Seed Company Limited, et al v. William Westerman, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 14-7126

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 4:36 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207804548 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Kavanaugh and Srinivasan. [14-7126]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207800791 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
    PER CURIAM ORDER [1606017] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 15 Minutes, Appellees - 15 Minutes (to be divided among appellees as they see fit); directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 04/04/2016 [14-7126]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207779775 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
      CLERK'S ORDER [1594679] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 04/11/2016. [14-7126]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207773350 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE [1591211] filed by Armstrong, Kratz, Quintos, Hanson & Brooks, LLP, Armstrong, Westerman & Hattori, LLP, Armstrong, Westerman & Hattori, Mcleland & Naughton, LLP, Estate of James Armstrong, III and Kratz, Quintos & Hanson, LLP to change party information [Service Date: 12/30/2015 ] [14-7126] (Glaws, John)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207755540 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          PER CURIAM ORDER [1581680] ORDERED that Ann G. Westerman be substituted as the personal representative of the estate of William F. Esterman. FUTHER ORDERED that the request of Ann G. Westerman to adopt the brief filed on behalf of William F. Westerman be granted. Before Judges: Brown, Srinivasan and Wilkins. [14-7126]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207729002 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
            REPLY FILED [1567079] by Seed Company Limited, Shigeru Tamai and James Armstrong, III, Armstrong, Kratz, Quintos, Hanson & Brooks, LLP, Armstrong, Westerman & Hattori, LLP, Armstrong, Westerman & Hattori, Mcleland & Naughton, LLP, Estate of James Armstrong, III, Ed Kenehan, John Kong, Kratz, Quintos & Hanson, LLP, William F. Westerman and Westerman, Hattori, Daniels & Adrian, LLP to response [1565529-2],[1565529-3] [Service Date: 08/10/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7126] (Hayden, Roger)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207725982 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
              REPLY FILED [1565529] by Seed Company Limited and Shigeru Tamai to Response and RESPONSE FILED to Cross Motion [1563011-2](Reply to Response by Mail to Cross Motion due on 08/10/2015) [Service Date: 07/30/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [14-7126]--[Edited 08/03/2015 by AY - MODIFIED EVENT] (Magid, Creighton)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207681856
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Blank 01207664042
                    LREF
                    Blank 01207662411
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207655078
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207648115
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207637300
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207637227
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207636628
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207636090
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632462
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632459
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632456
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632450
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632447
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632444
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632404
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632401
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207632115
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207631170
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207629874
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207626352
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207626349
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207623617 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                            CLERK'S ORDER filed [1509798] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 09/29/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 10/14/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 09/29/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 09/29/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 09/29/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 10/14/2014 [14-7126]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207623614 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1509796] by Seed Company Limited and Shigeru Tamai seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:08-cv-00355-RJL. Assigned USCA Case Number [14-7126]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?