USA v. Tacawy
Criminal Case California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cr-01201
District Judge A. Howard Matz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 3:56 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Tacawy, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye, McLane, Bednarski, and Litt, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Carlton F Gunn +1 626 844 7660 +1 626 844 7670 cgunn@kmbllaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/27/2011 Elizabeth A Newman +1 213 894 2854 +1 213 894 0081 zzCAC_FPD_Document_Receiving@fd.org
TERMINATED: 12/08/2009 Elizabeth A Newman +1 213 894 2854 +1 213 894 0081 zzCAC_FPD_Document_Receiving@fd.org
TERMINATED: 12/12/2011 Chase Scolnick +1 213 894 4795 +1 213 894 0081 Chase_Scolnick@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by salsedalawgroup.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/26/2010 Gerald C Salseda +1 213 784 2330 +1 213 402 7020 Gerald@SalsedaLawGroup.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND COMMITMENT ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Andrew Tacawy; Re: Supervised Release - Final Revocation Hearing 49 . The defendant is committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a total term of eight (8) months, to begin consecutive to the completion of any custody sentence that defendant is currently serving pursuant to the orders of the Honorable John F. Walter in CR11-00671-JFW. At the completion of his eight months confinement consecutive to the other sentence, supervised release will not be reinstated. (kbr) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTES OF Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release held before Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Defendant admits allegations Two, Four, Five, and Six contained in the Petition on Probation and Supervised Release (Bench Warrant) filed on December 2, 2011. The Court grants Government's oral motion to dismiss allegations One and Three. Refer to the Judgement Revoking Supervised Release and Commitment Order for the terms of the sentence. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (kbr) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Andrew Tacawy. Recommended that the defendant be Provided with a medical examination and/or medical treatment of Feet. Implement Defendant's Soft Shoe/Tennis Shoe Chrono as reflected in BOP and MDC Records. (jp) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
        SENTENCING LETTER filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy for Supervised Release Revocation Hearing (Gunn, Carlton) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED thatthis Court's order filed December 27, 2011 42 is amended nunc pro tunc to clarify that the appointment of Carlton F. Gunn to represent Defendant Andrew Jon Tacawy was under the Criminal Justice Act. (kbr) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
            EX PARTE APPLICATION to Clarify Order on Application to Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Application for Appointment of Counsel,, 42 Filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Clarifying Order of Appointment of Counsel)(Gunn, Carlton) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Carlton F Gunn counsel for defendant Andrew Jon Tacawy. Changing address and firm name to Of counsel, Kaye, McLane, and Bednarski. Changing e-mail and fax number to cgunn@kmbllp.com/(626) 844-7670. Adding Carlton F. Gunn as attorney as counsel of record for Andrew Jon Tacawy for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Andrew Jon Tacawy (Gunn, Carlton) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                LETTERS RE: SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOCATION filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Gunn, Carlton) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER RELIEVING THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER AND APPOINTING CARLTON F. GUNN 40 by Judge A. Howard Matz that the Office of the Federal Public Defender be relieved as counsel of record and Carlton F. Gunn is APPOINTED to represent Defendant Andrew Jon Tacawy, effective 1/1/2012. (jp) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT, re Supervised revocation hearing in CR-671-JFW and the supervised revocation hearing in CR 09-01201-AHM shall be consolidated by Judge John F. Walter. For reasons stated on The record on 12/21/2011. (jp) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                      APPLICATION to Withdraw as Attorney by Office of the Federal Public Defender., APPLICATION for Appointment of Counsel Carlton F. Gunn Filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gits, Dean) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton as to Andrew Tacawy. Order that the defendant be Allow to make social as requested, at suitable times. (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                          RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial/After Hearing; as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Plaintiff's exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                            LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial as to Andrew Tacawy. (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES OF Preliminary Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy Witnesses CST (See separate list). Court orders that Exhibits be returned to the respective counsel/party of record (See receipt for Release of Exhibits to Counsel). Court finds probable cause in allegations #2, 4, 5 and 6. The Court APPROVES Government's Request to Dismiss Allegations 1 and 3. Each case is referred to the assigned District Judge for further proceedings. CR-53 Abstract of Proceedings. Court Smart: CS 12/14/2011. (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                  REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy; defendant Year of Birth: 1977; date of arrest: 12/7/2011. (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE Re: REVOCATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE held before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Attorney: Pedro V Castillo for Andrew Tacawy, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Government's Request for Detention is: GRANTED. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Preliminary Hearing set for 12/14/2011 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal.Court Smart: CS 12/7/2011. (jp) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION for Order to Consolidate Cases and Set Hearing Date filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gunn, Carlton) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Preliminary Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing to 1/19/2012 at 3:00 PM. (jp) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          REQUEST FOR CALENDAR DATE filed as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 1/16/2012 at 3:00 PM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (kbr) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Carlton F Gunn on behalf of Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy. (Gunn, Carlton) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              PROBATION FORM 12 as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy, ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge A. Howard Matz. (gk) (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (dd). Modified on 6/24/2015 (dd). (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MINUTES OF Status Conference re: Defendant Progress on Supervised Release (Non-Evidentiary) before Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Cause called. Court is advised that defendant has been designated an escapee by the Bureau of Prisons and that a bench warrant has been issued for his arrest. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy, re Stipulation 25 . FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, that this matter be put on calendar for a Status hearing re Mr. Tacawy progress on supervised release. The parties are ordered to appear before this Court on 12/10/2010 at 11:00 AM. (jp) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Status Hearing filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Scolnick, Chase) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. The Court received in the mail a letter sent by defendant dated 9/12/10. It has forwarded the letter to his new attorney, Gerald C. Salseda. (jp) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz: as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. The Court received in the mail a letter sent by defendant. It has forwarded the letter to his attorney. (kbr) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDINGS Returned Executed as to Andrew Tacawy Abstract received on 7/28/10. complied. (sj) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            JUDGMENT REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND COMMITMENT ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Andrew Tacawy; Re: Preliminary Supervised Release Revocation Hrg 20 . (jp) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MINUTES OF Preliminary Supervised Release Revocation - SENTENCING (Non-Evidentiary) before Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. IT IS ADJUDGED, upon the findings of the Court, supervised release is hereby revoked, vacated, and set aside. The defendant is committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of five (5) months. Upon release from custody supervised release shall be reinstated for a two-year term under the same terms and conditions that were previously ordered with the additional condition that for a period not to exceed 120 days, defendant be placed in a residential reentry center under the community correction component and that he stays there for up to 120 days or until he is discharged by the program director. Refer to the Judgement Revoking Supervised Release and Commitment Order for the terms of the sentence. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy, (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Chase Scolnick on behalf of Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy. (Scolnick, Chase) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Andrew Tacawy (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ABSTRACT OF COURT PROCEEDING Issued by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott as to Andrew Tacawy. Ordered that the defendant be allowed to make a social telephone call. (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. (sj) (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (dd). Modified on 6/24/2015 (dd). (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE Re: REVOCATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE held before Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant does not admit the allegations. Court orders defendant Permanently detained. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Counsel are directed to contact the clerk for District Judge Matz for the setting of further proceedings. Court Smart: CS 7/26/10. (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy; defendants Year of Birth: 1977; date of arrest: 7/23/2010 (sj) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                REQUEST FOR CALENDAR DATE filed as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Preliminary Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing set for 7/30/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Gerald C Salseda on behalf of Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy. (Salseda, Gerald) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    PROBATION FORM 12 as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy, ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge A. Howard Matz: (esa) (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (dd). Modified on 6/24/2015 (dd). (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      JUDGMENT REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE AND COMMITMENT ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz as to Andrew Tacawy; Re: Minute Preliminary Supervised Release Revocation 7 . (jp) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        MINUTES Preliminary Supervised Release Revocation - SENTENCING (Non-Evidentiary) held before Judge A. Howard Matz as to Defendant Andrew TacawyCourt informs counsel of its tentative sentence and hears oral argument. Court sentences defendant. IT IS ADJUDGED, upon the findings of the Court, supervised release is hereby revoked, vacated, and set aside. Supervised release is reinstated under the same terms and conditions as originally imposed with the additional conditions that (1) by not later than 1/8/2010, defendant shall reside at a residential drug treatment program until discharged; and defendant shall submit to one drug test within 15 days of release from that residential drug treatment program, and at least two periodic drug tests thereafter but not to exceed eight tests per month all as directed by the Probation Officer. Refer to the Judgement Revoking Supervised Release and Commitment Order for the terms of the sentence. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS RECEIVED Re Supervised Release Transfer-in, as to Andrew Tacawy. Received Copy of Prob 22 Order; Judgment; Indictment; Docket Sheet from District of Maryland (Greenbelt). (mg) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            PROBATION FORM 12 (Citation) as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy, ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge A. Howard Matz: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/16/2009 at 03:00 PM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (mg) (Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (dd). Modified on 6/24/2015 (dd). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of Deputy Public Defender Chase Scolnick on behalf of Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Filed by Defendant Andrew Tacawy. (Scolnick, Chase) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                REQUEST FOR CALENDAR DATE filed as to Defendant Andrew Tacawy. Preliminary Revocation of Probation Hearing set for 12/16/2009 at 3:00 PM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (jp) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF JURISDICTION/TREATY TRANSFER-IN: The Court has approved the supervised release transfer-in as to Supervised Releasee Andrew Tacawy. This matter has been randomly assigned to District Judge A. Howard Matz for all further proceedings. (jp) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER TRANSFERRING JURISDICTION filed by Judge Peter J. Messitte as to Supervised Releasee Andrew Tacawy. Case transferred in from the USDC, District of Maryland, Southern Division at Baltimore. Approved by Judge Audrey B. Collins. (Attachments: # 1 CR-25 Transmittal Letter-Probation Transfer-In) (jp) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 572 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?