Educational Assistance v. USA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 15-5213

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 1:23 AM EDT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2870 - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207931054 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPORT [1676754] filed abeyance status : Pending Settlement filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 [Service Date: 05/25/2017 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207914815 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    REPORT [1668018] filed abeyance status : Settlement proceedings ongoing filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 [Service Date: 03/27/2017 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207894541 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPORT [1656916] filed abeyance status : Stay pending settlement discussions.. by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 [Service Date: 01/23/2017 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207877910 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPORT [1647947] filed abeyance status : Abeyance pending settlement proceedings. by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 [Service Date: 11/28/2016 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207858716 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPORT [1637750] filed abeyance status : Settlement proceedings ongoing. by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 [Service Date: 09/26/2016 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207838673 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPORT [1626808] filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 abeyance status : Settlement proceedings ongoing. [Service Date: 07/25/2016 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207823753 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None
              REPORT [1618779] filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 abeyance status : Briefing is stayed pending settlement discussion.. [Service Date: 06/10/2016 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207800099 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
                REPORT [1605672] filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 abeyance status : Settlement Proceedings ongoing. [Service Date: 03/24/2016 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207781541 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
                  REPORT [1595690] filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 abeyance status : Settlement proceedings ongoing. [Service Date: 01/27/2016 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207762424 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                    REPORT [1585358] filed by Frances Odza, Barrett Weinberger and Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 14-5127, Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 abeyance status : settlement proceedings ongoing. [Service Date: 11/25/2015 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Murray, Charles)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207762318 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                      REPORT [1585315] filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 abeyance status : Settlement proceedings ongoing. [Service Date: 11/24/2015 ] [14-5127, 15-5213] (Rubin, Jennifer)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207743294 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                        CLERK'S ORDER [1574950] filed granting appellee's motion to suspend briefing pending the conclusion of settlement discussions in related litigation [1573885-2], Cases 14-5127,15-5213 held in abeyance pending settlement. Motions to govern future proceedings due 30 days of the conclusion of settlement proceedings; directing party to file abeyance status report due by 11/24/2015 [14-5127, 15-5213]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207741333 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION [1573885] filed by USA in 14-5127, 15-5213 to suspend briefing schedule (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/01/2015) [Service Date: 09/18/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-5127, 15-5213] (Lyon, Kathleen)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735662 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                            UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1570735] submitted by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 [Service Date: 08/31/2015 ] [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735659 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                              TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1570734] filed by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 [Service Date: 08/31/2015 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735656 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1570733] filed by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 [Service Date: 08/31/2015 ] [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735653 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT [1570732] filed by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 [Service Date: 08/31/2015 ] [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735650 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                    STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1570731] filed by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 [Service Date: 08/31/2015 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735647 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1570730] filed by Charles Murray on behalf of Appellant Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213. [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735644 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1570729] filed by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. in 15-5213 [Service Date: 08/31/2015 ] [15-5213, 14-5127] (Murray, Charles)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207732368 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1568967] that the motions to consolidate be granted, and the above-captioned cases are hereby consolidated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that No.14-5127 be removed from the September 10, 2015 oral argument calendar. The Clerk is directed to establish a briefing schedule and set these cases for oral argument on an appropriate date following the completion of briefing. Before Judges: Garland, Kavanaugh and Williams. [14-5127, 15-5213]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207730532 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1567941] by Educational Assistance Foundation for the Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants in the Performing Arts, Inc. to consolidate cases [Service Date: 08/14/2013 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-5213] (Murray, Charles)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207725875 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1565480] filed by Kathleen E. Lyon on behalf of Appellee USA. [15-5213] (Lyon, Kathleen)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207725763 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1565417] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/31/2015. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/14/2015; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/31/2015. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/31/2015. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/31/2015. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/14/2015 [15-5213]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207725754 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1565415] by Educational Assistance Foundation For The Descendants of Hungarian Immigrants In The Performing Arts, Inc. seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:11-cv-01573-RBW. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-5213]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?