v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:14-cv-00612
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 12:09 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wanda Carol Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGartland & Borchardt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND +1 817 332 9300 +1 817 332 9301 firm@attorneysmb.com
v.
No Logo Howmedica Osteonics, Defendant
No Logo Stryker Corp. , Defendant
No Logo Stryker Sales Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This Notice serves as a reminder to all counsel that they shall read and comply with all Orders and Pretrial Orders ("PTOs") filed in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN), even if not filed in the individual member cases. As the Court noted on May 28, 2014 (Doc. No. 326 ), the Court only files all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the master MDL docket. For example, PTO No. 29, filed today on the master MDL docket is applicable to all cases and should be read and complied with by all counsel for all cases. Indeed, counsel is responsible for all documents applicable to all actions and filed in the master MDL docket. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN. Further, all Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/27/2015. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
    TEXT ONLY NOTICE - COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: From this date on, all new or amended Orders and Pretrial Orders that are applicable to all actions in the In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN will be filed only in the master MDL docket (0:13-md-2441-DWF-FLN) and will not be filed in the individual member cases. Orders that apply to less than all cases (e.g., an Order of Dismissal of an individual member case) will be filed in the master MDL docket and in the individual member case. All Orders, minutes, notices and transcripts that are filed in the master case will also be posted on the Stryker Rejuvenate web site at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO.9 (Protective Order). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A) Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER ON REQUEST FOR PERMISSION TO SEEK PARTIAL RECONSIDERATION. Defendants' Request for Permission to Seek Partial Reconsideration of PTO No. 13 (Doc. No. 275 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/12/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 (Stipulated Order Regarding Bellwether Categories). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 (Order Regarding Defendants' Contacts With Physician-Experts). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15 (Order Regarding Deposition Guidelines for Plaintiffs Who are In Extremis). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/6/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 14 (PLCC Appointments to Sub-Committee to Confer with New Jersey Multicounty Litigation). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/21/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 13. (Order on Discovery Motion.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 4/15/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4. Order Regarding Direct Filing of Cases into this Court Without Need to Associate Local Counsel. (See Order for details.). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 4/9/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Scheduling orders and bellwether cases.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 3/25/2014 and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/24/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al. (Please note this Amended PTO was originally filed on 3/25/2014, but only in the main MDL case of 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN. To be consistent with all of the other PTO's filed in this MDL, it is being refiled on this date in the main MDL case as well as all member cases.) (BJS) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 12 (Scheduling orders and bellwether cases.) Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/14/2014. Associated Cases: 0:13-md-02441-DWF-FLN et al.(BJS) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Carol Smith. (McGartland, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Carol Smith. Stryker Sales Corporation served on 3/7/2014, answer due 3/28/2014. (McGartland, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Carol Smith. Stryker Corp. served on 3/7/2014, answer due 3/28/2014. (McGartland, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wanda Carol Smith. Howmedica Osteonics served on 3/7/2014, answer due 3/28/2014. (McGartland, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                  Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Sales Corporation. (jz) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 14-cv-00612 (DWF/FLN). (jz) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-3892976.) Filed by Wanda Carol Smith. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) List of US Fed Cts) (McGartland, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?