Bank of New York Mellon v. Perry Henderson, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 15-5186

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 1:45 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207816499 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
DUPLICATE MOTION [1614512] filed by Perry M. Henderson temporary restraining order (Response to Motion served by hand due on 05/31/2016), for injunction. (Response to Motion served by hand due on 05/31/2016) [Service Date: 05/19/2016 by Hand Delivery] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [15-5186]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207816496 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION [1614511] filed by Perry M. Henderson temporary restraining order (Response to Motion served by hand due on 05/31/2016), for preliminary injunction. (Response to Motion served by hand due on 05/31/2016) [Service Date: 05/19/2016 by Hand Delivery] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [15-5186]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 01207816423 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      PER CURIAM ORDER [1614461] denying motion for reconsideration [1613719-2]; denying motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction [1567003-2]; setting the following revised briefing schedule: APPELLANT'S BRIEF due 05/31/2016. APPELLEES' BRIEF due 06/30/2016. AMICUS CURIAE APPOINTED FOR APPELLANT'S BRIEF due 07/14/2016. APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF due 07/14/2016. Before Judges: Tatel, Griffith and Millett. [15-5186]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207815107 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
        MOTION [1613719] filed by Perry M. Henderson to reconsider order [1606560-3] styles as Petition for Panel Rehearing (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/26/2016) [Service Date: 05/13/2016 by US Mail] Pages: 21-30. [15-5186]--[Edited 05/18/2016 by MLG]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207814379 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
          CLERK'S ORDER [1613316] filed granting the consent motion of court appointed appointed amicus to extend time to file the briefs [1612969-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 05/23/2016. APPENDIX due 05/23/2016. AMICUS FOR APPELLANT Brief due 05/23/2016. APPELLEE Brief due on 06/22/2016. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/06/2016. AMICUS FOR APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/06/2016 [15-5186]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813723 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
            CORRECTED UNOPPOSED MOTION [1612969] filed by Mr. Paul Francis Enzinna to extend time to file brief to 05/23/2016. [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186] (Enzinna, Paul)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813629 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
              INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--UNOPPOSED MOTION [1612914] filed by Mr. Paul Francis Enzinna to extend time to file brief to 05/23/2016. Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]--[Edited 05/12/2016 by MLG] (Enzinna, Paul)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207802588 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                CLERK'S ORDER [1606996] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 05/16/2016. APPENDIX due 05/16/2016. AMICUS FOR APPELLANT Brief due 05/16/2016. APPELLEE Brief due on 06/15/2016. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 06/29/2016. AMICUS FOR APPELLANT Reply Brief due 06/29/2016 [15-5186]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207801789 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  PER CURIAM ORDER [1606560] denying motion to stay case [1567003-2]; dismissing motions for leave to amend the stay motion [1572098-2] [1570641-2] as moot; denying motions to compel discovery and for judicial notice [1574517-2] [1573285-2]; denying motion for summary reversal [1568992-2]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Paul F. Enzinna, a member of the Bar of this court, be appointed as amicus curiae to present arguments in support of appellant’s position. Before Judges: Tatel, Griffith and Millett. [15-5186]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750279 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                    CLERK'S ORDER [1578790] filed granting motion to extend time [1578744-2]; the Clerk is directed to file certificate of parties and rulings [1578746-2], statement of issues [1578747-2], docketing statement [1578748-2], notice of appearance [1578749-2], record of decision [1578752-2]; report on status of transcript (final) [1578751-2] [15-5186]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750203 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                      MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1578752] submitted by Perry M. Henderson [Service Date: 10/19/2015 ] [15-5186]--[Edited 10/19/2015 by JJA]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750200 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                        MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1578751] filed by Perry M. Henderson [Service Date: 10/19/2015 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [15-5186]--[Edited 10/19/2015 by JJA]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750195 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                          MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1578749] filed by Perry M. Henderson. [15-5186]--[Edited 10/19/2015 by JJA]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750192 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                            MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--DOCKETING STATEMENT [1578748] filed by Perry M. Henderson [Service Date: 10/19/2015 ] [15-5186]--[Edited 10/19/2015 by JJA]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750189 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                              MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1578747] filed by Perry M. Henderson [Service Date: 10/19/2015 ] [15-5186]--[Edited 10/19/2015 by JJA]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750186 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1578746] filed by Perry M. Henderson [Service Date: 10/19/2015 ] [15-5186]--[Edited 10/19/2015 by JJA]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750181 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION [1578744] filed by Perry M. Henderson to extend time to file initial submissions (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/02/2015) [Service Date: 10/19/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207750170 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
                                    REPLY [1578741] filed by Perry M. Henderson to response [1576178-2] [Service Date: 10/19/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207746284 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1576605] filed by Bank of New York Mellon to motion for judicial notice [1574517-2] [Service Date: 10/05/2015 by 3rd Party] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207745484 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1576178] filed by Bank of New York Mellon to motion for other relief [1573285-2] [Service Date: 10/01/2015 by 3rd Party] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207742511 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION [1574517] filed by Perry M. Henderson for judicial notice. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/05/2015) [Service Date: 09/21/2015 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207740318 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None
                                            MOTION [1573285] filed by Perry M. Henderson to comple discovery. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/01/2015) [Service Date: 09/16/2015 by Clerk, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207739854 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1573001] filed by Bank of New York Mellon to motion for other relief [1572098-2] [Service Date: 09/14/2015 by 3rd Party] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207738150 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED MOTION [1572098] filed by Perry M. Henderson for leave to amend motion for preliminary injunction. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/14/2015) [Service Date: 08/31/2015 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207736999 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1571473] filed by Bank of New York Mellon to motion for summary reversal [1568992-2] [Service Date: 09/03/2015 by 3rd Party] Pages: 11-15. [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207735451 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION [1570641] filed by Perry M. Henderson for leave to amend motion for preliminary injunction (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/11/2015) [Service Date: 08/28/2015 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207733337 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1569485] by Bank of New York Mellon to motion to stay case [1567003-2] [Service Date: 08/24/2015 by 3rd Party] Pages: 11-15. [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207732424 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION filed [1568992] by Perry M. Henderson for summary reversal (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/03/2015) [Service Date: 08/20/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk] Pages: 1-10. [15-5186]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207728832 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION filed [1567003] by Perry M. Henderson to stay underlying order in case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/24/2015) [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-5186]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207726812 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1565936] filed by Bank of New York Mellon [Service Date: 08/03/2015 ] [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207724372 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1564592] filed by S. Mohsin Reza on behalf of Appellee Bank of New York Mellon. [15-5186] (Reza, Syed)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207717287 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1560748] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/03/2015. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/17/2015; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 08/03/2015. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/03/2015. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/03/2015. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 08/17/2015. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [15-5186]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207716331 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1560223] by Perry M. Henderson seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-00747-RJL. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-5186]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 169 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?