Noel Waite v. Clark County Collection Servic
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-16125

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 3:02 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Reilly for Appellee Clark County Collection Service, LLC in 13-15143, 13-16125. [9412096] [13-15143, 13-16125] (PJR) [Entered: 02/06/2015 11:07 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Sergei Lemberg for Appellant Noel Waite in 13-15143, 13-16125. [9411999] [13-15143, 13-16125] (SL) [Entered: 02/06/2015 10:45 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick J. Reilly for Appellee Clark County Collection Service, LLC in 13-15143, 13-16125. [9365870] [13-15143, 13-16125] (PJR) [Entered: 12/30/2014 01:53 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Appellee Clark County Collection Service, LLC in 13-15143, 13-16125 reply to response (motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 02/03/2014. [8962504] [13-15143, 13-16125] (PJR) [Entered: 02/03/2014 09:50 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellant Noel Waite in 13-15143, 13-16125 response opposing motion (motion to strike portion or whole of document). Date of service: 01/22/2014. [8948287] [13-15143, 13-16125] (SL) [Entered: 01/22/2014 03:25 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Noel Waite in 13-15143 Motion to take judicial notice of Baychar, Inc., v. Salomon/North America, Inc., 04-cv-00136 (D. Me.). Date of service: 01/22/2014. [8948280] [13-15143, 13-16125] (SL) [Entered: 01/22/2014 03:24 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AMT): Appellee’s motion to strike appellant’s supplemental excerpts of record and any related filings shall be referred to the panel that will consider the merits of the appeal for resolution. [8935249] [13-15143, 13-16125] (IV) [Entered: 01/13/2014 01:19 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?